This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/31/2021 at 08:10:33 (UTC).

Ika et al v. Wright Medical Group et al

Case Summary

On 11/01/2021 Ika filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Wright Medical Group. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jill N. Parrish and Cecilia M. Romero. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00649

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jill N. Parrish

Referral Judge

Cecilia M. Romero

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Maikolo Ika

Brodi Ika

Defendants

Wright Medical Group

Wright Medical Technology

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Rod N. Andreason

Attorney at KIRTON MCCONKIE

Po Box 45120

Salt Lake City, UT 84145-0120

Adam D. Wahlquist

Attorney at KIRTON MCCONKIE

Po Box 45120

Salt Lake City, UT 84145-0120

Defendant Attorney

Elisabeth M. McOmber

Attorney at SNELL & WILMER LLP

15 W South Temple Ste 1200Gateway Tower West

Salt Lake City, UT 84101

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) CLERKS ORDER of Conditional Transfer re IN RE: PROFEMUR HIP IMPLANT PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL 2949 signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel. (jwt) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Civil Standing Order #5 filed by Defendants Wright Medical Group, Wright Medical Technology (McOmber, Elisabeth) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

#9

(#9) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 11/8/21. (alf) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Civil Standing Order #5 filed by Plaintiffs Brodi Ika, Maikolo Ika (Andreason, Rod) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Anticipated Transfer by Wright Medical Group, Wright Medical Technology (McOmber, Elisabeth) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

#5

(#5) CIVIL STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 11/3/21. (ss) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

4 #4

Notice of Removal Return of Electronic Notification

4 #3

Notice of Removal

4 #2

Complaint Return of Electronic Notification

4 #1

Complaint

#4

(#4) File downloaded from Third District Court, Salt Lake County Web Xchange consisting of Docket Sheet, Complaint, Notice of Removal and applicable state court returns. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Complaint Return of Electronic Notification, #3 Notice of Removal, #4 Notice of Removal Return of Electronic Notification) (alf) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs Brodi Ika, Maikolo Ika, Defendants Wright Medical Group, Wright Medical Technology. (nmt) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

2 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

2 #1

Exhibit 1 - Complaint, state docket

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 3rd District Court Salt Lake County, case number 210905289, (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4153371) filed by Wright Medical Group, Wright Medical Technology. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, state docket, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish (McOmber, Elisabeth) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

#1

(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish. Defendants Wright Medical Group, Wright Medical Technology is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (nmt) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2021
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE OF TRANSMITTAL that case has been transferred to Eastern District of Arkansas via electronic given case number 4:21-cv-01098. (nl) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • Docket(#12) Interdistrict Transfer to Eastern District of Arkansas. Record transferred to receiving court electronically. All future documents should be filed in Eastern District of Arkansas District Court. Case closed. (jwt) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CLERKS ORDER of Conditional Transfer re IN RE: PROFEMUR HIP IMPLANT PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL 2949 signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel. (jwt) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Civil Standing Order #5 filed by Defendants Wright Medical Group, Wright Medical Technology (McOmber, Elisabeth) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 11/8/21. (alf) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • Docket(#8) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 11/5/21. (ss) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Civil Standing Order #5 filed by Plaintiffs Brodi Ika, Maikolo Ika (Andreason, Rod) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Anticipated Transfer by Wright Medical Group, Wright Medical Technology (McOmber, Elisabeth) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CIVIL STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 11/3/21. (ss) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) File downloaded from Third District Court, Salt Lake County Web Xchange consisting of Docket Sheet, Complaint, Notice of Removal and applicable state court returns. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Complaint Return of Electronic Notification, #3 Notice of Removal, #4 Notice of Removal Return of Electronic Notification) (alf) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs Brodi Ika, Maikolo Ika, Defendants Wright Medical Group, Wright Medical Technology. (nmt) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 3rd District Court Salt Lake County, case number 210905289, (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4153371) filed by Wright Medical Group, Wright Medical Technology. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, state docket, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish (McOmber, Elisabeth) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish. Defendants Wright Medical Group, Wright Medical Technology is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (nmt) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WRIGHT MEDICAL GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where WRIGHT MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Elisabeth M. McOmber