This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/10/2019 at 08:05:41 (UTC).

ILLINOIS OPPORTUNITY PROJECT v. HOLDEN et al

Case Summary

On 09/11/2019 ILLINOIS OPPORTUNITY PROJECT filed a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality lawsuit against HOLDEN. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Brian R. Martinotti and Lois H. Goodman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-17912

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian R. Martinotti

Referral Judge

Lois H. Goodman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ILLINOIS OPPORTUNITY PROJECT

Defendants

STEPHEN M. HOLDEN

MARGUERITE T. SIMON

ERIC H. JASO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARK R. SCIROCCO

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF ROBERT A. SCIROCCO

98 Route 46, Suite B

Budd Lake, NJ 07828

Defendant Attorneys

STUART MARK FEINBLATT

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

25 W. Market Street

Trenton, NJ 08625

ADAM BLAKE MASEF

Attorney at STATE OF NEW JERSEY

P.O. Box 117, 25 Market Street

Trenton, NJ 08625

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) CONSENT ORDER that all deadlines in this matter are held in abeyance pending further order of the Court. Defendants shall submit a status report to the Court, on or before 12/20/2019, with a proposed schedule on how this matter should proceed. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 11/08/2019. (jdb) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

#17

(#17) CONSENT ORDER that the Act is preliminarily enjoined insofar as it imposes any legal requirement on any independent expenditure committee, including IOPand their employees or agents; IOP shall not be required to take any action related to the Act prior to the date on which the Court removes the preliminary injunction, or the effective date of any implementing rules promulgated by ELEC,whichever is earlier; Should Defendants seek to end the preliminary injunction, they shall notifyIOP. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 10/23/2019. (jdb) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

16 #1

Certificate of Service

#16

(#16) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ILLINOIS OPPORTUNITY PROJECT as to Marguerite T. Simon (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SCIROCCO, MARK) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

15 #1

Certificate of Service

#15

(#15) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ILLINOIS OPPORTUNITY PROJECT as to Eric H. Jaso (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SCIROCCO, MARK) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

14 #1

Certificate of Service

#14

(#14) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ILLINOIS OPPORTUNITY PROJECT as to Stephen M. Holden (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SCIROCCO, MARK) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by ADAM BLAKE MASEF on behalf of All Defendants (MASEF, ADAM) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

3 #5

Certificate of Service

3 #4

Text of Proposed Order

3 #3

Certification Certification of Brian K. Kelsey

3 #2

Certification Certification of Daniel R. Suhr

3 #1

Certification Certification of Mark Scirocco

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by ILLINOIS OPPORTUNITY PROJECT. (SCIROCCO, MARK) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

1 #2

Certification L.Civ.R.11.2 Certification

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against STEPHEN M. HOLDEN, ERIC H. JASO, MARGUERITE T. SIMON ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9956720), filed by ILLINOIS OPPORTUNITY PROJECT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certification L.Civ.R.11.2 Certification)(SCIROCCO, MARK) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) CONSENT ORDER that all deadlines in this matter are held in abeyance pending further order of the Court. Defendants shall submit a status report to the Court, on or before 12/20/2019, with a proposed schedule on how this matter should proceed. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 11/08/2019. (jdb) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) CONSENT ORDER that the Act is preliminarily enjoined insofar as it imposes any legal requirement on any independent expenditure committee, including IOPand their employees or agents; IOP shall not be required to take any action related to the Act prior to the date on which the Court removes the preliminary injunction, or the effective date of any implementing rules promulgated by ELEC,whichever is earlier; Should Defendants seek to end the preliminary injunction, they shall notifyIOP. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 10/23/2019. (jdb) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ILLINOIS OPPORTUNITY PROJECT as to Marguerite T. Simon (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SCIROCCO, MARK) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ILLINOIS OPPORTUNITY PROJECT as to Eric H. Jaso (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SCIROCCO, MARK) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ILLINOIS OPPORTUNITY PROJECT as to Stephen M. Holden (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SCIROCCO, MARK) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Appearance by ADAM BLAKE MASEF on behalf of All Defendants (MASEF, ADAM) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Appearance by STUART MARK FEINBLATT on behalf of All Defendants (FEINBLATT, STUART) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • Pro Hac Vice fee received as to Daniel R. Suhr and Brian K. Kelsey: $ 300, receipt number TRE105994 (abr) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) TEXT ORDER - The pending #4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction will be held in abeyance until the Court has rendered a decision on the Motion for Preliminary Injunction pending in Americans for Prosperity v. Grewal, 3:19-cv-14228. So Ordered by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 9/17/19. (Fiore, J) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • (#10) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Brian R. Martinotti: Case Management Conference held on 9/17/2019. (Court Reporter: Not on the record.) (DS) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Letter from Mark R. Scirocco re #6 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SCIROCCO, MARK) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Letter from Mark R. Scirocco. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SCIROCCO, MARK) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • Notice of Hearing: Case Management Conference set for 9/17/2019 in Trenton - Courtroom 1 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti, the conference will immediately follow Oral Argument re Americans for Prosperity in civil action no. 19-14228(BRM) which has been set for 9/17/2019 @10am. Further directed plaintiff to notify his or her adversary of the court proceeding. Please confirm receipt of court notice by e-filing letter on CM/ECF not later than Monday, 9/16/2019 by 12pm. (DS) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS ISSUED as to STEPHEN M. HOLDEN, ERIC H. JASO, MARGUERITE T. SIMON. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jdb) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Set Deadlines as to #3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 10/7/2019 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdb) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (jdb) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by ILLINOIS OPPORTUNITY PROJECT. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Proposed Findings of Fact, #3 Exhibit Exhibit One, #4 Declaration Declaration of Matthew Besler, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Certificate of Service)(SCIROCCO, MARK) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by ILLINOIS OPPORTUNITY PROJECT. (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of Mark Scirocco, #2 Certification Certification of Daniel R. Suhr, #3 Certification Certification of Brian K. Kelsey, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(SCIROCCO, MARK) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by ILLINOIS OPPORTUNITY PROJECT. (SCIROCCO, MARK) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against STEPHEN M. HOLDEN, ERIC H. JASO, MARGUERITE T. SIMON ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9956720), filed by ILLINOIS OPPORTUNITY PROJECT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certification L.Civ.R.11.2 Certification)(SCIROCCO, MARK) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ILLINOIS OPPORTUNITY PROJECT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ADAM BLAKE MASEF

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STUART MARK FEINBLATT