This case was last updated from PACER on 02/24/2020 at 08:18:19 (UTC).

In Re: Attorney Admission

Case Summary

On 12/26/2019 In Re Attorney Admission was filed as a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John A. Jarvey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-AT-00001

  • Filing Date:

    12/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Iowa Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John A. Jarvey

 

Party Details

In Re

Attorney Admissions

 

Court Documents

24 #1

Certificates

#24

(#24) SDIA ORDER of Admission as to: Mary Katherine Spellman,Jeffrey Robert Kappelman,Jesse R. Dill of Milwaukee, John Arnvig Flaten, Ryan Dorcey, T. Ivan Kling,Grace Ellen Mangieri, Charissa Lois Flege, Rhiannon Baker, Alec Jacob Modrick, Lori Lee Nelson,Lauren Nichole Camp, Kevin Bernard Patrick,Wilford L. Forker,Christopher D. Jerram,Abdullah Mohamed Azkalany, Cara S. Donels,Daniel Van Sant and Kylie E. Crawford. Signed by Chief Judge John A. Jarvey on 2/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificates) (kjw) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

19 #26

Dennis Harms

19 #25

Crystal Settlemoir

19 #23

Jason Brown

19 #20

Lavanga Wijekoon

19 #15

Jorge Mares

19 #14

Francisco Guerra

19 #13

Peter Pratt

19 #12

Thomas Cauley

19 #11

Steven Sexton

19 #10

Kris McLean

19 #9

Joseph Harper

19 #4

Michelle Mahony

19 #3

Daniel Lenhoff

19 #2

Dennis O'Bryan

19 #1

*Restricted*

#19

(#19) PHV CM/ECF registration forms: Steven Belgrade (Attachments: #1 Patrick Cullinan)(kjw) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/3/2020: #2 Dennis O'Bryan, #3 Daniel Lenhoff, #4 Michelle Mahony) (kjw). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/5/2020: #5 Lauren Hartz, #6 Ishan Bhabha, #7 Jacob Plattenberger, #8 Eric Pearson) (kjw). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/6/2020: #9 Joseph Harper, #10 Kris McLean) (kjw). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/10/2020: #11 Steven Sexton, #12 Thomas Cauley) (slg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/11/2020: #13 Peter Pratt) (slg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/11/2020: #14 Francisco Guerra, #15 Jorge Mares) (slg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/12/2020: #16 Daniel Kelley) (slg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/13/2020: #17 Kathryn Siegel) (slg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/13/2020: #18 Edward Fox, #19 Thomas Kenny) (slg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/13/2020: #20 Lavanga Wijekoon) (slg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/14/2020: #21 Beth Boland, #22 Mark Christensen) (slg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/14/2020: #23 Jason Brown, #24 Ryan Bates) (slg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/19/2020: #25 Crystal Settlemoir) (kjw). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/20/2020: #26 Dennis Harms) (kjw). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/21/2020: #27 Timothy Katsiff, #28 Aliza Karetnick) (kjw). (Entered: 02/03/2020)

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) SDIA ORDER of Admission as to: Mary Katherine Spellman,Jeffrey Robert Kappelman,Jesse R. Dill of Milwaukee, John Arnvig Flaten, Ryan Dorcey, T. Ivan Kling,Grace Ellen Mangieri, Charissa Lois Flege, Rhiannon Baker, Alec Jacob Modrick, Lori Lee Nelson,Lauren Nichole Camp, Kevin Bernard Patrick,Wilford L. Forker,Christopher D. Jerram,Abdullah Mohamed Azkalany, Cara S. Donels,Daniel Van Sant and Kylie E. Crawford. Signed by Chief Judge John A. Jarvey on 2/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificates) (kjw) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) PHV CM/ECF registration forms: Steven Belgrade (Attachments: #1 Patrick Cullinan)(kjw) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/3/2020: #2 Dennis O'Bryan, #3 Daniel Lenhoff, #4 Michelle Mahony) (kjw). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/5/2020: #5 Lauren Hartz, #6 Ishan Bhabha, #7 Jacob Plattenberger, #8 Eric Pearson) (kjw). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/6/2020: #9 Joseph Harper, #10 Kris McLean) (kjw). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/10/2020: #11 Steven Sexton, #12 Thomas Cauley) (slg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/11/2020: #13 Peter Pratt) (slg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/11/2020: #14 Francisco Guerra, #15 Jorge Mares) (slg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/12/2020: #16 Daniel Kelley) (slg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/13/2020: #17 Kathryn Siegel) (slg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/13/2020: #18 Edward Fox, #19 Thomas Kenny) (slg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/13/2020: #20 Lavanga Wijekoon) (slg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/14/2020: #21 Beth Boland, #22 Mark Christensen) (slg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/14/2020: #23 Jason Brown, #24 Ryan Bates) (slg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/19/2020: #25 Crystal Settlemoir) (kjw). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/20/2020: #26 Dennis Harms) (kjw). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/21/2020: #27 Timothy Katsiff, #28 Aliza Karetnick) (kjw). (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PHV CM/ECF registration forms: Terran Chambers (slg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/7/2020: #1 Thomas McCarthy, #2 Cameron Norris, #3 Constantine Haloulos) (kjw). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/8/2020: #4 Andrew Faes, #5 Peter Talevich) (kjw). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/9/2020: #6 Brian Aleinikoff, #7 Tim J. Luetkemeyer) (kjw). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/10/2020: #8 Ross Chaffin) (kjw). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/13/2020: #9 Justin Bagdady) (slg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/15/2020: #10 Stanton Gallegos, #11 Matthew Levin, #12 John Tyner) (slg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/16/2020: #13 Arthur Shaffer) (slg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/16/2020: #14 Trevor Brown) (slg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/29/2020: #15 Syed Huda) (slg). (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less