5:20-CV-02587
12/16/2020
Pending - Other Pending
Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy
California Central District
Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr
John W. Holcomb
Anibal Silva
Anibal Mesala Silva
Rod Danielson
Brian Scott Thomley
(#15) Limited Opposition to Appellants Notice Of Motion For An Order To Vacate The Order Of The Bankruptcy Court Granting Rod Danielsons Motion To Waive Lbr 3015-1(J) Or In The Alternative, To Extend The Time To File Opening Brief For Appeals Case 5:20-Cv-02587 re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Vacate Order of the Bankruptcy Court Granting Trustee's Motion for Waiver of LBR 3015-1(j) #13 filed by Appellee Rod Danielson. (Attorney Brian Scott Thomley added to party Rod Danielson(pty:e))(Thomley, Brian) (Entered: 01/29/2021)
(#14) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Vacate Order of the Bankruptcy Court Granting Trustee's Motion for Waiver of LBR 3015-1(j) #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Pretrial and trial Documents-Joint Rule 26(f) plan. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (yl) (Entered: 01/29/2021)
(#12) NOTICE RE: BANKRUPTCY RECORD COMPLETE. Please note, pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8010(b)(3), this Court has received from the Clerk of the Bankruptcy Court either the record for the above-captioned appeal or notice that the record is available electronically. The parties are responsible for reading and complying with all requirements, including briefing, provided in this notice. Appellant must serve and file a brief by 2/18/2021. (lom) (Entered: 01/21/2021)
(#11) Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability re Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court Order/Judgment #1 ; Election to Transfer Appeal to District Court (statement) #2 ; Notice of Referral of Appeal (Adversary) #3 ; Notice Regarding Appeal from Bankruptcy Court (CV-26) #5 . The undersigned deputy clerk of the United States Bankruptcy Court certifies that the record on appeal is complete and is available electronically on the case docket. The transcript status is as follows: No transcripts were requested by either the Appellant or Appellee. (lom) (Entered: 01/21/2021)
(#10) ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb: granting #9 APPLICATION for Pro Se Electronic Filing. The applicant must register to use the Courts CM/ECF System within five (5) days of being served with this order. Registration information is available at the Pro Se Litigant E-Filing web page located on the Courts website. Upon registering, the applicant will receive a CM/ECF login and password that will allow him/her to file non-sealed documents electronically in this case only. Any documents being submitted under seal must be manually filed with the Clerk. (yl) (Entered: 01/11/2021)
(#9) APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by Plaintiff Anibal Silva. (yl) (Entered: 01/07/2021)
(#8) AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL filed by Appellant Anibal Mesala Silva. Amendment to Notice of Appeal #1 . (bm) (Entered: 12/22/2020)
(#7) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 5:20-cv-02345 JWH. Case transferred from Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr to Judge John W. Holcomb for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:20-cv-02587 JWH. Signed by Judge John W. Holcomb (rn) (Entered: 12/17/2020)
(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 12/16/2020)
(#5) NOTICE REGARDING APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. The appeal has been assigned to Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. Refer to the Notice for specifics. (esa) (Entered: 12/16/2020)
(#4) U.S. Bankruptcy Appellate Panel of the Ninth Circuit Notice of Transfer of Appeal to District Court. Receipt acknowledged by U.S. District Court on 12/16/20. (esa) (Entered: 12/16/2020)
(#3) NOTICE OF REFERRAL OF APPEAL to the Bankruptcy Appellate Panel of the Ninth Circuit prepared by the United States Bankruptcy Court on 12/1/20. (esa) (Entered: 12/16/2020)
(#2) STATEMENT OF ELECTION TO TRANSFER APPEAL TO DISTRICT COURT filed by Appellee Rod Danielson. (esa) (Entered: 12/16/2020)
BAP Dkt
(#1) NOTICE OF APPEAL Re: Tentative ruling of Trustee's Verified Motion for Waiver of LBR 3015-1(j) entered on 11/30/20 by Bankruptcy Judge Scott Yun, filed in the Bankruptcy Court on 12/1/20. Bankruptcy Court case number: 6:19-bk-10026 SY, Adversary number: NA, BAP case number: cc-20-1266., filed by appellant Anibal Silva. (Attachments: #1 BAP Dkt) (esa) Modified on 12/16/2020 (esa). (Entered: 12/16/2020)
