This case was last updated from PACER on 11/16/2019 at 07:02:47 (UTC).

In Re Application of Akebia Therapeutics, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/17/2019 In Re Application of Akebia Therapeutics, Inc was filed as a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Susan van Keulen. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-MC-80225

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan van Keulen

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Akebia Therapeutics, Inc.

Respondent

Lee Flippin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Alexis Jordan Pfeiffer

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP

950 Page Mill Road

Palo Alto, CA 94304

Robert M. Galvin

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr LLP

950 Page Mill Road

Palo Alto, CA 94304

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ORDER GRANTING #1 Ex Parte Application Authorizing Service of a Deposition Subpoena filed by Akebia Therapeutics, Inc. (svklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2019) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

#5

(#5) Proposed Order re #1 Application to provide Testimony of Dr. Lee Flippin by Akebia Therapeutics, Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2019) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE disclosure statement by Akebia Therapeutics, Inc. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2019) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by Akebia Therapeutics, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Fibrogen, Inc., Corporate Parent Otsuka Canada Pharmaceutical, Inc., for Akebia Therapeutics, Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2019) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

2 #2

Exhibit

2 #1

Exhibit

#2

(#2) Declaration of David Tait in Support of #1 Application to Provide Testimony of Dr. Lee Flippin filed by Akebia Therapeutics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #1 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2019) Modified on 9/17/2019 (cv, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/17/2019)

1 #1

receipt

#1

(#1) Ex Parte Application to Provide Testimony of Dr. Lee Flippin.. Filed by Akebia Therapeutics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 receipt)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2019) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER GRANTING #1 Ex Parte Application Authorizing Service of a Deposition Subpoena filed by Akebia Therapeutics, Inc. (svklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2019) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Proposed Order re #1 Application to provide Testimony of Dr. Lee Flippin by Akebia Therapeutics, Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2019) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE disclosure statement by Akebia Therapeutics, Inc. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2019) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by Akebia Therapeutics, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Fibrogen, Inc., Corporate Parent Otsuka Canada Pharmaceutical, Inc., for Akebia Therapeutics, Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2019) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Declaration of David Tait in Support of #1 Application to Provide Testimony of Dr. Lee Flippin filed by Akebia Therapeutics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #1 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2019) Modified on 9/17/2019 (cv, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Ex Parte Application to Provide Testimony of Dr. Lee Flippin.. Filed by Akebia Therapeutics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 receipt)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2019) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AKEBIA THERAPEUTICS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert M. Galvin

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alexis Pfeiffer