This case was last updated from PACER on 04/24/2020 at 08:41:46 (UTC).

Image Processing Technologies, LLC v. Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. et al

Case Summary

On 02/24/2020 Image Processing Technologies, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Samsung Electronics Co , Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Rodney Gilstrap and Roy S. Payne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00050

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

Referral Judge

Roy S. Payne

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Image Processing Technologies, LLC

Defendants

Samsung Electronics America, Inc.

Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Henry Charles Bunsow

Attorney at Bunsow, De Mory LLP-Redwood

701 El Camino Real

Redwood City, CA 94063

Elizabeth L DeRieux

Attorney at Capshaw DeRieux LLP

114 E Commerce Avenue

Gladewater, TX 75647

Michael N Zachary

Attorney at Bunsow, De Mory LLP-Redwood

701 El Camino Real

Redwood City, CA 94063

Corey A Johanningmeier

Attorney at Bunsow, De Mory LLP-Redwood

701 El Camino Real

Redwood City, CA 94063

Nicholas Stephan Mancuso

Attorney at Bunsow, De Mory LLP-Redwood

701 El Camino Real

Redwood City, CA 94063

Denise M De Mory

Attorney at Bunsow, De Mory LLP-Redwood

701 El Camino Real

Redwood City, CA 94063

Defendant Attorneys

Earl Glenn Thames, Jr

Attorney at Potter Minton, a Professional Corporation

110 North College Avenue, Suite 500

Tyler, TX 75702

Marc J Pensabene

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers LLP - NY

7 Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Mark A Samuels

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers LLP - LA

400 South Hope Street

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Michael E Jones

Attorney at Potter Minton, a Professional Corporation

110 North College Avenue, Suite 500

Tyler, TX 75702

Patrick Colbert Clutter, IV

Attorney at Potter Minton, a Professional Corporation

110 North College Avenue, Suite 500

Tyler, TX 75702

Nicholas J Whilt

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers LLP - LA

400 South Hope Street

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Clarence Rowland

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers LLP - LA

400 South Hope Street

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Brian M Cook

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers LLP - LA

400 South Hope Street

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Ryan K Yagura

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers LLP - LA

400 South Hope Street

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Darin W Snyder

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers - San Francisco

Two Embarcadero Center, 28Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

102 #9

Text of Proposed Order

102 #8

Exhibit 28 Pensabene Supplemental Declaration

102 #6

Exhibit 26 Pensabene Supplemental Declaration

102 #5

Exhibit 25 Pensabene Supplemental Declaration

102 #4

Exhibit 24 Pensabene Supplemental Declaration

102 #3

Exhibit 23 Pensabene Supplemental Declaration

102 #2

Exhibit 22 Pensabene Supplemental Declaration

102 #1

Affidavit Supplemental Declaration of Marc J. Pensabene

#8

(#8) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne for all pretrial purposes. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/6/2020. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nicholas Stephan Mancuso on behalf of Image Processing Technologies, LLC (Mancuso, Nicholas) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Corey A Johanningmeier on behalf of Image Processing Technologies, LLC (Johanningmeier, Corey) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Denise M De Mory on behalf of Image Processing Technologies, LLC (De Mory, Denise) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

#3

(#3) DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - Pretrial Conference set for 4/7/2020 09:00 AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Jury Selection set for 4/13/2020 08:00AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Motions in Limine due by 3/17/2020.. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/28/2020. (nkl, ) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

2 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#2

(#2) Joint MOTION for Entry of Proposed Docket Control Order by Image Processing Technologies, LLC. (Zachary, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/28/2020: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ). (Entered: 02/28/2020)

