This case was last updated from PACER on 03/30/2020 at 18:48:34 (UTC).

Illumina, Inc. et al v. BGI Genomics Co., Ltd et al

Case Summary

On 06/27/2019 Illumina, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against BGI Genomics Co , Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are William H. Orrick and Thomas S. Hixson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-03770

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William H. Orrick

Referral Judge

Thomas S. Hixson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Illumina, Inc.

Illumina Cambridge Ltd.

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Complete Genomics Inc.

BGI Americas Corp.

BGI Genomics Co., Ltd

MGI Tech Co., Ltd.

MGI Americas, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Edward Robert Reines

Attorney at Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

201 Redwood Shores Parkway

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

Derek C. Walter

Attorney at Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP

201 Redwood Shores Parkway

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

Christopher S. Lavin

Attorney at Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP

201 Redwood Shores Parkway

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

Stephen P. Bosco

Attorney at Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

2001 M Street, Nw, Suite 600

Washington, DC 20036

Amanda Cruz Do Couto

Attorney at Weil, Gotshal and Manges LLP

700 Louisiana, Suite 1700

Houston, TX 77002

Douglas Wayne McClellan

700 Louisiana Street, Suite 1700

Houston, TX 77002

Sara Lynn Townsend

Attorney at Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP

201 Redwood Shores Pkwy, Suite 500

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Joshua David Seitz

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

3000 El Camino Real, Building 5, Suite 500

Palo Alto, CA 94306

Katie Jeannine Lewis Scott

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

5 Palo Alto Square, Suite 500, 3000 El Camino Real

Palo Alto, CA 94306

Jennifer Sklenar

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

601 Massachusetts Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20001-3743

Matthew M. Wolf

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

601 Massachusetts Ave., Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Carson Dean Anderson

Attorney at Arnold and Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

3000 El Camino Real, Building 5, Suite 500

Palo Alto, CA 94306

Wallace W. Wu

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

777 S. Figueroa St., 44Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Jonathan Swisher

Attorney at Arnold & Porter LLP

3 Embarcadero Center

San Francisco, CA 94111

Krista Marie Carter

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

3000 El Camino Real, Building 5, Suite 500, Suite 500

Palo Alto, CA 94306

Krista M. Carter

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

3000 El Camino Real, Building 5, Suite 500

Palo Alto, CA 94306

 

Court Documents

113 #10

Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Douglas W. McClellan

113 #9

Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Douglas W. McClellan

113 #8

Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Douglas W. McClellan

113 #7

Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Douglas W. McClellan

113 #6

Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Douglas W. McClellan

113 #3

Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Douglas W. McClellan

113 #2

Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Douglas W. McClellan

113 #1

Declaration of Douglas W. McClellan

#113

(#113) RESPONSIVE Claim Construction Brief Regarding U.S. Patent No. 9,944,984 filed by Illumina Cambridge Ltd., Illumina, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Douglas W. McClellan, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Douglas W. McClellan, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Douglas W. McClellan, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Douglas W. McClellan, #5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Douglas W. McClellan, #6 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Douglas W. McClellan, #7 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Douglas W. McClellan, #8 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Douglas W. McClellan, #9 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Douglas W. McClellan, #10 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Douglas W. McClellan)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 3/25/2020) Modified on 3/26/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/25/2020)

