This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/09/2022 at 08:39:37 (UTC).

In re Amie Adelia Vague, et al (Panel: Judge Watkins, Judge Proctor, Judge Beaverstock)

Case Summary

On 05/10/2022 In re Amie Adelia Vague, Panel Judge Watkins, Judge Proctor, Judge Beaverstock was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Middle District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is William Keith Watkins. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-MC-03977

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William Keith Watkins

 

Party Details

In Re

Amie Adelia Vague

Birmingham, AL 35203

Jeffrey P. Doss

Birmingham, AL 35203

Melody H. Eagan

Birmingham, AL 35203

Adam Menke Katz

Boston, MA 02116

Andrew Daniel Barr

Denver, CO 80202

Carl Solomon Charles

New York, NY 10005

Chase Strangio

New York, NY 10004-2454

Dale Melchert

Oakland, CA 94612

Elizabeth Fri Reinhardt

Boston, MA 02116

James D. Esseks

New York, NY 10004

Julie Michelle Veroff

San Francisco, CA 94111

Kaitlin Welborn

Montgomery, AL 36106

Katelyn Kang

New York, NY 10001-2157

Kathleen Roberta Hartnett

San Francisco, CA 94111

LaTisha Gotell Faulks

Montgomery, AL 36106

Lisa Nowlin-Sohl

New York, NY 10004-2454

Lynly Serena Egyes

Brooklyn, NY 11238

Malita Vencienzo Picasso

New York, NY 10004-2454

Milo Rohr Inglehart

Brooklyn, NY 11238

Robby L.R. Saldana

Washington, DC 20004-2400

18 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

In Re Attorneys

Amie A. Vague

Attorney at Lightfoot Franklin & White LLC

400 20Th Street North

Birmingham, AL 35203

Jeffrey P. Doss

Attorney at Lightfoot, Franklin & White LLC

The Clark Bldg - 400 20Th St N

Birmingham, AL 35203

Melody Hurdle Eagan

Attorney at Lightfoot Franklin & White LLC

400 20Th Street North; The Clark Building

Birmingham, AL 35203

Adam Menke Katz

Attorney at Cooley LLP

500 Boylston Street, 14Th Floor

Boston, MA 02116

Andrew Daniel Barr

Attorney at Cooley LLP

1144 15Th Street, Suite 2300

Denver, CO 80202

Carl Solomon Charles

Attorney at Lambda Legal

120 Wall Street, 19Th Floor

New York, NY 10005

Chase Bachrach Strangio

Attorney at American Civil Liberties Union

125 Broad Street, Floor 18

New York, NY 10004-2454

Dale Melchert

Attorney at Transgender Law Center

Po Box 70976

Oakland, CA 94612

Elizabeth Fri Reinhardt

Attorney at Cooley LLP

500 Boylston Street, 14Th Floor

Boston, MA 02116

James Dixon Esseks

Attorney at America Civil Liberties Union Foundation

125 Broad Street; 18Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

Julie Michelle Veroff

Attorney at Cooley LLP

3 Embarcadero Center, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Kaitlin Elizabeth Welborn

Attorney at ACLU of Alabama

Po Box 6179

Montgomery, AL 36106

Katelyn Kang

Attorney at Cooley LLP

55 Hudson Yards

New York, NY 10001-2157

Kathleen Roberta Hartnett

Attorney at Cooley LLP

3 Embarcadero Center, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Latisha Gotell Faulks

Attorney at ACLU of Alabama

P O Box 6179

Montgomery, AL 36106

Lisa Nowlin-Sohl

Attorney at American Civil Liberties Union

125 Broad Street, Floor 18

New York, NY 10004-2454

Lynly Serena Egyes

Attorney at Transgender Law Center

594 Dean Street, Suite 11

Brooklyn, NY 11238

Malita Vencienzo Picasso

Attorney at American Civil Liberties Union

125 Broad Street, Floor 18

New York, NY 10004-2454

Milo Rohr Inglehart

Attorney at Transgender Law Center

594 Dean Street, Suite 11

Brooklyn, NY 11238

Robby L. R. Saldana

Attorney at Cooley LLP

1299 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20004-2400

