This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/07/2020 at 07:05:09 (UTC).

ILX Acquisition, Inc. v. Farrow Commercial, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/07/2020 ILX Acquisition, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Farrow Commercial, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles R. Breyer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00979

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles R. Breyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ILX Acquisition, Inc.

Defendant

Farrow Commercial, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brian D. Huben

Attorney at Ballard Spahr LLP

2029 Century Park East, Suite 800

Los Angeles, CA 90067-2909

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#5

#6

#7

#8

#10

10 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2020
  • Docket(#11) CLERK'S NOTICE: A Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/8/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/15/2020 at 8:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2020) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Charles R. Breyer for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 02/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2020) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • Docket(#9) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2020) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by ILX Acquisition, Inc... (Huben, Brian) (Filed on 2/24/2020) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Farrow Commercial, Inc. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2020) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Proposed Summons. (Huben, Brian) (Filed on 2/10/2020) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error Re: #3 Proposed Summons filed by ILX Acquisition, Inc. Summons is incomplete; missing attorney name and address. Please correct and re-file in it s entirety. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2020) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/5/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/12/2020 01:30 PM. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2020) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/24/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2020) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ***Refiled at #6 ****Proposed Summons. (Huben, Brian) (Filed on 2/7/2020) Modified on 2/11/2020 (ajsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by ILX Acquisition, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Diamond Resorts International, Inc. for ILX Acquisition, Inc.. (Huben, Brian) (Filed on 2/7/2020) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Farrow Commercial, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14156609.). Filed byILX Acquisition, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Huben, Brian) (Filed on 2/7/2020) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ILX ACQUISITIONS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian D. Huben