1 #26

Exhibit 26

1 #25

Exhibit 25

1 #22

Exhibit 22

1 #21

Exhibit 21

1 #20

Exhibit 20

1 #6

Exhibit 6

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

499 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#113) RESPONSIVE Claim Construction Brief Regarding U.S. Patent No. 9,944,984 filed by Illumina Cambridge Ltd., Illumina, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Douglas W. McClellan, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Douglas W. McClellan, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Douglas W. McClellan, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Douglas W. McClellan, #5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Douglas W. McClellan, #6 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Douglas W. McClellan, #7 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Douglas W. McClellan, #8 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Douglas W. McClellan, #9 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Douglas W. McClellan, #10 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Douglas W. McClellan)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 3/25/2020) Modified on 3/26/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#112) RESPONSIVE Claim Construction Brief Regarding U.S. Patent Nos. 7,566,537 and 9,410,200 filed by BGI Americas Corp., Complete Genomics Inc., MGI Americas, Inc., MGI Tech Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Katie J.L. Scott, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Katie J.L. Scott, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Katie J.L. Scott, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Katie J.L. Scott, #5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Katie J.L. Scott, #6 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Katie J.L. Scott, #7 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Katie J.L. Scott, #8 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Katie J.L. Scott, #9 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Katie J.L. Scott, #10 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Katie J.L. Scott, #11 Exhibit 10 to Declaration of Katie J.L. Scott, #12 Exhibit 11 to Declaration of Katie J.L. Scott, #13 Exhibit 12 to Declaration of Katie J.L. Scott, #14 Exhibit 13 to Declaration of Katie J.L. Scott, #15 Exhibit 14 to Declaration of Katie J.L. Scott, #16 Exhibit 15 to Declaration of Katie J.L. Scott, #17 Exhibit 16 to Declaration of Katie J.L. Scott, #18 Exhibit 17 to Declaration of Katie J.L. Scott, #19 Exhibit 18 to Declaration of Katie J.L. Scott, #20 Exhibit 19 to Declaration of Katie J.L. Scott, #21 Exhibit 20 to Declaration of Katie J.L. Scott, #22 Exhibit 21 to Declaration of Katie J.L. Scott, #23 Exhibit 22 to Declaration of Katie J.L. Scott, #24 Exhibit 23 to Declaration of Katie J.L. Scott, #25 Exhibit 24 to Declaration of Katie J.L. Scott, #26 Exhibit 25 to Declaration of Katie J.L. Scott, #27 Exhibit 26 to Declaration of Katie J.L. Scott, #28 Declaration of John D. Sutherland & Exhibit A)(Scott, Katie) (Filed on 3/25/2020) Modified on 3/26/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#111) ORDER RE BRIEFING AND DISCOVERY FOR PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION as to (11 in 3:20-cv-01465-WHO) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , (85 in 3:19-cv-03770-WHO) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Responses due by 4/10/2020. Replies due by 4/27/2020. Motion Hearing set for 5/11/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/20/2020. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2020) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#110) ORDER RE MODIFICATIONS TO THE CASE SCHEDULE, Motions terminated: (57 in 3:19-mc-80215-WHO). Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/20/2020. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2020) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#109) JOINT STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Modifications to the Case Schedule filed by Illumina Cambridge Ltd., Illumina, Inc.. (McClellan, Douglas) (Filed on 3/19/2020) Modified on 3/20/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#108) PROTECTIVE ORDER re: ECF No. #105 . Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 3/16/2020. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2020) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#107) ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting #106 Stipulated Document Production Order. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2020) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#106) Stipulated Document Production Order filed by Illumina Cambridge Ltd., Illumina, Inc.. (Walter, Derek) (Filed on 3/13/2020) Modified on 3/16/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#105) Joint Statement Accompanying The Stipulated Protective Order by Illumina Cambridge Ltd., Illumina, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Walter, Derek) (Filed on 3/13/2020) Modified on 3/16/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#104) Answer to #94 First Amended Counterclaim by Illumina Cambridge Ltd., Illumina, Inc.. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 3/9/2020) Modified on 3/10/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
94 More Docket Entries
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Summons Issued as to BGI Genomics Co., Ltd. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2019) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Summons Issued as to BGI Americas Corp. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2019) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 9/24/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/1/2019 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 6/18/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility)(aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2019) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • (#7) Case assigned to Judge William H. Orrick. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2019) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Derek C. Walter (Walter, Derek) (Filed on 6/27/2019) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Illumina Cambridge Ltd., Illumina, Inc... (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 6/27/2019) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Certificate of Interested Entities by Illumina Cambridge Ltd. identifying Corporate Parent Illlumina Inc. for Illumina Cambridge Ltd.. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 6/27/2019) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by Illumina, Inc. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 6/27/2019) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons of BGI Genomics Co., LTD., #2 Summons of Complete Genomics Inc., #3 Summons of MGI Americas, Inc., #4 Summons of MGI Tech Co., LTD.)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 6/27/2019) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement; JURY TRIAL DEMANDED; against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13476490.). Filed byIllumina, Inc., Illumina Cambridge Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Civil Cover Sheet)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 6/27/2019) Modified on 6/28/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BGI GENOMICS CO., LTD. is a litigant