29 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) ORDER: The preliminary proceeding in this matter will continue at 10:00 AM Central Daylight Time on 8/3/2022 through 8/4/2022, in Courtroom 2F of the Frank M. Johnson Jr. U.S. Courthouse in Montgomery, AL; All counsel listed will appear in person and give statements and answer questions under oath and subject to sequestration orders, as further set out in order; In order to streamline the proceeding, on or before 7/27/2022, the following attorneys SHALL, pursuant to 28 USC 1746, file in camera with each member of the panel a declaration, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins, Honorable Judge R. David Proctor, and Honorable Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 7/8/2022. (Furn: Calendar, wr) (bes, ) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

#21

(#21) Joint Submission of the Parties by Gilbert Oladeinbo, Misty L. Peterson, J. Andrew Pratt, Brent P. Ray, Adam Reinke, Michael B. Shortnacy, Abigail Hoverman Terry re #19 Order. (Wheeler, Jennifer) Modified on 6/25/2022 to clarify the docket text (bes, ). (Entered: 06/24/2022)

#20

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#19

(#19) ORDER: Based upon the discussions during the status conference held this date, counsel for the parties are DIRECTED to file on or before Friday, June 24, 2022, at 4:00 p.m., Central Time, a consolidated statement that outlines a procedure for concluding this matter. To the extent there is lack of consensus among the parties as to the exact procedures, the differences shall be noted. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 6/17/2022. (cwl, ) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

#17

(#17) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Matthew Kutcher ( Filing fee $ 75.00 receipt number AALMDC-3240032.) by Andrew Daniel Barr, Tara Lynn Borelli, Carl Solomon Charles, Lynly Serena Egyes, James D. Esseks, LaTisha Gotell Faulks, Kathleen Roberta Hartnett, Zoe Wynne Helstrom, Milo Rohr Inglehart, Katelyn Kang, Adam Menke Katz, Dale Melchert, Lisa Nowlin-Sohl, Valeria Marie Pelet Del Toro, Malita Vencienzo Picasso, Elizabeth Fri Reinhardt, Robby L.R. Saldana, Chase Strangio, Sruti J. Swaminathan, Julie Michelle Veroff, Kaitlin Welborn. (Ragsdale, Barry) Modified on 6/16/2022 to add requesting atty (bes, ). (Entered: 06/16/2022)

#16

(#16) ORDER granting informal request from counsel for the parties for a status conference; Status Conference set for 6/17/2022 at 01:00 PM via Zoom; The conference call will be attended by counsel for the parties; In advance of the conference, counsel for the parties will receive an email with a link to join the conference, as further set out in order; At the conference, counsel SHALL share with the court any suggestions about how the court can fairly and efficiently conclude this matter. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins, Honorable Judge R. David Proctor, and Honorable Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 6/13/2022. (wcl, ) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Bruce Frederick Rogers on behalf of Gilbert Oladeinbo, Misty L. Peterson, J. Andrew Pratt, Brent P. Ray, Adam Reinke, Michael B. Shortnacy, Abigail Hoverman Terry (Rogers, Bruce) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Hanson Wheeler on behalf of Gilbert Oladeinbo, Misty L. Peterson, J. Andrew Pratt, Brent P. Ray, Adam Reinke, Michael B. Shortnacy, Abigail Hoverman Terry (Wheeler, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

#13

No Description Available

12 #1

Corrected Certificate of Service

12 #12

Main Document

#11

No Description Available

#10

No Description Available

#9

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert David Segall on behalf of Jennifer L. Levi, Scott D. McCoy, Asaf Orr, Diego Armando Soto, Jessica L. Stone, Sarah Warbelow, Cynthia Weaver (Segall, Robert) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

