This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/05/2023 at 05:53:41 (UTC).

In Re: Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC

Case Summary

On 01/12/2023 In Re Bernard L Madoff Investment Securities LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Valerie E. Caproni. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-00294

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Valerie E. Caproni

 

Party Details

Appellant

Koch Industries, Inc.

In Re and Debtor

Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC

Appellee

Irving H. Picard

Intervenor

SIPC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Daniel Adam Rubens

Jonathan Philip Guy

Katherine Munyan

Appellee Attorneys

Amy Elizabeth Vanderwal

Seanna R. Brown

David J. Sheehan

Eric Robert Fish

Intervenor Attorneys

Nathanael Stephen Kelley

Kevin H. Bell

 

Court Documents

26 #1

Appeal Package

#26

(#26) CLERK'S JUDGMENT re: #25 Memorandum & Opinion in favor of Irving H. Picard against Koch Industries, Inc. It is, ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Opinion and Order dated May 9, 2023, Appellant's requests for direct appeal or interlocutory appeal of the Bankruptcy Court's decision are DENIED; accordingly, the case is closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 5/10/2023) (Attachments: #1 Appeal Package) (km) (Entered: 05/10/2023)

#25

(#25) OPINION AND ORDER re: #3 MOTION for Leave to Appeal filed by Koch Industries, Inc.. For the foregoing reasons, Appellant's requests for direct appeal or interlocutory appeal of the Bankruptcy Court's decision are DENIED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate all open motions and to close the case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 5/9/2023) (tg) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing. (Entered: 05/09/2023)

#24

(#24) REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #13 Letter, . Document filed by Koch Industries, Inc...(Guy, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/10/2023)

#23

(#23) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #3 MOTION for Leave to Appeal . Document filed by Irving H. Picard..(Fish, Eric) (Entered: 03/03/2023)

#22

(#22) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #3 MOTION for Leave to Appeal . Document filed by SIPC..(Bell, Kevin) (Entered: 03/03/2023)

#21

(#21) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by SIPC..(Kelley, Nathanael) (Entered: 03/03/2023)

13 #1

Exhibit 1 - Request for Certification of Direct Appeal

13 #13

Main Document

3 #4

Exhibit D - Transcript

3 #3

Exhibit C - List of Cases

3 #2

Exhibit B - Bankruptcy Decision

3 #1

Exhibit A - Bankruptcy Order

3 #3

Main Document

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(bkar) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

1 #2

Exhibit B - Bankruptcy Decision

1 #1

Exhibit A - Bankruptcy Order

1 #1

Main Document

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) CLERK'S JUDGMENT re: #25 Memorandum & Opinion in favor of Irving H. Picard against Koch Industries, Inc. It is, ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Opinion and Order dated May 9, 2023, Appellant's requests for direct appeal or interlocutory appeal of the Bankruptcy Court's decision are DENIED; accordingly, the case is closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 5/10/2023) (Attachments: #1 Appeal Package) (km) (Entered: 05/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) OPINION AND ORDER re: #3 MOTION for Leave to Appeal filed by Koch Industries, Inc.. For the foregoing reasons, Appellant's requests for direct appeal or interlocutory appeal of the Bankruptcy Court's decision are DENIED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate all open motions and to close the case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 5/9/2023) (tg) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing. (Entered: 05/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #13 Letter, . Document filed by Koch Industries, Inc...(Guy, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #3 MOTION for Leave to Appeal . Document filed by Irving H. Picard..(Fish, Eric) (Entered: 03/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #3 MOTION for Leave to Appeal . Document filed by SIPC..(Bell, Kevin) (Entered: 03/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by SIPC..(Kelley, Nathanael) (Entered: 03/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nathanael Stephen Kelley on behalf of SIPC..(Kelley, Nathanael) (Entered: 03/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kevin H. Bell on behalf of SIPC..(Bell, Kevin) (Entered: 03/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amy Elizabeth Vanderwal on behalf of Irving H. Picard..(Vanderwal, Amy) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Seanna R. Brown on behalf of Irving H. Picard..(Brown, Seanna) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Eric R. Fish dated January 17, 2023 re: Response to Koch Industries, Inc. Letter dated January 14, 2023. Document filed by Irving H. Picard..(Fish, Eric) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) OBJECTION TO STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: #6 Statement of Relatedness . Document filed by Koch Industries, Inc...(Guy, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 12-mc-115 and 12-cv-3033, 22-cv-6502, 22-cv-6512, 22-cv-7173, 22-cv-7189, 22-cv-7195, 22-cv-7372, and 22-cv-7788. Document filed by Irving H. Picard..(Fish, Eric) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Adam Rubens on behalf of Koch Industries, Inc...(Rubens, Daniel) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Koch Industries, Inc...(Guy, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Appeal Document filed by Koch Industries, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Bankruptcy Order, #2 Exhibit B - Bankruptcy Decision, #3 Exhibit C - List of Cases, #4 Exhibit D - Transcript).(bkar) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (bkar) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (bkar) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(bkar) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM THE BANKRUPTCY COURT TO THE S.D.N.Y. from the Order of Judge Cecelia G. Morris dated November 30, 2022. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 12-1047A, 08-1789A (CGM). Certified copies of file received.Document filed by Koch Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Bankruptcy Order, #2 Exhibit B - Bankruptcy Decision).(bkar) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less