Docket(#16) REPLY in support of motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Vacate Order of the Bankruptcy Court Granting Trustee's Motion for Waiver of LBR 3015-1(j) #13 filed by Appellant Anibal Silva. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits in Support of Reply Memorandum for Motion to Vacate Bankruptcy Order Granting Trustee's Motion for Waiver of LBR 3015-1(j))(Silva, Anibal) (Entered: 02/04/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#15) Limited Opposition to Appellants Notice Of Motion For An Order To Vacate The Order Of The Bankruptcy Court Granting Rod Danielsons Motion To Waive Lbr 3015-1(J) Or In The Alternative, To Extend The Time To File Opening Brief For Appeals Case 5:20-Cv-02587 re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Vacate Order of the Bankruptcy Court Granting Trustee's Motion for Waiver of LBR 3015-1(j) #13 filed by Appellee Rod Danielson. (Attorney Brian Scott Thomley added to party Rod Danielson(pty:e))(Thomley, Brian) (Entered: 01/29/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#14) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Vacate Order of the Bankruptcy Court Granting Trustee's Motion for Waiver of LBR 3015-1(j) #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Pretrial and trial Documents-Joint Rule 26(f) plan. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (yl) (Entered: 01/29/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#13) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Vacate Order of the Bankruptcy Court Granting Trustee's Motion for Waiver of LBR 3015-1(j) filed by Appellant Anibal Silva. Motion set for hearing on 2/26/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge John W. Holcomb. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Silva, Anibal) (Entered: 01/26/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#12) NOTICE RE: BANKRUPTCY RECORD COMPLETE. Please note, pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8010(b)(3), this Court has received from the Clerk of the Bankruptcy Court either the record for the above-captioned appeal or notice that the record is available electronically. The parties are responsible for reading and complying with all requirements, including briefing, provided in this notice. Appellant must serve and file a brief by 2/18/2021. (lom) (Entered: 01/21/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#11) Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability re Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court Order/Judgment #1 ; Election to Transfer Appeal to District Court (statement) #2 ; Notice of Referral of Appeal (Adversary) #3 ; Notice Regarding Appeal from Bankruptcy Court (CV-26) #5 . The undersigned deputy clerk of the United States Bankruptcy Court certifies that the record on appeal is complete and is available electronically on the case docket. The transcript status is as follows: No transcripts were requested by either the Appellant or Appellee. (lom) (Entered: 01/21/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#10) ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb: granting #9 APPLICATION for Pro Se Electronic Filing. The applicant must register to use the Courts CM/ECF System within five (5) days of being served with this order. Registration information is available at the Pro Se Litigant E-Filing web page located on the Courts website. Upon registering, the applicant will receive a CM/ECF login and password that will allow him/her to file non-sealed documents electronically in this case only. Any documents being submitted under seal must be manually filed with the Clerk. (yl) (Entered: 01/11/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#9) APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by Plaintiff Anibal Silva. (yl) (Entered: 01/07/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#8) AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL filed by Appellant Anibal Mesala Silva. Amendment to Notice of Appeal #1 . (bm) (Entered: 12/22/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#7) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 5:20-cv-02345 JWH. Case transferred from Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr to Judge John W. Holcomb for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:20-cv-02587 JWH. Signed by Judge John W. Holcomb (rn) (Entered: 12/17/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 12/16/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#5) NOTICE REGARDING APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. The appeal has been assigned to Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. Refer to the Notice for specifics. (esa) (Entered: 12/16/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#4) U.S. Bankruptcy Appellate Panel of the Ninth Circuit Notice of Transfer of Appeal to District Court. Receipt acknowledged by U.S. District Court on 12/16/20. (esa) (Entered: 12/16/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#3) NOTICE OF REFERRAL OF APPEAL to the Bankruptcy Appellate Panel of the Ninth Circuit prepared by the United States Bankruptcy Court on 12/1/20. (esa) (Entered: 12/16/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#2) STATEMENT OF ELECTION TO TRANSFER APPEAL TO DISTRICT COURT filed by Appellee Rod Danielson. (esa) (Entered: 12/16/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#1) NOTICE OF APPEAL Re: Tentative ruling of Trustee's Verified Motion for Waiver of LBR 3015-1(j) entered on 11/30/20 by Bankruptcy Judge Scott Yun, filed in the Bankruptcy Court on 12/1/20. Bankruptcy Court case number: 6:19-bk-10026 SY, Adversary number: NA, BAP case number: cc-20-1266., filed by appellant Anibal Silva. (Attachments: #1 BAP Dkt) (esa) Modified on 12/16/2020 (esa). (Entered: 12/16/2020)
[-] Read Less