This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/20/2022 at 08:22:24 (UTC).

Implicit, LLC v. The Home Depot, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/21/2022 Implicit, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against The Home Depot, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Victoria M. Calvert. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-02476

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Victoria M. Calvert

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Implicit, LLC

Defendants

The Home Depot, Inc.

Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.

Home Depot Solutions, LLC

Home Depot Store Support, Inc.

Home Depot Product Authority, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James M. Lennon

Daniel Arthur Kent

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) ORDER Granting #16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint. Defendants must answer, move, or otherwise plead in response to Plaintiff's complaint by September 12, 2022. Signed by Judge Victoria M. Calvert on August 9, 2022. (lwb) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

16 #1

Text of Proposed Order

16 #16

Main Document

#15

(#15) Return of Service Executed by Implicit, LLC. Home Depot Product Authority, LLC served on 7/22/2022, answer due 8/12/2022. (Lennon, James) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

14 #3

Executed Summons

14 #2

Executed Summons

14 #1

Executed Summons

14 #14

Main Document

#13

(#13) Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel. Daniel Arthur Kent replacing attorney Timothy Devlin. (Kent, Daniel) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

#12

(#12) Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Timothy Devlin. Clerk to follow-up by 7/22/2022. (cdg) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

#11

(#11) STANDING ORDER: GUIDELINES TO PARTIES AND COUNSEL IN CASES PROCEEDING BEFORE THE HONORABLE VICTORIA M. CALVERT. Signed by Judge Victoria M. Calvert on 7/7/2022. (kxm) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

#10

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

8 #8

*Restricted*

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B - Claim Chart

1 #1

Exhibit A - US Patent No 8,856,185

1 #1

Main Document

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

08/09/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#17) ORDER Granting #16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint. Defendants must answer, move, or otherwise plead in response to Plaintiff's complaint by September 12, 2022. Signed by Judge Victoria M. Calvert on August 9, 2022. (lwb) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#16) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, for Defendant, filed by Implicit, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kent, Daniel) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) Return of Service Executed by Implicit, LLC. Home Depot Product Authority, LLC served on 7/22/2022, answer due 8/12/2022. (Lennon, James) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) Return of Service Executed by Implicit, LLC. Home Depot Solutions, LLC served on 7/21/2022, answer due 8/11/2022; Home Depot Store Support, Inc. served on 7/21/2022, answer due 8/11/2022; Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. served on 7/21/2022, answer due 8/11/2022; The Home Depot, Inc. served on 7/21/2022, answer due 8/11/2022. (Attachments: #1 Executed Summons, #2 Executed Summons, #3 Executed Summons)(Lennon, James) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel. Daniel Arthur Kent replacing attorney Timothy Devlin. (Kent, Daniel) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Timothy Devlin. Clerk to follow-up by 7/22/2022. (cdg) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) STANDING ORDER: GUIDELINES TO PARTIES AND COUNSEL IN CASES PROCEEDING BEFORE THE HONORABLE VICTORIA M. CALVERT. Signed by Judge Victoria M. Calvert on 7/7/2022. (kxm) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) ORDER Granting #9 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of James Lennon. Signed by Judge Victoria M. Calvert on June 30, 2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(lwb) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2022
View Court Documents

DocketAPPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #9 APPLICATION for Admission of James Lennon Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11888140). Attorney James M. Lennon added appearing on behalf of Implicit, LLC (cdg) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/24/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) APPLICATION for Admission of James Lennon Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11888140).by Implicit, LLC. (Kent, Daniel) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 06/24/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (nmb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/23/2022: #1 Corrected AO 120) (nmb). (Entered: 06/23/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Implicit, LLC. (nmb) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Electronic Summons Issued as to The Home Depot, Inc.. (nmb) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Electronic Summons Issued as to Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (nmb) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Electronic Summons Issued as to Home Depot Store Support, Inc.. (nmb) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Electronic Summons Issued as to Home Depot Solutions, LLC. (nmb) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Home Depot Product Authority, LLC. (nmb) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Implicit, LLC. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11879054) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - US Patent No 8,856,185, #2 Exhibit B - Claim Chart, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 06/23/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less