Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 10/19/2020 at 09:58:00 (UTC).

In Re: B K M Marine L L C et al

Case Summary

On 08/20/2020 In Re B K M Marine L L C was filed as a Personal Injury - Marine lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Patrick J Hanna and Robert R Summerhays. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-01092

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Marine

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Patrick J Hanna

Presiding Judge

Robert R Summerhays

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

B K M Marine L L C

Not Classified By Court

Washburn Marine Shipyard, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jefferson R Tillery

Attorney at Jones Walker (NO)

201 St Charles Ave Ste 5100

New Orleans, LA 70170

Catherine Barrett Rice

Attorney at Jones Walker (NO)

201 St Charles Ave Ste 5100

New Orleans, LA 70170

Sara Barry Kuebel

Attorney at Jones Walker (NO)

201 St Charles Ave Ste 5100

New Orleans, LA 70170

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Jessica Bankston Finley

Attorney at Staines Eppling & Kenney

3500 N Causeway Blvd Ste 820

Metairie, LA 70002

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) CLAIM and ANSWER to Complaint by Washburn Marine Shipyard, LLC.(Attorney Jessica Bankston Finley added to party Washburn Marine Shipyard, LLC(pty:selreq))(aty,Finley, Jessica) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE to Claimants of Complaint for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability re #7 Order on Motion. Claims due by 11/13/20. (crt,Reeves, T) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion to Approve Security, Directing Issuance of Notice and Restraining Prosecution of Claims. Signed by Judge Robert R Summerhays on 10/1/2020. (crt,Reeves, T) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

6 #3

Proposed Notice to Claimants

6 #2

Proposed order

6 #1

Exhibit Letter of Undertaking

#6

(#6) Ex Parte MOTION for Motion to Approve Security, Initiate Limitation Concursus, and Issue Notice re #1 Complaint,, #3 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #5 Order on Motion for Extension by B K M Marine L L C. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter of Undertaking, #2 Proposed order, #3 Proposed Notice to Claimants)(aty,Tillery, Jefferson) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER granting #4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Post Security with consent. Compliance Deadline set for 10/1/2020. Signed by Judge Robert R Summerhays on 9/21/2020. (crt,Taylor, L) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

4 #1

Proposed order

#3

(#3) ORDER granting #2 Motion or Temporary Dispensation of Requirement to Post Security. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 8/25/2020. (crt,Dauterive, C) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

1 #7

Proposed order

1 #6

Ex Parte Motion

1 #5

Stipulation of Costs

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil cover sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4364122) filed by B K M Marine L L C. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Stipulation of Costs, #6 Ex Parte Motion, #7 Proposed order)(Attorney Jefferson R Tillery added to party BARGE MONCLA 102(pty:pet), Attorney Jefferson R Tillery added to party BKM MARINE, LLC(pty:pet))(aty,Tillery, Jefferson) Modified on 8/24/2020 to edit text (Dauterive, C). (Entered: 08/20/2020)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CLAIM and ANSWER to Complaint by Washburn Marine Shipyard, LLC.(Attorney Jessica Bankston Finley added to party Washburn Marine Shipyard, LLC(pty:selreq))(aty,Finley, Jessica) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE to Claimants of Complaint for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability re #7 Order on Motion. Claims due by 11/13/20. (crt,Reeves, T) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion to Approve Security, Directing Issuance of Notice and Restraining Prosecution of Claims. Signed by Judge Robert R Summerhays on 10/1/2020. (crt,Reeves, T) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotions Transferred regarding #6 Ex Parte MOTION for Motion to Approve Security, Initiate Limitation Concursus, and Issue Notice re #1 Complaint,, #3 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #5 Order on Motion for Extension . Motions referred to Judge Robert R Summerhays. (crt,Taylor, L) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Ex Parte MOTION for Motion to Approve Security, Initiate Limitation Concursus, and Issue Notice re #1 Complaint,, #3 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #5 Order on Motion for Extension by B K M Marine L L C. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter of Undertaking, #2 Proposed order, #3 Proposed Notice to Claimants)(aty,Tillery, Jefferson) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER granting #4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Post Security with consent. Compliance Deadline set for 10/1/2020. Signed by Judge Robert R Summerhays on 9/21/2020. (crt,Taylor, L) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotions Transferred regarding #4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Post Security with consent. Motions referred to Judge Robert R Summerhays. (crt,Dunford, T) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Post Security with consent by B K M Marine L L C. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Tillery, Jefferson) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER granting #2 Motion or Temporary Dispensation of Requirement to Post Security. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 8/25/2020. (crt,Dauterive, C) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Temporary Dispensation of Requirement to Post Security by B K M Marine L L C. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(crt,Dauterive, C) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketCASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Dauterive, C) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketDIVISIONAL TRANSFER of Old Case Number 1:20-cv-1092 from Alexandria Division to Lafayette Division. New Case Number 6:20-cv-1092. (Wrong division selected at case opening) (crt,Dauterive, C) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4364122) filed by B K M Marine L L C. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Stipulation of Costs, #6 Ex Parte Motion, #7 Proposed order)(Attorney Jefferson R Tillery added to party BARGE MONCLA 102(pty:pet), Attorney Jefferson R Tillery added to party BKM MARINE, LLC(pty:pet))(aty,Tillery, Jefferson) Modified on 8/24/2020 to edit text (Dauterive, C). (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less