This case was last updated from PACER on 04/27/2020 at 07:00:54 (UTC).

Illumina Inc. et al v. BGI Genomics Co., Ltd. et al

Case Summary

On 02/27/2020 Illumina Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against BGI Genomics Co , Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is William H. Orrick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01465

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William H. Orrick

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Illumina Cambridge Ltd.

Illumina Inc.

Defendants

Complete Genomics Inc.

BGI Americas Corp.

MGI Tech Co., Ltd.

MGI Americas, Inc.

BGI Genomics Co., Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Krista M. Carter

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

3000 El Camino Real, Building 5, Suite 500

Palo Alto, CA 94306

Derek C. Walter

Attorney at Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP

201 Redwood Shores Parkway

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

Christopher S. Lavin

Attorney at Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP

201 Redwood Shores Parkway

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

Edward Robert Reines

Attorney at Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

201 Redwood Shores Parkway

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

Douglas Wayne McClellan

Attorney at Weil, Gotshal and Manges LLP

700 Louisiana Street, Suite 1700

Houston, TX 77002

Melissa LaRue Hotze

Attorney at Weil, Gotshal and Manges LLP

700 Louisiana Street, Suite 1700

Houston, TX 77002

Amanda Cruz Do Couto

Attorney at Weil, Gotshal and Manges LLP

700 Louisiana, Suite 1700

Houston, TX 77002

Wallace W. Wu

Attorney at Arnold & Porter LLP

777 S. Figueroa St., 44Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Jennifer Anne Sklenar

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

777 South Figueroa Street, Forty-Fourth Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017-5844

Jonathan Swisher

3 Embarcadero Center

San Francisco, CA 94111

Matthew M. Wolf

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

601 Massachusetts Ave., Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Joshua David Seitz

Attorney at Arnold and Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

3000 El Camino Real, Building 5, Suite 500

Palo Alto, CA 94306

Krista Marie Carter

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

3000 El Camino Real, Building 5, Suite 500, Suite 500

Palo Alto, CA 94306

Carson Dean Anderson

Attorney at Arnold and Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

3000 El Camino Real, Building 5, Suite 500

Palo Alto, CA 94306

Katie Jeannine Lewis Scott

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

5 Palo Alto Square, Suite 500, 3000 El Camino Real

Palo Alto, CA 94306

 

Court Documents

#74

73 #1

Exhibit A Redacted

67 #6

Declaration Blackburn Declaration (Redacted)

67 #5

*Restricted*

67 #4

Corrected Opposition Brief (Redacted)

67 #3

*Restricted*

67 #2

Proposed Order

67 #1

Declaration Anderson

#67

1 #39

Exhibit 39

1 #38

Exhibit 38

1 #37

Exhibit 37

1 #36

Exhibit 36

1 #35

Exhibit 35

1 #34

Exhibit 34

1 #33

Exhibit 33

1 #32

Exhibit 32

1 #31

Exhibit 31

427 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#74) NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Krista Marie Carter Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel - Krista M. Carter (Carter, Krista) (Filed on 4/24/2020) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#73) Declaration of Amanda C. Do Couto in Support of #67 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Corrected Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byIllumina Cambridge Ltd., Illumina Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Redacted)(Related document(s) #67 ) (Do Couto, Amanda) (Filed on 4/20/2020) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#72) Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting (123) Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document in case 3:19-cv-03770-WHO.Associated Cases: 3:19-cv-03770-WHO, 3:20-cv-01465-WHO. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2020) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#71) M Transcript of Proceedings held on 04/14/2020, before Magistrate Judge Hixson. Transcriber Pamela Batalo Hebel, telephone number 626-688-7509; pamela_batalo-hebel@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (65 in 3:20-cv-01465-WHO) Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 5/7/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/18/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/15/2020. (Batalo, Pam) (Filed on 4/16/2020) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#70) Declaration of Amanda C. Do Couto in Support of #59 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Opposition to Preliminary Injunction and Supporting Documents filed byIllumina Cambridge Ltd., Illumina Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #59 ) (Do Couto, Amanda) (Filed on 4/15/2020) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#69) Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #21 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Amanda Cruz De Couto. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2020) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#68) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) (Corrected) filed byBGI Americas Corp., Complete Genomics Inc., MGI Americas, Inc., MGI Tech Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Blackburn, #2 Declaration Rodgers, #3 Declaration Smith, #4 Declaration Sutherland, #5 Declaration Zhao, #6 Proposed Order)(Scott, Katie) (Filed on 4/14/2020) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Corrected Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by BGI Americas Corp., Complete Genomics Inc., MGI Americas, Inc., MGI Tech Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Anderson, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Corrected Opposition Brief (Sealed), #4 Corrected Opposition Brief (Redacted), #5 Declaration Blackburn Declaration (Sealed), #6 Declaration Blackburn Declaration (Redacted), #7 Declaration Smith Declaration (Sealed), #8 Declaration Smith Declaration (Redacted), #9 Declaration Zhao Declaration (Sealed), #10 Declaration Zhao Declaration (Redacted))(Anderson, Carson) (Filed on 4/14/2020) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#66) Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #29 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Douglas McClellan. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2020) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 4/14/2020 before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson by Illumina Cambridge Ltd., Illumina Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 4/14/2020) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
55 More Docket Entries
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Illumina Cambridge Ltd., Illumina Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher S. Lavin, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Declaration of Mark Van Oene, #4 Unredacted Version of Declaration of Mark Van Oene, #5 Sealed Version of Ex.D to the Declaration of Mark Van Oene)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 2/27/2020) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher S. Lavin (Lavin, Christopher) (Filed on 2/27/2020) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Derek C. Walter (Walter, Derek) (Filed on 2/27/2020) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Illumina Cambridge Ltd., Illumina Inc... (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 2/27/2020) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Patent Infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 2/27/2020) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Certificate of Interested Entities by Illumina Cambridge Ltd. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 2/27/2020) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certificate of Interested Entities by Illumina Inc. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 2/27/2020) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by Illumina Cambridge Ltd., Illumina Inc. of Related Cases (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 2/27/2020) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons to BGI Genomics Co. LTD., #2 Summons to Complete Genomics Inc., #3 Summons to MGI Americas Inc., #4 Summons to MGI Tech Co., LTD.)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 2/27/2020) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement: Jury Trial Demanded against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14225332.). Filed byIllumina Inc., Illumina Cambridge Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit 50, #51 Exhibit 51, #52 Exhibit 52, #53 Exhibit 53, #54 Exhibit 54, #55 Exhibit 55, #56 Civil Cover Sheet)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 2/27/2020) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BGI GENOMICS CO., LTD. is a litigant