This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/12/2022 at 12:04:00 (UTC).

In Re 5019 Partners, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/11/2022 In Re 5019 Partners, LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Mark C. Scarsi. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00228

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark C. Scarsi

 

Party Details

Debtor and Appellant

5019 Partners, LLC

Appellee

Office of the United States Trustee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Nancy Y Korompis

Po Box 60011

Pasadena, CA 91116

Nancy Y. Korompis

Attorney at Korompis Law Offices

Po Box 60011

Pasadena, CA 91116

Appellee Attorneys

Kelly L Morrison

915 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Russell S Clementson

915 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Kelly Leigh Morrison

Attorney at Office of the United States Trustee

915 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Russell S. Clementson

Attorney at Office of the United States Trustee

915 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

USBap Docket

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF REFERRAL OF APPEAL (ADVERSARY) prepared by the United States Bankruptcy Court on 1/3/2022. (et) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF TRANSFER OF APPEAL TO DISTRICT COURT from U.S. Bankruptcy Panel of the Ninth Circuit. (et) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY APPEAL DOCUMENT DISCREPANCY regarding Order and Judgment not attached to the Notice of Appeal forwarded to Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (et) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE REGARDING APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. The appeal has been assigned to Judge Mark C. Scarsi. Refer to the Notice for specifics. (et) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#7

(#7) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MARK C. SCARSI upon filing of the complaint by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#8

(#8) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Russell S Clementson counsel for Appellee Office of the United States Trustee. Adding Russell Clementson as counsel of record for United States Trustee for Region 16 for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Appellee United States Trustee for Region 16. (Attorney Russell S Clementson added to party Office of the United States Trustee(pty:e))(Clementson, Russell) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#9

(#9) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: BANKRUPTCY APPEAL- ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION. Within fourteen days after filing the notice of appeal, Appellant must file the following with the Clerk of the Bankruptcy Court:A designation of record A statement of issues on appeal A notice regarding the ordering of transcripts. The file in this case lacks the papers that would show it is being timely prosecuted. Court, on its own motion, hereby orders Appellant(s) to show cause in writing no later than February 11, 2022 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. Failure to respond to the Order to Show Cause will result in the dismissal of this action. (lc) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

#11

(#11) AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL AND STATEMENT OF ELECTION ORDER: (1) GRANTING UNITED STATES TRUSTEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS BANKRUPTCY CASE; AND (2) PROHIBITING DEBTOR FROM FILING A NEW CASE UNDER TITLE 11 WITHOUT COURT PERMISSION filed 12/20/2021 by Bankruptcy Judge Vincent Zurzolo, filed in the Bankruptcy Court on 2/16/2022. Bankruptcy Court case number: 2:21-bk-18440-VZ #1 filed by Appellant 5019 Partners, LLC (lc) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

#10

(#10) MINUTE ORDER(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. The Court advised that within fourteen days after filing the notice of appeal, Appellant must file the following with the Clerk of the Bankruptcy Court: a designation of record, a statement of issues on appeal, and a notice regarding the ordering of transcripts. In addition, the Appellant was ordered to show cause in writing no later than February 11, 2022 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution and was warned that failure to respond to the Order to Show Cause would result in the dismissal of this action. Appellant has failed to comply. Accordingly, the Court hereby DISMISSES the instant case for lack of prosecution, without prejudice. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lom) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE ORDER(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. The Court advised that within fourteen days after filing the notice of appeal, Appellant must file the following with the Clerk of the Bankruptcy Court: a designation of record, a statement of issues on appeal, and a notice regarding the ordering of transcripts. In addition, the Appellant was ordered to show cause in writing no later than February 11, 2022 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution and was warned that failure to respond to the Order to Show Cause would result in the dismissal of this action. Appellant has failed to comply. Accordingly, the Court hereby DISMISSES the instant case for lack of prosecution, without prejudice. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lom) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL AND STATEMENT OF ELECTION ORDER: (1) GRANTING UNITED STATES TRUSTEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS BANKRUPTCY CASE; AND (2) PROHIBITING DEBTOR FROM FILING A NEW CASE UNDER TITLE 11 WITHOUT COURT PERMISSION filed 12/20/2021 by Bankruptcy Judge Vincent Zurzolo, filed in the Bankruptcy Court on 2/16/2022. Bankruptcy Court case number: 2:21-bk-18440-VZ #1 filed by Appellant 5019 Partners, LLC (lc) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: BANKRUPTCY APPEAL- ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION. Within fourteen days after filing the notice of appeal, Appellant must file the following with the Clerk of the Bankruptcy Court:A designation of record A statement of issues on appeal A notice regarding the ordering of transcripts. The file in this case lacks the papers that would show it is being timely prosecuted. Court, on its own motion, hereby orders Appellant(s) to show cause in writing no later than February 11, 2022 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. Failure to respond to the Order to Show Cause will result in the dismissal of this action. (lc) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Russell S Clementson counsel for Appellee Office of the United States Trustee. Adding Russell Clementson as counsel of record for United States Trustee for Region 16 for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Appellee United States Trustee for Region 16. (Attorney Russell S Clementson added to party Office of the United States Trustee(pty:e))(Clementson, Russell) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MARK C. SCARSI upon filing of the complaint by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE REGARDING APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. The appeal has been assigned to Judge Mark C. Scarsi. Refer to the Notice for specifics. (et) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY APPEAL DOCUMENT DISCREPANCY regarding Order and Judgment not attached to the Notice of Appeal forwarded to Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (et) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF TRANSFER OF APPEAL TO DISTRICT COURT from U.S. Bankruptcy Panel of the Ninth Circuit. (et) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF REFERRAL OF APPEAL (ADVERSARY) prepared by the United States Bankruptcy Court on 1/3/2022. (et) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF APPEAL AND STATEMENT OF ELECTION: Re: Order of Dismissal with Bar to Refiling entered on 12/20/2021 by Bankruptcy Judge Vincent Zurzolo, filed in the Bankruptcy Court on 12/23/2021. Bankruptcy Court case number: 2:21-bk-18440-VZ, Adversary number: None, BAP case number: CC-21-01282., filed by Appellant 5019 Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 USBap Docket) (et) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 5019 PARTNERS LLC A CALIFORNIA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kelly L Morrison

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Russell Clementson