This case was last updated from PACER on 08/16/2019 at 07:45:13 (UTC).

In re Attorney Admission for Joe Lucas Roberts

Case Summary

On 06/17/2019 In re Attorney Admission for Joe Lucas Roberts was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Karen K. Caldwell. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-AA-00072

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Karen K. Caldwell

 

Party Details

In Re

Attorney Admission Application

 

Court Documents

#4

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Certificate of Attorney Admission(cc: COR w/letter and packet)(SKV) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY ADMISSION ORDER . Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 7/1/2019. (cc: COR)(TDA) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Attorney Admission Order Submitted to Judge Karen K. Caldwell(TDA) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) KY Bar Check Completed(LFV) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Application for Attorney Admission from Joe Lucas Roberts (Attachments: #1 Authorization and Release, #2 Affidavit of sponsor Catherine York, #3 Receipt)(SLH) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.