This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/18/2022 at 08:21:46 (UTC).

Immigration & Customs Enforcement v. Mbaye

Case Summary

On 09/19/2022 Immigration Customs Enforcement filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against Mbaye. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Joseph H L Perez-Montes and Terry A Doughty. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-05281

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Joseph H L Perez-Montes

Presiding Judge

Terry A Doughty

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

USA

Defendant

Mouhamadou Mbaye

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shannon Thornhill Brown

Attorney at U S Attorneys Office (SHV)

300 Fannin St Ste 3201

Shreveport, LA 71101-3068

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) ORDER granting [] Motion for Emergency Court Order to Permit Involuntary Hydration, Nutrition, Blood Draws, Monitoring of Vital Signs, Weigh-Ins and Routine Medical Examination. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 9/20/2022. (crt,Crawford, A) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER granting [] Motion for Emergency Court Order to Permit Involuntary Hydration, Nutrition, Blood Draws, Monitoring of Vital Signs, Weigh-Ins and Routine Medical Examination. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 9/20/2022. (crt,Crawford, A) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketMotions Transferred regarding MOTION for Petition for Emergency Court Order to Permit Involuntary Hydration, Nutrition, Blood Draws, Monitoring of Vital Signs, Weigh-Ins and Routine Medical Examination. Motions referred to Judge Terry A Doughty. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketPetition for Emergency Court Order to Permit Involuntary Hydration, Nutrition, Blood Draws, Monitoring of Vital Signs, Weigh-Ins and Routine Medical Examination by USA. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/19/2022. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketCASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Mouhamadou Mbaye (Filed on behalf of USA - Filing Fee not required) filed by Immigration & Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of M Reaves, #3 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Dr. Z Fort, #4 Proposed order)(Attorney Shannon Thornhill Brown added to party Immigration & Customs Enforcement(pty:pla))(aty,Brown, Shannon) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shannon Thornhill Brown