#1

(#1) ORDER - ORDER granting (342 in case 2:16-cv-505) MOTION Renewed Motion to Lift Stay, Sever Certain Patents, and Set Scheduling Conference. ORDERS the parties to meet and confer and submit a joint proposed Docket Control Order for the severed case by 9:00 a.m. Friday, February 28, 2020. Court directs that jury selection and trial for the severed case is set on April 13, 2020, and that the pre-trial conference will be held on April 7, 2020 at 9:00 a.m..ORDERED that all issues and claims pertaining to Claim 1 of the 293 Patent arehereby SEVERED into a separate cause of action. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/24/2020. (ch, ) Modified on 2/25/2020 (ch, ). (Entered: 02/25/2020)

399 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#102) REDACTION to #98 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion,, Samsung's Opposition to IPT's Motions In Limine by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Supplemental Declaration of Marc J. Pensabene, #2 Exhibit 22 Pensabene Supplemental Declaration, #3 Exhibit 23 Pensabene Supplemental Declaration, #4 Exhibit 24 Pensabene Supplemental Declaration, #5 Exhibit 25 Pensabene Supplemental Declaration, #6 Exhibit 26 Pensabene Supplemental Declaration, #7 Exhibit 27 Pensabene Supplemental Declaration, #8 Exhibit 28 Pensabene Supplemental Declaration, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Pensabene, Marc) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#101) REDACTION to #99 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion,, Redacted IPT's Response to Samsung's Motions in limine by Image Processing Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Zachary Declaration, #2 Exhibit G-Q, S-T Sealed in their entirety, #3 Exhibit R, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Zachary, Michael) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#100) REDACTION to #92 SEALED PATENT MOTION Corrected Motion for Leave to Serve Second Supplemental Expert Report of Paul C. Benoit by Image Processing Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Zachary Declaration, #2 Exhibit A & B Sealed, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Zachary, Michael) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#99) SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re #76 SEALED PATENT MOTION - Samsung's Motions In Limine filed by Image Processing Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Zachary Declaration, #2 Exhibit G, #3 Exhibit H, #4 Exhibit I, #5 Exhibit J, #6 Exhibit K, #7 Exhibit L, #8 Exhibit M, #9 Exhibit N, #10 Exhibit O, #11 Exhibit P, #12 Exhibit Q, #13 Exhibit R, #14 Exhibit S, #15 Exhibit T, #16 Text of Proposed Order)(Zachary, Michael) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#98) SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re #78 SEALED MOTION IPT's Motions in Limine - Samsung's Opposition to IPT's Motions In Limine filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Supplemental Declaration of Marc J. Pensabene, #2 Exhibit 22 Pensabene Supplemental Declaration, #3 Exhibit 23 Pensabene Supplemental Declaration, #4 Exhibit 24 Pensabene Supplemental Declaration, #5 Exhibit 25 Pensabene Supplemental Declaration, #6 Exhibit 26 Pensabene Supplemental Declaration, #7 Exhibit 27 Pensabene Supplemental Declaration, #8 Exhibit 28 Pensabene Supplemental Declaration, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Pensabene, Marc) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#97) REDACTION to #90 SEALED PATENT MOTION - Samsung's Motion to Bifurcate Willfuness by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Darin W. Snyder, #2 Exhibit 1 Snyder Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 Snyder Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 Snyder Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 Snyder Declaration, #6 Exhibit 5 Snyder Declaration, #7 Exhibit 6 Snyder Declaration, #8 Exhibit 7 Snyder Declaration, #9 Exhibit 8 Snyder Declaration, #10 Exhibit 9 Snyder Declaration, #11 Exhibit 10 Snyder Declaration, #12 Exhibit 11 Snyder Declaration, #13 Exhibit 12 Snyder Declaration, #14 Exhibit 13 Snyder Declaration, #15 Exhibit 14 Snyder Declaration, #16 Exhibit 15 Snyder Declaration, #17 Exhibit 16 Snyder Declaration, #18 Exhibit 17 Snyder Declaration, #19 Text of Proposed Order)(Snyder, Darin) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#96) REDACTION to #89 SEALED PATENT MOTION - Samsung's Motion for Leave to File a Motion to Bifurcate and to Expedite Briefing by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Snyder, Darin) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#95) ORDER