This case was last updated from PACER on 08/23/2019 at 07:02:01 (UTC).

Illektron LLC v. Electronic Arts Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/24/2019 Illektron LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Electronic Arts Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-03648

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Illektron LLC

Defendant

Electronic Arts Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Fritz Clapp

Attorney at Attorney at Law

Po Box 2517

Beverly Hills, CA 92013

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Electronic Arts Inc.. Filed byIllektron LLC. (Clapp, Fritz) (Filed on 8/20/2019) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

#10

(#10) STIPULATION FOR FILING AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Illektron LLC and Electronic Arts, Inc. (Clapp, Fritz) (Filed on 8/14/2019) Modified on 8/14/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/14/2019)

#9

(#9) STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Illektron LLC, Electronic Arts Inc. (Clapp, Fritz) (Filed on 7/9/2019) Modified on 7/10/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/09/2019)

#8

(#8) Certificate of Interested Entities by Illektron LLC identifying Other Affiliate Gregory Sherman, Other Affiliate James Stuart, Other Affiliate Chad Smith, Other Affiliate Steve Aldaco, Other Affiliate Brandi Aldaco, Other Affiliate Alex Aguilar, Other Affiliate Rene Aguilar, Other Affiliate Valentina Faltoni, Other Affiliate Richard Friedman, Other Affiliate Greg Frech, Other Affiliate Marisa Frech, Other Affiliate Eric Hershberger, Other Affiliate Courtney Hershberger, Other Affiliate Zontan Posa, Other Affiliate Tasha Posa, Other Affiliate David Regalia, Other Affiliate Steven Sanford, Other Affiliate Dawn Sanford, Other Affiliate Trudy Sherman, Other Affiliate Margit Sherman, Other Affiliate Todd Sherman, Other Affiliate Jerald Stuart, Other Affiliate David Trudgen, Other Affiliate Troy Zimmerman, Other Affiliate Mindy Zimmerman for Illektron LLC. (Clapp, Fritz) (Filed on 6/28/2019) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#7

(#7) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a trademark (cc: form mailed to register). (Clapp, Fritz) (Filed on 6/26/2019) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

#6

(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 9/16/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/23/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2019) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Electronic Arts Inc. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2019) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

#3

(#3) Proposed Summons. (Clapp, Fritz) (Filed on 6/24/2019) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

#2

(#2) Civil Cover Sheet by Illektron LLC . (Clapp, Fritz) (Filed on 6/24/2019) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against Electronic Arts Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13461885.). Filed by Illektron LLC. (Clapp, Fritz) (Filed on 6/24/2019) Modified on 6/25/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/24/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Electronic Arts Inc.. Filed byIllektron LLC. (Clapp, Fritz) (Filed on 8/20/2019) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) STIPULATION FOR FILING AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Illektron LLC and Electronic Arts, Inc. (Clapp, Fritz) (Filed on 8/14/2019) Modified on 8/14/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Illektron LLC, Electronic Arts Inc. (Clapp, Fritz) (Filed on 7/9/2019) Modified on 7/10/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Certificate of Interested Entities by Illektron LLC identifying Other Affiliate Gregory Sherman, Other Affiliate James Stuart, Other Affiliate Chad Smith, Other Affiliate Steve Aldaco, Other Affiliate Brandi Aldaco, Other Affiliate Alex Aguilar, Other Affiliate Rene Aguilar, Other Affiliate Valentina Faltoni, Other Affiliate Richard Friedman, Other Affiliate Greg Frech, Other Affiliate Marisa Frech, Other Affiliate Eric Hershberger, Other Affiliate Courtney Hershberger, Other Affiliate Zontan Posa, Other Affiliate Tasha Posa, Other Affiliate David Regalia, Other Affiliate Steven Sanford, Other Affiliate Dawn Sanford, Other Affiliate Trudy Sherman, Other Affiliate Margit Sherman, Other Affiliate Todd Sherman, Other Affiliate Jerald Stuart, Other Affiliate David Trudgen, Other Affiliate Troy Zimmerman, Other Affiliate Mindy Zimmerman for Illektron LLC. (Clapp, Fritz) (Filed on 6/28/2019) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a trademark (cc: form mailed to register). (Clapp, Fritz) (Filed on 6/26/2019) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 9/16/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/23/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2019) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Electronic Arts Inc. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2019) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • (#4) Case assigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2019) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Proposed Summons. (Clapp, Fritz) (Filed on 6/24/2019) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Civil Cover Sheet by Illektron LLC . (Clapp, Fritz) (Filed on 6/24/2019) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against Electronic Arts Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13461885.). Filed by Illektron LLC. (Clapp, Fritz) (Filed on 6/24/2019) Modified on 6/25/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Electronic Arts, Inc., a Delaware corporation is a litigant