#6

(#6) ORDER: the Court ORDERS as follows: 1) Court guests, including the press and non-participants, are prohibited from possessing and using any electronic devices in Courtrooms 2D, 2E or 2F during the upcoming hearings in this matter, except as allowed below. The attorneys and members of their respective staffs may possess and use electronic or photographic technology in the proceedings for the sole purpose of presenting evidence; 2) Members of the press and media shall be allowed to possess cellular phones, laptop computers, and/or tablets in Courtroom 2D and the media room provided that these electronic devices shall be allowed: (1) for the purposes of taking notes, personal communication unrelated to the proceedings, and accessing information only; and (2) on the condition that no photographs, audio or video recording, or live broadcasting, including digitally sharing, posting, or microblogging via social or other media, be conducted in the courthouse. All devices shall be registered with court security upon entry into the building. All are reminded of the prohibitions regarding photographing, recording and/or broadcasting court proceedings. See Local Rule 83.4. Violators may face sanctions including contempt of court, restricted entry to future proceedings, denial of entry to future proceedings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Id. Nothing in this order shall be construed as an unreasonable restriction on the constitutional rights of any individual. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 5/19/2022. (wcl, ) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

#4

(#7) TEXT ORDER: The #4 motion for Russell Capone to appear pro hac vice is GRANTED. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 5/19/2022. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, ) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER: The preliminary proceeding in this matter will continue at 10:00 AM Central Daylight Time on 8/3/2022 through 8/4/2022, in Courtroom 2F of the Frank M. Johnson Jr. U.S. Courthouse in Montgomery, AL; All counsel listed will appear in person and give statements and answer questions under oath and subject to sequestration orders, as further set out in order; In order to streamline the proceeding, on or before 7/27/2022, the following attorneys SHALL, pursuant to 28 USC 1746, file in camera with each member of the panel a declaration, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins, Honorable Judge R. David Proctor, and Honorable Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 7/8/2022. (Furn: Calendar, wr) (bes, ) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Joint Submission of the Parties by Gilbert Oladeinbo, Misty L. Peterson, J. Andrew Pratt, Brent P. Ray, Adam Reinke, Michael B. Shortnacy, Abigail Hoverman Terry re #19 Order. (Wheeler, Jennifer) Modified on 6/25/2022 to clarify the docket text (bes, ). (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable R. David Proctor, Honorable William Keith Watkins and Honorable Jeffrey Uhlman Beaverstock: Status Conference held on 6/17/2022 (PDF available for court use only). (Court Reporter Patricia Starkie.) (war, ) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER: Based upon the discussions during the status conference held this date, counsel for the parties are DIRECTED to file on or before Friday, June 24, 2022, at 4:00 p.m., Central Time, a consolidated statement that outlines a procedure for concluding this matter. To the extent there is lack of consensus among the parties as to the exact procedures, the differences shall be noted. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 6/17/2022. (cwl, ) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) TEXT ORDER: granting #17 Motion for Matthew Kutcher to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 6/17/2022. