This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/10/2022 at 09:53:21 (UTC).

Implicit, LLC v. Salesforce.com, LLC

Case Summary

On April 4, 2022, Implicit, LLC (“Implicit” or “Plaintiff”), represented by James M. Lennon and Timothy Devlin of Devlin Law Firm LLC, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against Salesforce.com, LLC (“Salesforce” or “Defendant”), seeking injunctive relief and damages, among other relief, for Defendant’s alleged infringement of Plaintiff’s United States Patents. This case was filed in U.S. District Court in the Western District of Texas with Judge Alan D. Albright presiding. 

The Plaintiff filed this complaint for the alleged infringement of United States Patent No. 7,774,740 (“the ’740 patent”); United States Patent No. 7,774,740 (“the ’740 patent”); United States Patent No. d 6,976,248 (“the ’248 patent”), collectively referred as “the patents”. 

In their complaint, Plaintiff claimed, “The patent resulted from the pioneering efforts of Mr. Edward Balassanian (hereinafter ‘the Inventor’) in the area of server architecture. These efforts resulted in the development of a method and apparatus for a server architecture that allows client computers to request and execute applets in 1998.”

Plaintiff also claimed, “Because of these significant advantages that can be achieved through the use of the patented invention, Implicit believes that the patents presents significant commercial value for companies like Salesforce.”

Plaintiff alleged, “Accordingly, the claims in the patents recite a combination of elements sufficient to ensure that the claim in substance and in practice amounts to significantly more than a patent ineligible abstract idea.”

Plaintiff also alleged, “Upon information and belief, Salesforce has and continues to directly infringe one or more claims of the ’740 patent by selling, offering to sell, making, using, and/or providing and causing to be used products, specifically its Salesforce products implementing Node.js, which by way of example include the Salesforce.com platform.”

Plaintiff then alleged, “Upon information and belief, Salesforce has and continues to directly infringe one or more claims of the ’075 patent by selling, offering to sell, making, using, and/or providing and causing to be used products, specifically its Salesforce products implementing Node.js, which by way of example include the Salesforce.com platform.”

Plaintiff further alleged, “Upon information and belief, the Accused Instrumentalities perform a method for delivering one or more applets to one or more client computers. Exemplary infringement analysis showing infringement of claim 1 of the ’075 patent is set forth in Exhibit E.”

Plaintiff finally alleged, “Upon information and belief, Salesforce has and continues to directly infringe one or more claims of the ’248 patent by selling, offering to sell, making, using, and/or providing and causing to be used products, specifically its Salesforce products implementing Node.js, which by way of example include the Salesforce.com platform.”

There are three claims for relief laid down by Plaintiff. The first claim alleged is for the alleged infringement of U.S. Patent No. 7,774,740. The second claim alleged is for the alleged infringement of the U.S. Patent No. 8,056,07. The third claim alleged is for the alleged infringement of U.S. Patent No. 6,976,248. 

In their prayer for relief, Plaintiff has requested the Court for injunctive reliefs and damages, along with reasonable attorneys’ fees and any other relief the Court deems just and proper.

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-00364

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Implicit, LLC

Defendants

Salesforce.com, LLC

Salesforce.com, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Timothy Devlin

James M. Lennon

 

Court Documents

7 #6

Exhibit F

7 #5

Exhibit E

7 #4

Exhibit D

7 #3

Exhibit C

7 #2

Exhibit B

7 #1

Exhibit A

#7

(#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants amending #1 Complaint, filed by Implicit, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(sv) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

#6

(#6) Standing Order Regarding Order Governing Proceedings Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Entered: 04/14/2022)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Salesforce.com, LLC. (sv) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#4

(#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Lennon, James) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

1 #7

Exhibit F

1 #6

Exhibit E

1 #5

Exhibit D

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15911590), filed by Implicit, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Lennon, James) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

8 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

04/20/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants amending #1 Complaint, filed by Implicit, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(sv) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/14/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Standing Order Regarding Order Governing Proceedings Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Entered: 04/14/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2022

DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (sv) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Salesforce.com, LLC. (sv) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2022

DocketAll parties shall flatten all documents before e-filing. All parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/ (Entered: 04/11/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Lennon, James) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Implicit, LLC. (Lennon, James) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Implicit, LLC. (Lennon, James) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15911590), filed by Implicit, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Lennon, James) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less