This case was last updated from PACER on 11/07/2020 at 08:44:27 (UTC).

Impact Force, Inc. v. Graves

Case Summary

On 09/08/2020 Impact Force, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Graves. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Terrence G. Berg and Anthony P. Patti. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-12458

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Terrence G. Berg

Referral Judge

Anthony P. Patti

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Impact Force, Inc

Defendant

John Graves

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrea M. Frailey

Attorney at Dykema Gossett PLLC

400 Renaissance Center

Detroit, MI 48243

James F. Hermon

Attorney at Dykema Gossett

400 Renaissance Center

Detroit, MI 48243

Defendant Attorneys

Michelle M. Bracke

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith

500 W. Madison, Suite 2300

Chicago,, IL 60661-2511

Jeffrey A. Goldwater

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgardd & Smith

550 W. Adams Street, Suite 300

Chicago, IL 60661

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 4/16/2021, Status Conference set for 4/19/2021 11:00 AM before District Judge Terrence G. Berg, Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 5/17/2021. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (Refer to image for additional dates) (AChu) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#9

(#9) DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Hermon, James) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Scheduling Conference set for 10/5/2020 10:30 AM before District Judge Terrence G. Berg (AChu) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by John Graves. (Bracke, Michelle) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea M. Frailey on behalf of Impact Force, Inc. (Frailey, Andrea) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jeffrey A. Goldwater appearing on behalf of John Graves (Goldwater, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle M. Bracke on behalf of John Graves. (Bracke, Michelle) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

#3

(#3) EXHIBIT A re #1 Notice of Removal, by John Graves (Bracke, Michelle) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE by John Graves re #1 Notice of Removal, and Civil Cover Sheet (Bracke, Michelle) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by John Graves from Wayne County, MI, case number 20-009494-CB. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8033595 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Bracke, Michelle) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 4/16/2021, Status Conference set for 4/19/2021 11:00 AM before District Judge Terrence G. Berg, Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 5/17/2021. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (Refer to image for additional dates) (AChu) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Terrence G. Berg: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 10/5/2020 (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (AChu) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Hermon, James) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Scheduling Conference set for 10/5/2020 10:30 AM before District Judge Terrence G. Berg (AChu) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by John Graves. (Bracke, Michelle) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea M. Frailey on behalf of Impact Force, Inc. (Frailey, Andrea) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jeffrey A. Goldwater appearing on behalf of John Graves (Goldwater, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiff Impact Force, Inc. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #1 Notice of Removal, (Bracke, Michelle) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketA United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SOso) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of Error directed to: Michelle M. Bracke re #1 Notice of Removal,. Parties listed on the initiating document were omitted. The filing attorney must use the docket event Addition of Parties to correct the error. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (SOso) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle M. Bracke on behalf of John Graves. (Bracke, Michelle) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) EXHIBIT A re #1 Notice of Removal, by John Graves (Bracke, Michelle) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE by John Graves re #1 Notice of Removal, and Civil Cover Sheet (Bracke, Michelle) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by John Graves from Wayne County, MI, case number 20-009494-CB. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8033595 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Bracke, Michelle) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less