This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/03/2021 at 08:34:21 (UTC).

Imperial Group Hospitality, LLC v. Seneca Specialty Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 08/04/2021 Imperial Group Hospitality, LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Seneca Specialty Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is J. Philip Calabrese. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01518

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. Philip Calabrese

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Imperial Group Hospitality, LLC

Defendant

Seneca Specialty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jack Morrison, Jr.

Attorney at Amer Cunningham

One Cascade Plaza

Akron, OH 44308

Nathan P. Woodward

Attorney at Amer Cunningham

One Cascade Plaza

Akron, OH 44308

Thomas A. Marino, II

Attorney at Amer Cunningham

One Cascade Plaza

Akron, OH 44308

Defendant Attorney

Robert E. Chudakoff

Attorney at Ulmer & Berne - Cleveland

1100 Skylight Office Tower, 1660 West Second Street

Cleveland, OH 44113

 

Court Documents

#13

12 #1

Acknowledgement and Agreement to be Bound

12 #12

Main Document

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

5 #1

Rule 26 Report of Parties

5 #5

Main Document

4 #1

Policy of Insurance

4 #4

Main Document

#3

#2

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Order Setting Mediation Conference for 12/22/2021 at 10:00 a.m. via video conference (Cleveland) before Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. Confidential Mediation Statements due 12/15/2021. All parties and lead counsel are ordered to appear for the conference by Zoom videoconferencing. Parties with ultimate settlement authority must also be present. Counsel will receive, via email, an invite to the scheduled mediation conference, as well as instructions regarding usage. Counsel in turn, shall forward the invite and instructions to their clients, and are responsible for ensuring their clients' participation in the conference. Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg on 9/30/2021. (S,S) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketOrder: Under N.D. Ohio Local Rule 16.4(e), this matter is referred to United States Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg for mediation. Counsel will receive further instructions from Judge Greenberg's Chambers. Judge J. Philip Calabrese on 9/29/2021. (Y,A) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Stipulated Protective Order. Judge J. Philip Calabrese on 9/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Acknowledgement and Agreement to be Bound)(Y,A) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order: The Court enters the following Case Management Order: Standard track. Case not referred to ADR at this time. Parties do not consent to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. The parties are to make initial disclosures by October 8, 2021. The parties agree the Court should enter a protective order, pursuant to Appendix L to the Local Rules, which the Court will do by separate entry. If necessary, the Court will schedule the next status conference after mediation. Judge J. Philip Calabrese on 9/29/2021. (Y,A) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketMinutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge J. Philip Calabrese. The Court held a case management conference on September 29, 2021 at 2:00 p.m. Jack Morrison appeared for Plaintiff; Robert Chudakoff appeared for Defendant. The parties discussed the background of the case, the discovery that might be necessary, and the prospects of proceeding to early mediation. The parties agree that they would like to proceed to mediation after some limited discovery. Time: 45 minutes. (Y,A) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Report of Parties' Planning Meeting Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 26 (f) - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Seneca Specialty Insurance Company. Related document(s) #5 . (Chudakoff, Robert) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Attorney Appearance by Nathan P. Woodward filed by on behalf of Imperial Group Hospitality, LLC. (Woodward, Nathan) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice of Service of Initial Disclosures, filed by Imperial Group Hospitality, LLC. Related document(s) #7 . (Morrison, Jack) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) First Initial Disclosures to Defendant filed by Imperial Group Hospitality, LLC. (Morrison, Jack) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Imperial Group Hospitality, LLC. (Morrison, Jack) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketIMPORTANT: Notice [non-document]: At the request of the parties, the Case Management Conference previously scheduled for 9/15/2021 at 11:00 a.m is RESET to be held on 9/29/2021 at 2:00 P.M. in Chambers 16B before Judge J. Philip Calabrese. (Y,A) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 9/15/2021 at 11:00 a.m. in Chambers 16B before Judge J. Philip Calabrese. (Attachments: #1 Rule 26 Report of Parties) (Y,A) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand (Related Doc #1 ) filed by Seneca Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Policy of Insurance). (Chudakoff, Robert) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Magistrate Consent Form issued. (L,Ja) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketRandom Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (L,Ja) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketJudge J. Philip Calabrese assigned to case. (L,Ja) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Crum & Forster Holdings Corp., Corporate Parent Fairfax Financial Holdings, Ltd., Corporate Parent The North River Insurance Company for Seneca Specialty Insurance Company filed by Seneca Specialty Insurance Company. (Chudakoff, Robert) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County Common Pleas Court, case number CV-21-949507 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 402, receipt number AOHNDC-10968438.. Filed by Seneca Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Filings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Chudakoff, Robert) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SENECA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert E. Chudakoff