This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/14/2023 at 06:33:53 (UTC).

In Re: Art And Architecture Books Of The 21st Century

Case Summary

On 09/24/2021 In Re Art And Architecture Books Of The 21st Century was filed as a Bankruptcy - Withdrawal lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is John W. Holcomb. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-07652

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Withdrawal

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John W. Holcomb

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sam Leslie

Debtor and Counter Defendant

Art and Architecture Books of The 21st Century

Defendants

ACE New York Corporation

ACE New York, Inc.

Ace Museum

Douglas Chrismas

400 S. La Brea, LLC

Jennifer Kellen

Cathay Bank

Daryoush Dayan

Kamran Gharibian

Michael D. Smith

Counter Claimant and Defendant

Douglas Chrismas

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Victor A Sahn

Attorney at GreenspoonMarder, LLP

333 South Grand Avenue Suite 3400

Los Angeles, CA 90071

David John Richardson

Attorney at Baker Hostetler, LLP

11601 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Stephen Paul Sorensen

Attorney at Thomas Alexander Forrester and Sorensen LLP

14 27Th Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

Carolyn A Dye

Attorney at Law Office of Carolyn A. Dye

15030 Ventura Boulevard Suite 527

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

Jason Daniel Balitzer

Attorney at SulmeyerKupetz APC

333 South Hope Street 35Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-1406

Steven W Thomas

Attorney at Thomas, Alexander and Forrester LLP

1635 Village Center Circle Suite 160

Las Vegas, NV 89134

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Alan W Forsley

Attorney at FLP Law Group LLP

1875 Century Park East Suite 2230

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Jonathan S Shenson

Attorney at Greenberg Glusker Fields Claman and Machtinger LLP

2049 Century Park East Suite 2600

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Keith Patrick Banner

Attorney at Greenberg Glusker Fields Claman and Machtinger LLP

2049 Century Park East, Suite 2600

Los Angeles, CA 90067-4590

Michael Warren Vivoli

Attorney at Vivoli Saccuzzo LLP

3104 Fourth Avenue

San Diego, CA 92103

Ronald Rus

Attorney at Brown Rudnick LLP

2211 Michelson Drive 7Th Floor

Irvine, CA 92612

Brian Leslie Davidoff

Attorney at Greenberg Glusker Fields Claman and Machtinger LLP

2049 Century Park East Suite 2600

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Fahim Farivar

Attorney at Farivar Law Firm, APC

18321 Ventura Boulevard Suite 750

Tarzana, CA 91356

Michael Sobkowiak

Attorney at Friedman Law Group PC

1901 Avenue Of The Stars, Ste 1000

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Elliot C. Harvey Schatmeier

Attorney at Bird Marella Boxer Wolpert Nessim Drooks Lincenberg & Rhow

1875 Century Park East 23Rd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Ekwan E. Rhow

Attorney at Bird Marella Boxer Wolpert Nessim Drooks Lincenberg Rhow PC

1875 Century Park East, Suite 2300

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

#1

2 #2

Main Document

2 #1

USBC Adversary Docket

2 #2

USBC Docket

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error, this case was initially assigned in error to Judge Fitzgerald. This case is now assigned to Judge Holcomb.. The case will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-07652 JWH. (rn) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

#4

(#4) STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (dgo) (Entered: 08/31/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF MATTER BASED ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF DEFENDANT DOUGLAS CHRISMAS'S FIRST AMENDED COUNTER-COMPLAINT ON FIRST, THIRD, AND FOURTH CLAIMS FOR RELIEF REGARDING "ARMAN" ARTWORK, AND FOR SANCTIONS PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF BANKRUPTCY PROCEDURE 9033, AND BY ANALOGY, RULE L.R. 72-3.5 OF THE LOCAL RULES OF THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA AND ORDER. (yl) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF MATTER BASED ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF DEFENDANT DOUGLAS CHRISMAS'S FIRST AMENDED COUNTER-COMPLAINT ON FIRST, THIRD, AND FOURTH CLAIMS FOR RELIEF REGARDING "ARMAN" ARTWORK, AND FOR SANCTIONS PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF BANKRUPTCY PROCEDURE 9033, AND BY ANALOGY, RULE L.R. 72-3.5 OF THE LOCAL RULES OF THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA AND ORDER. (yl) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (dgo) (Entered: 08/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error, this case was initially assigned in error to Judge Fitzgerald. This case is now assigned to Judge Holcomb.. The case will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-07652 JWH. (rn) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of The United Bankruptcy Court to the United States District Court for the Central District of California on Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Adjudication of Defendant Douglas Chrismas's First Amended Counter-Complaint on First, Third, and Fourth Claims for Relief Regarding Arman Artwork, and for Sanctions. (Attachments: #1 USBC Adversary Docket, #2 USBC Docket) (lh) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REFERRAL OF BANKRUPTCY MATTER: Re: Report and Recommendation entered on 9/24/2021 by Bankruptcy Judge Robert N. Kwan, received and assigned to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald for all further proceedings. Bankruptcy Court case number: 2:13-bk-14135-RK, Adversary number: 2:15-ap-01679-RK, BAP case number: None. (lh) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Art and Architecture Books of the 21st Century is a litigant

Latest cases where 400 S. LA BREA LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where CATHAY BANK A CALIFORNIA BANK AND LENDER is a litigant