granting #93 Motion Regarding Briefing Schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 4/21/2020. (nkl, ) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#94) ORDER granting #89 Sealed Patent Motion for Leave to File a Motion to Bifurcate and to Expedite Briefing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 4/21/2020. (nkl, ) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#93) Joint MOTION Regarding Briefing Schedule re #92 SEALED PATENT MOTION Corrected Motion for Leave to Serve Second Supplemental Expert Report of Paul C. Benoit by Image Processing Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zachary, Michael) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
90 More Docket Entries
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne for all pretrial purposes. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/6/2020. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Joint SEALED MOTION Joint Disputed Motion For Relief Related To The Coronavirus (COVID-19) Outbreak by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Michael Zachary, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Marc Pensabene, #3 Exhibit 1 Pensabene Declaration, #4 Exhibit 2 Pensabene Declaration, #5 Exhibit 3 Pensabene Declaration, #6 Exhibit 4 Pensabene Declaration, #7 Exhibit 5 Pensabene Declaration, #8 Exhibit 6 Pensabene Declaration, #9 Exhibit 7 Pensabene Declaration, #10 Exhibit 8 Pensabene Declaration, #11 Exhibit 9 Pensabene Declaration, #12 Exhibit 10 Pensabene Declaration, #13 Exhibit 11 Pensabene Declaration, #14 Exhibit 12 Pensabene Declaration, #15 Exhibit 13 Pensabene Declaration, #16 Exhibit 14 Pensabene Declaration, #17 Exhibit 15 Pensabene Declaration, #18 Exhibit 16 Pensabene Declaration, #19 Exhibit 17 Pensabene Declaration, #20 Exhibit 18 Pensabene Declaration, #21 Exhibit 19 Pensabene Declaration, #22 Exhibit 20 Pensabene Declaration, #23 Exhibit 21 Pensabene Declaration, #24 Exhibit 22 Pensabene Declaration, #25 Text of Proposed Order)(Pensabene, Marc) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nicholas Stephan Mancuso on behalf of Image Processing Technologies, LLC (Mancuso, Nicholas) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Corey A Johanningmeier on behalf of Image Processing Technologies, LLC (Johanningmeier, Corey) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Denise M De Mory on behalf of Image Processing Technologies, LLC (De Mory, Denise) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - Pretrial Conference set for 4/7/2020 09:00 AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Jury Selection set for 4/13/2020 08:00AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Motions in Limine due by 3/17/2020.. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/28/2020. (nkl, ) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Joint MOTION for Entry of Proposed Docket Control Order by Image Processing Technologies, LLC. (Zachary, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/28/2020: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ). (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ORDER - ORDER granting (342 in case 2:16-cv-505) MOTION Renewed Motion to Lift Stay, Sever Certain Patents, and Set Scheduling Conference. ORDERS the parties to meet and confer and submit a joint proposed Docket Control Order for the severed case by 9:00 a.m. Friday, February 28, 2020. Court directs that jury selection and trial for the severed case is set on April 13, 2020, and that the pre-trial conference will be held on April 7, 2020 at 9:00 a.m..ORDERED that all issues and claims pertaining to Claim 1 of the 293 Patent arehereby SEVERED into a separate cause of action. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/24/2020. (ch, ) Modified on 2/25/2020 (ch, ). (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketJury Trial set for 4/13/2020 09:00 AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Pretrial Conference set for 4/7/2020 09:00 AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Jury Selection set for 4/13/2020 09:00AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketTHIS CASE WAS SEVERED FROM CASE 2:16-CV-505, PLEASE REFER BACK TO THAT CASE FOR CASE DOCUMENTS (ch, ) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Samsung Electronics America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Clarence Andrew Rowland

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marc J Pensabene

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian Merrill Cook