This case was last updated from PACER on 09/22/2020 at 09:34:38 (UTC).

Imawan v. Kikiktagruk Inupiat Corporation

Case Summary

On 07/24/2020 Imawan filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Kikiktagruk Inupiat Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alaska District. The Judge overseeing this case is John W. Sedwick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00180

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alaska District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John W. Sedwick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fony Imawan

Defendant

Kikiktagruk Inupiat Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Isaac D. Zorea

Attorney at Law Office of Isaac Derek Zorea

Po Box 210434

Anchorage, AK 99521

Defendant Attorney

Elizabeth Pifke Hodes

Attorney at Davis Wright Tremaine LLP (Anch)

188 W Northern Lights Blvd., Suite 1100

Anchorage, AK 99503

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Discovery due by 5/14/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 11/16/2021. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 8/28/20. (RMC, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Filing Joint Scheduling Report by Kikiktagruk Inupiat Corporation re #6 Initial Case Status Report Order (Hodes, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

9 #1

Exhibit Entry of Appearance

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by Kikiktagruk Inupiat Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Entry of Appearance)(Hodes, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by Kikiktagruk Inupiat Corporation (Hodes, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

7 #1

Answer

#7

(#7) ERRATA re Answer by Kikiktagruk Inupiat Corporation #5 Answer to Complaint filed by Kikiktagruk Inupiat Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Answer)(Hodes, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER RE INITIAL SCHEDULING & PLANNING CONFERENCE REPORT: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 21 days of service of this order.. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 7/27/20. (RMC, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by Kikiktagruk Inupiat Corporation.(Hodes, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kikiktagruk Inupiat Corporation. (Hodes, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (KMC, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

#2

(#2) Civil Cover Sheet. (Hodes, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kikiktagruk Inupiat Corporation from Alaska Superior Court, case number 3AN-20-06701CI. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2912403), filed by Kikiktagruk Inupiat Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Hodes, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Discovery due by 5/14/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 11/16/2021. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 8/28/20. (RMC, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Filing Joint Scheduling Report by Kikiktagruk Inupiat Corporation re #6 Initial Case Status Report Order (Hodes, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by Kikiktagruk Inupiat Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Entry of Appearance)(Hodes, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by Kikiktagruk Inupiat Corporation (Hodes, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ERRATA re Answer by Kikiktagruk Inupiat Corporation #5 Answer to Complaint filed by Kikiktagruk Inupiat Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Answer)(Hodes, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER RE INITIAL SCHEDULING & PLANNING CONFERENCE REPORT: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 21 days of service of this order.. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 7/27/20. (RMC, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by Kikiktagruk Inupiat Corporation.(Hodes, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kikiktagruk Inupiat Corporation. (Hodes, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (KMC, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet. (Hodes, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kikiktagruk Inupiat Corporation from Alaska Superior Court, case number 3AN-20-06701CI. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2912403), filed by Kikiktagruk Inupiat Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Hodes, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less