This case was last updated from PACER on 02/15/2020 at 08:18:27 (UTC).

In re Attorney Admission for Timothy J. Mayer

Case Summary

On 12/17/2019 In re Attorney Admission for Timothy J Mayer was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Danny C. Reeves. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-AA-00160

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Danny C. Reeves

 

Party Details

In Re

Attorney Admission Application

 

Court Documents

#2

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certificate of Attorney Admission(cc: COR w/letter and packet)(SKV) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY ADMISSION ORDER . Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 1/24/2020. (cc: COR)(TDA) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketAttorney Admission Order Submitted to Judge Danny C. Reeves(TDA) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) KY Bar Check Completed(LFV) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Application for Attorney Admission from Timothy J. Mayer (Attachments: #1 Authorization and Release, #2 Affidavit Sponsor - Lena Seward, #3 Receipt)(JJ) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.