This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/11/2022 at 07:58:40 (UTC).

In Re: Arthur J. Gallagher Data Breach Litigation

Case Summary

On 01/10/2022 In Re Arthur J Gallagher Data Breach Litigation was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Mary M. Rowland. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00137

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mary M. Rowland

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Tracey Bock

Jason Myers

John Parsons

Julia Kroll

Alan Wellikoff

Amanda Marr

Peter Horning

Brent McDonald

Arda Yeremian

Chandra Wilson

Christopher Caswell

John Owens

Robert Davis

Jonathon Mitchell

Leslie May

Defendants

Arthur J. Gallagher & Co.

Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc.

In Re

Arthur J Gallagher

Arthur J. Gallagher Data Breach Litigation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gary M. Klinger

Attorney at Mason Lietz & Klinger LLP

227 W. Monroe Street, Suite 2100

Chicago, IL 60606

John A. Yanchunis

Attorney at Morgan & Morgan, Complex Litigation Group

201 N. Franklin Street, 7Th Floor

Tampa, FL 33602

Timothy Gordon Blood

Attorney at Blood Hurst & O'reardon, Llp

501 West Broadway, Suite 1490

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorneys

Livia McCammon Kiser

Attorney at King and Spalding LLP

110 N Wacker Drive, Suite 3800

Chicago, IL 60606

Andrew E. Nieland

Attorney at King & Spalding

110 N Wacker Drive, Suite 3800

Chicago, IL 60606

Jade R. Lambert

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP

110 N Wacker Drive, Suite 3800

Chicago, IL 60606

Tatum Ellis

Attorney at King & Spalding

110 North Upper Wacker Drive, Suite 3800

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: The Honorable Mary M. Rowland is currently assigned Myers et al v. Arthur J. Gallagher & Co. et al., 21-cv-04056 and Magistrate Judge Gilbert as the designated magistrate judge. The parties previously filed an unopposed Motion to reassign and consolidate related cases pursuant to Local Rule 40.4 and Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(a); and Honorable Mary M. Rowland has granted the motion in Order 16 agreeing that all related cases should be consolidated. The Executive Committee has reviewed the unopposed motion #13 and order 16 ; therefore For case effective management procedures, it is hereby ORDERED that the Clerk of Court open a new civil case and caption the case: IN RE: ARTHUR J. GALLAGHER DATA BREACH LITIGATION; and It is further ordered that the cases previously identified by the Honorable Mary M. Rowland as related 21-cv-04056, Myers et al v. Arthur J. Gallagher & Co. et al, 21-cv-04415, Bock v. Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc. et al, 21-cv-04554, Villalobos v. Arthur J. Gallagher & Co., 21-cv-05851, May v. Arthur J. Gallagher & Co., shall be assigned to Judge Rowland and Judge Gilbert as the magistrate judge, and all other pending and future actions arising out of the same or similar operative facts now pending or hereafter filed in, removed to, or transferred to this District, shall be reassigned to Judge Rowland and Magistrate Judge Gilbert designated as a related case; and It is further ordered that the Clerk of Court shall open a new civil case (22- cv-137, IN RE: ARTHUR J. GALLAGHER DATA BREACH LITIGATION) under which all future filings related to this matter shall be filed; and It is further ordered that the Clerk shall docket a copy of this order in all referenced cases. The underlying cases shall remain open until disposition. Judge Rowland shall enter a case management order to direct parties on future filing procedures in light of this Order. Signed by the Executive Committee on 1/10/2022. (sm, ) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

#2

(#2) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Arthur J. Gallagher & Co., Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc. (Kiser, Livia) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

#3

(#3) MEMORANDUM by Arthur J. Gallagher & Co. in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #2 (Memorandum of Law in Support of Gallagher's Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Complaint) (Kiser, Livia) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

#4

(#4) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Arthur J. Gallagher & Co., Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc. (Gallagher Motion to Dismiss the Complaint of Leslie May) (Kiser, Livia) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

#5

(#5) MEMORANDUM by Arthur J. Gallagher & Co., Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc. in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #4 (Memorandum of Law In Support of Gallagher's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint of Leslie May) (Kiser, Livia) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

#6

(#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Response to defendants' motion to dismiss due 3/18/22 reply due 4/15/22. The response is limited to 40 pages and the reply is not to exceed 20 pages, excluding signatures. Mailed notice. (dm, ) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

#7

(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Arthur J. Gallagher & Co., Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc. by Tatum Ellis (Ellis, Tatum) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