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cwl, ) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***PURSUANT TO THE #17 PHV MOTION - Attorney Matthew Kutcher for Andrew Daniel Barr, Tara Lynn Borelli, Carl Solomon Charles, Lynly Serena Egyes, James D. Esseks, LaTisha Gotell Faulks, Kathleen Roberta Hartnett, Zoe Wynne Helstrom, Milo Rohr Inglehart, Katelyn Kang, Adam Menke Katz, Dale Melchert, Lisa Nowlin-Sohl, Valeria Marie Pelet Del Toro, Malita Vencienzo Picasso, Elizabeth Fri Reinhardt, Robby L.R. Saldana, Chase Strangio, Sruti J. Swaminathan, Julie Michelle Veroff, Kaitlin Welborn added. (No PDF attached to this entry) (bes, ) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Matthew Kutcher ( Filing fee $ 75.00 receipt number AALMDC-3240032.) by Andrew Daniel Barr, Tara Lynn Borelli, Carl Solomon Charles, Lynly Serena Egyes, James D. Esseks, LaTisha Gotell Faulks, Kathleen Roberta Hartnett, Zoe Wynne Helstrom, Milo Rohr Inglehart, Katelyn Kang, Adam Menke Katz, Dale Melchert, Lisa Nowlin-Sohl, Valeria Marie Pelet Del Toro, Malita Vencienzo Picasso, Elizabeth Fri Reinhardt, Robby L.R. Saldana, Chase Strangio, Sruti J. Swaminathan, Julie Michelle Veroff, Kaitlin Welborn. (Ragsdale, Barry) Modified on 6/16/2022 to add requesting atty (bes, ). (Entered: 06/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER granting informal request from counsel for the parties for a status conference; Status Conference set for 6/17/2022 at 01:00 PM via Zoom; The conference call will be attended by counsel for the parties; In advance of the conference, counsel for the parties will receive an email with a link to join the conference, as further set out in order; At the conference, counsel SHALL share with the court any suggestions about how the court can fairly and efficiently conclude this matter. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins, Honorable Judge R. David Proctor, and Honorable Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 6/13/2022. (wcl, ) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Bruce Frederick Rogers on behalf of Gilbert Oladeinbo, Misty L. Peterson, J. Andrew Pratt, Brent P. Ray, Adam Reinke, Michael B. Shortnacy, Abigail Hoverman Terry (Rogers, Bruce) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Hanson Wheeler on behalf of Gilbert Oladeinbo, Misty L. Peterson, J. Andrew Pratt, Brent P. Ray, Adam Reinke, Michael B. Shortnacy, Abigail Hoverman Terry (Wheeler, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert David Segall on behalf of Jennifer L. Levi, Scott D. McCoy, Asaf Orr, Diego Armando Soto, Jessica L. Stone, Sarah Warbelow, Cynthia Weaver (Segall, Robert) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) TEXT ORDER: The #4 motion for Russell Capone to appear pro hac vice is GRANTED. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 5/19/2022. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, ) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: the Court ORDERS as follows: 1) Court guests, including the press and non-participants, are prohibited from possessing and using any electronic devices in Courtrooms 2D, 2E or 2F during the upcoming hearings in this matter, except as allowed below. The attorneys and members of their respective staffs may possess and use electronic or photographic technology in the proceedings for the sole purpose of presenting evidence; 2) Members of the press and media shall be allowed to possess cellular phones, laptop computers, and/or tablets in Courtroom 2D and the media room provided that these electronic devices shall be allowed: (1) for the purposes of taking notes, personal communication unrelated to the proceedings, and accessing information only; and (2) on the condition that no photographs, audio or video recording, or live broadcasting, including digitally sharing, posting, or microblogging via social or other media, be conducted in the courthouse. All devices shall be registered with court security upon entry into the building. All are reminded of the prohibitions regarding photographing, recording and/or broadcasting court proceedings. See Local Rule 83.4. Violators may face sanctions including contempt of court, restricted entry to future proceedings, denial of entry to future proceedings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Id. Nothing in this order shall be construed as an unreasonable restriction on the constitutional rights of any individual. