This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/26/2019 at 07:01:11 (UTC).

Ilanit Shoshan et al v. Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 05/27/2019 Ilanit Shoshan filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephen V. Wilson and Steve Kim. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-04576

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephen V. Wilson

Referral Judge

Steve Kim

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ilanit Shoshan

Shlomo Shoshan

Defendants

Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC

The Bank of New York Mellon fka Bank of New York as Trustee for the Certificate Holders of CWALT, Inc. Alternative Loan Trust 2005-3CB

The Bank of New York Mellon

Does 1-10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Anthony Paul Cara

Defendant Attorneys

Brian Scott Thomley

William G Malcolm

 

Court Documents

11 #2

Proposed Order

11 #1

Exhibit 1

#11

(#11) APPLICATION for Leave of Tony Cara to Appear for Telephonic at Initial Status Conference filed by Plaintiffs Ilanit Shoshan, Shlomo Shoshan. Application set for hearing on 7/8/2019 at 03:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order) (Cara, Anthony) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

10 #2

Proposed Order

10 #1

Declaration

#10

(#10) APPLICATION for Leave of Brian S. Thomley to Appear for by Telephone at Initial Status Conference filed by Defendants Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Thomley, Brian) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#8

(#8) NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Ronald S.W. Lew to Judge Stephen V. Wilson for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-04576 SVW (SKx). (esa) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S. W. Lew and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (car) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

#4

(#4) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon fka Bank of New York as Trustee for the Certificate Holders of CWALT, Inc. Alternative Loan Trust 2005-3CB, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties, #3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 served on 5/27/2019. (Thomley, Brian) (Entered: 05/27/2019)

#3

(#3) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon fka Bank of New York as Trustee for the Certificate Holders of CWALT, Inc. Alternative Loan Trust 2005-3CB, identifying Bayview Asset Management, LLC, et al.. (Thomley, Brian) (Entered: 05/27/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon fka Bank of New York as Trustee for the Certificate Holders of CWALT, Inc. Alternative Loan Trust 2005-3CB. (Thomley, Brian) (Entered: 05/27/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, case number 19VECV00738 Receipt No: 0973-23807087 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants The Bank of New York Mellon fka Bank of New York as Trustee for the Certificate Holders of CWALT, Inc. Alternative Loan Trust 2005-3CB, Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit) (Attorney Brian Scott Thomley added to party Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Brian Scott Thomley added to party The Bank of New York Mellon fka Bank of New York as Trustee for the Certificate Holders of CWALT, Inc. Alternative Loan Trust 2005-3CB(pty:dft))(Thomley, Brian) (Entered: 05/27/2019)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) IN CHAMBERS ORDER-TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: In light of the initial status conference having been vacated and taken off-calendar, the Application to Appear by Telephone #10 and #11 are denied as moot. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) CIVIL TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • (#12) SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The Initial Status Conference is vacated and off-calendar. Court Trial is set for October 8, 2019 at 9:00 a.m., with a Pretrial Conference on September 30, 2019 at 3:00 p.m. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) APPLICATION for Leave of Tony Cara to Appear for Telephonic at Initial Status Conference filed by Plaintiffs Ilanit Shoshan, Shlomo Shoshan. Application set for hearing on 7/8/2019 at 03:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order) (Cara, Anthony) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) APPLICATION for Leave of Brian S. Thomley to Appear for by Telephone at Initial Status Conference filed by Defendants Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Thomley, Brian) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE for 7/8/2019 at 3:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Ronald S.W. Lew to Judge Stephen V. Wilson for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-04576 SVW (SKx). (esa) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S. W. Lew and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (car) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC, Does 1-10, inclusive, The Bank of New York Mellon, filed by plaintiffs Ilanit Shoshan, Shlomo Shoshan. Filed in State Court on 5/24/2019 Submitted with Attachment 1 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon fka Bank of New York as Trustee for the Certificate Holders of CWALT, Inc. Alternative Loan Trust 2005-3CB, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties, #3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 served on 5/27/2019. (Thomley, Brian) (Entered: 05/27/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon fka Bank of New York as Trustee for the Certificate Holders of CWALT, Inc. Alternative Loan Trust 2005-3CB, identifying Bayview Asset Management, LLC, et al.. (Thomley, Brian) (Entered: 05/27/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon fka Bank of New York as Trustee for the Certificate Holders of CWALT, Inc. Alternative Loan Trust 2005-3CB. (Thomley, Brian) (Entered: 05/27/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, case number 19VECV00738 Receipt No: 0973-23807087 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants The Bank of New York Mellon fka Bank of New York as Trustee for the Certificate Holders of CWALT, Inc. Alternative Loan Trust 2005-3CB, Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit) (Attorney Brian Scott Thomley added to party Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Brian Scott Thomley added to party The Bank of New York Mellon fka Bank of New York as Trustee for the Certificate Holders of CWALT, Inc. Alternative Loan Trust 2005-3CB(pty:dft))(Thomley, Brian) (Entered: 05/27/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less