This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/15/2022 at 08:16:58 (UTC).

ImageFiction, Inc. v. American Media, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/16/2021 ImageFiction, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against American Media, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Mary Kay Vyskocil. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-09463

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mary Kay Vyskocil

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ImageFiction, Inc.

Defendant

American Media, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James H. Freeman

Attorney at Liebowitz Law Firm, PLLC

1333A North Ave.Ste 762

New Rochelle, NY 10036

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit C

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Freeman, James) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to American Media, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by ImageFiction, Inc...(Freeman, James) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

#4

(#4) AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Freeman, James) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

#5

(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to American Media, Inc...(jgo) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

#6

(#6) AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights..(jgo) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. American Media, Inc. served on 11/22/2021, answer due 12/13/2021. Service was accepted by Patrick Duffy, Intake Specialist. Document filed by ImageFiction, Inc...(Freeman, James) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#8

(#8) ORDER: Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that any motion for entry of a default judgment shall be filed by January 24, 2022. Plaintiff is directed to follow the procedures applicable to default judgments under the Court's Individual Rules and Practices for Civil Cases, available at the Court's website. Failure to move for a default judgment by January 24, 2022 may result in dismissal of this action for failure to prosecute, pursuant to Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See LeSane v. Hall's Sec. Analyst, Inc., 239 F.3d 206, 209 (2d Cir. 2001). SO ORDERED. ( Motions due by 1/24/2022.) (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 1/3/2022) (tg) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

#9

(#9) PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by ImageFiction, Inc...(Freeman, James) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). Modified on 1/3/2022 (dt). (Entered: 01/03/2022)

#10

(#10) DECLARATION of James H. Freeman in Support re: #9 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default. Document filed by ImageFiction, Inc...(Freeman, James) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

#11

(#11) CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to Defendant American Media, Inc., issued 1/3/2022.(dt) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to Defendant American Media, Inc., issued 1/3/2022.(dt) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) DECLARATION of James H. Freeman in Support re: #9 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default. Document filed by ImageFiction, Inc...(Freeman, James) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by ImageFiction, Inc...(Freeman, James) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). Modified on 1/3/2022 (dt). (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER: Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that any motion for entry of a default judgment shall be filed by January 24, 2022. Plaintiff is directed to follow the procedures applicable to default judgments under the Court's Individual Rules and Practices for Civil Cases, available at the Court's website. Failure to move for a default judgment by January 24, 2022 may result in dismissal of this action for failure to prosecute, pursuant to Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See LeSane v. Hall's Sec. Analyst, Inc., 239 F.3d 206, 209 (2d Cir. 2001). SO ORDERED. ( Motions due by 1/24/2022.) (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 1/3/2022) (tg) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. American Media, Inc. served on 11/22/2021, answer due 12/13/2021. Service was accepted by Patrick Duffy, Intake Specialist. Document filed by ImageFiction, Inc...(Freeman, James) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights..(jgo) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to American Media, Inc...(jgo) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Freeman, James) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to American Media, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by ImageFiction, Inc...(Freeman, James) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Freeman, James) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against American Media, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25337869)Document filed by ImageFiction, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C).(Freeman, James) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James H. Freeman Esq.