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 5/19/2022. (wcl, ) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***PURSUANT TO THE #4 MOTION - Attorney Russell Capone for Andrew Daniel Barr, Kathleen Roberta Hartnett, Zoe Wynne Helstrom, Katelyn Kang, Adam Menke Katz, Valeria Marie Pelet Del Toro, Elizabeth Fri Reinhardt, Robby L.R. Saldana, & Julie Michelle Veroff added. (NO PDF attached to this entry) (am, ) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) TEXT ORDER: Before the court is a #2 Notice of Appearance filed on behalf of several attorneys ordered to appear before the three-judge panel. To be clear, absent receipt of an excusal, each counsel referenced in the caption of the 5/10/2022 #1 Order SHALL physically appear on 5/20/2022 at 9:30 A.M. in Courtroom 2F of the Frank M. Johnson Jr. U.S. Courthouse and be prepared to answer the panels questions. Signed by Honorable R. David Proctor on 5/19/2022. (NO PDF attached to this entry)(am, ) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Motion for Admission of Russell Capone Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $75.00 receipt number AALMDC-3224068.) by Andrew Daniel Barr, Kathleen Roberta Hartnett, Zoe Wynne Helstrom, Katelyn Kang, Adam Menke Katz, Valeria Marie Pelet Del Toro, Elizabeth Fri Reinhardt, Robby L.R. Saldana, Julie Michelle Veroff. (Ragsdale, Barry) Modified on 5/19/2022 to add PHV attorney's name (am, ). (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Pre-Hearing Submission of Walker Counsel Walker Plaintiffs Counsel filed by Andrew Daniel Barr, Tara Lynn Borelli, Carl Solomon Charles, Lynly Serena Egyes, James D. Esseks, LaTisha Gotell Faulks, Kathleen Roberta Hartnett, Zoe Wynne Helstrom, Milo Rohr Inglehart, Katelyn Kang, Adam Menke Katz, Dale Melchert, Lisa Nowlin-Sohl, Valeria Marie Pelet Del Toro, Malita Vencienzo Picasso, Elizabeth Fri Reinhardt, Robby L.R. Saldana, Chase Strangio, Sruti J. Swaminathan, Julie Michelle Veroff, Kaitlin Welborn. (Ragsdale, Barry) Modified on 5/19/2022 to clarify text as reflected in pleading (am, ). (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Barry Alan Ragsdale on behalf of Andrew Daniel Barr, Tara Lynn Borelli, Carl Solomon Charles, Lynly Serena Egyes, James D. Esseks, LaTisha Gotell Faulks, Kathleen Roberta Hartnett, Zoe Wynne Helstrom, Milo Rohr Inglehart, Katelyn Kang, Adam Menke Katz, Dale Melchert, Lisa Nowlin-Sohl, Valeria Marie Pelet Del Toro, Malita Vencienzo Picasso, Elizabeth Fri Reinhardt, Robby L.R. Saldana, Chase Strangio, Sruti J. Swaminathan, Julie Michelle Veroff, Kaitlin Welborn (Ragsdale, Barry) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketNotification of Case Assignment to Judge Watkins, Judge Proctor, and Judge Beaverstock. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, ) Modified on 5/10/2022 to reflect all counsel listed in order have been noticed by e-notification (wcl, ). (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ORDER: Each counsel is ORDERED to appear before a three-judge panel in Courtroom 2F of the Frank M. Johnson Jr. U.S. Courthouse on 5/20/2022 at 9:30 A.M. to allow the panel to inquire about the issues raised by counsel's actions; The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to serve a copy of this order on each referenced counsel; In addition, the Clerk of Court is FURTHER DIRECTED to serve a copy of this order on Attorney General of Alabama Steve Marshall, Edmund Gerard LaCour Jr., Alexander Barrett Bowdre, James W. Davis, Thomas Alexander Wilson, and Benjamin Matthew Seiss' Although this proceeding will not be adversarial in nature, invited defense counsel may present any factual evidence they have that may assist the panel in determining whether there was any attempt to circumvent the random case assignment procedures of the United States District Courts for the Northern District of Alabama and the Middle District of Alabama. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins, Honorable Judge R. David Proctor, and Honorable Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 5/10/2022. (furn: calendar, wr) (wcl, ) Modified on 5/10/2022 to reflect all counsel listed in order have been noticed by e-notification (wcl, ). (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Carl S. Charles

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Melody H. Eagan(Designation Retained)