#8

(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Tracey Bock, Jason Myers, John Parsons, Julia Kroll, Alan Wellikoff, Amanda Marr, Peter Horning, Brent McDonald, Arda Yeremian, Chandra Wilson, Christopher Caswell, John Owens, Robert Davis, Jonathon Mitchell by Gary M. Klinger (Klinger, Gary) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#9

(#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Arthur J. Gallagher & Co., Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc. by Livia McCammon Kiser (Kiser, Livia) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

#10

(#10) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Arthur J. Gallagher & Co., Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc. by Jade R. Lambert (Lambert, Jade) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

#11

(#11) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Arthur J. Gallagher & Co., Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc. by Andrew E. Nieland (Nieland, Andrew) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

#12

(#12) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Leslie May by Timothy Gordon Blood (Blood, Timothy) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

#13

(#13) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Christopher Caswell by John A. Yanchunis (Yanchunis, John) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Christopher Caswell by John A. Yanchunis (Yanchunis, John) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Leslie May by Timothy Gordon Blood (Blood, Timothy) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Arthur J. Gallagher & Co., Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc. by Andrew E. Nieland (Nieland, Andrew) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Arthur J. Gallagher & Co., Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc. by Jade R. Lambert (Lambert, Jade) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Arthur J. Gallagher & Co., Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc. by Livia McCammon Kiser (Kiser, Livia) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Tracey Bock, Jason Myers, John Parsons, Julia Kroll, Alan Wellikoff, Amanda Marr, Peter Horning, Brent McDonald, Arda Yeremian, Chandra Wilson, Christopher Caswell, John Owens, Robert Davis, Jonathon Mitchell by Gary M. Klinger (Klinger, Gary) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Arthur J. Gallagher & Co., Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc. by Tatum Ellis (Ellis, Tatum) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Response to defendants' motion to dismiss due 3/18/22 reply due 4/15/22. The response is limited to 40 pages and the reply is not to exceed 20 pages, excluding signatures. Mailed notice. (dm, ) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEMORANDUM by Arthur J. Gallagher & Co., Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc. in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #4 (Memorandum of Law In Support of Gallagher's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint of Leslie May) (Kiser, Livia) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Arthur J. Gallagher & Co., Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc. (Gallagher Motion to Dismiss the Complaint of Leslie May) (Kiser, Livia) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MEMORANDUM by Arthur J. Gallagher & Co. in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #2 (Memorandum of Law in Support of Gallagher's Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Complaint) (Kiser, Livia) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Arthur J. Gallagher & Co., Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc. (Kiser, Livia) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: The Honorable Mary M. Rowland is currently assigned Myers et al v. Arthur J. Gallagher & Co. et al., 21-cv-04056 and Magistrate Judge Gilbert as the designated magistrate judge. The parties previously filed an unopposed Motion to reassign and consolidate related cases pursuant to Local Rule 40.4 and Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(a); and Honorable Mary M. Rowland has granted the motion in Order 16 agreeing that all related cases should be consolidated. The Executive Committee has reviewed the unopposed motion #13 and order 16 ; therefore For case effective management procedures, it is hereby ORDERED that the Clerk of Court open a new civil case and caption the case: IN RE: ARTHUR J. GALLAGHER DATA BREACH LITIGATION; and It is further ordered that the cases previously identified by the Honorable Mary M. Rowland as related 21-cv-04056, Myers et al v. Arthur J. Gallagher & Co. et al, 21-cv-04415, Bock v. Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc. et al, 21-cv-04554, Villalobos v. Arthur J. Gallagher & Co., 21-cv-05851, May v. Arthur J. Gallagher & Co., shall be assigned to Judge Rowland and Judge Gilbert as the magistrate judge, and all other pending and future actions arising out of the same or similar operative facts now pending or hereafter filed in, removed to, or transferred to this District, shall be reassigned to Judge Rowland and Magistrate Judge Gilbert designated as a related case; and It is further ordered that the Clerk of Court shall open a new civil case (22- cv-137, IN RE: ARTHUR J. GALLAGHER DATA BREACH LITIGATION) under which all future filings related to this matter shall be filed; and It is further ordered that the Clerk shall docket a copy of this order in all referenced cases. The underlying cases shall remain open until disposition. Judge Rowland shall enter a case management order to direct parties on future filing procedures in light of this Order. Signed by the Executive Committee on 1/10/2022. (sm, ) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Arthur J. Gallagher & Co. is a litigant

Latest cases where Gallagher Bassett Services is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew E. Nieland

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jade R. Lambert