This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 05:50:26 (UTC).

I.J. v. Keeton et al

Case Summary

On 03/22/2019 I J filed an Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee lawsuit against Keeton. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judges overseeing this case are John Z Boyle (PS) and Susan M Brnovich. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01904

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arizona District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

John Z Boyle (PS)

Presiding Judge

Susan M Brnovich

 

Party Details

Petitioner

I.J.

Respondents

Chuck Keeton

Enrique Lucero

Office of Refugee Resettlement

Department of Homeland Security

Alex M Azar, II

United States of America

Jason Ciliberti

Kirstjen Nielsen

U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement

Department of Health and Human Services

Fred Figueroa

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Laura Belous

Attorney at Florence Immigration & Refugee Rights Project - Tucson, AZ

738 N 5Th Ave., Ste. 103

Tucson, AZ 85705

Katharine Elizabeth Ruhl

Attorney at Florence Immigration & Refugee Rights Project - Tucson, AZ

738 N 5Th Ave., Ste. 103

Tucson, AZ 85705

Respondent Attorney

Anne Elizabeth Nelson

Attorney at US Attorneys Office - Phoenix, AZ

2 Renaissance Square, 40 N Central Ave., Ste. 1800

Phoenix, AZ 85004-4408

 

Court Documents

#30

(#30) ORDER: Stipulation to Extend Time (Doc. 29) is granted. Petitioner shall have until August 15, 2019 to file an application for fees and costs pursuantto the EAJA. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 6/21/2019. (TCA) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

#28

(#28) ORDER: Pursuant to the parties' Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice (Doc. #26 ) and for good cause appearing, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED dismissing the claims against Defendants with prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 5/30/2019. (SST) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

#26

RESTRICTED

#25

(#25) ORDER - (1) Petitioners Unopposed Motion to Extend Time (Doc. #24 ) is granted. (2) Petitioner shall have until May 29, 2019 to file a second amended petition in accordance with Rule 15.1 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure. (3) If Petitioner does not file a second amended petition on or before May 29, 2019, Petitioner must show cause as to why this action should not be dismissed as moot or for lack of jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 5/15/19. (LAD) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

#23

(#23) AMENDED ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Petitioner's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time (Doc. #17 ) and Unopposed Motion to Clarify (Doc. #18 ) are granted as follows: (1) Respondents' April 15, 2019 Response (Doc. #13 ) is deemed as a Response to the Amended Petition (Doc. #20 ), and Petitioner's April 22, 2019 Reply (Doc. #19 ) is deemed as a Reply in support of the Amended Petition (Doc. #20 ). The Clerk of Court shall amend the docket accordingly. (2) Petitioner shall have 14 days from the date of this Order to file a motion for leave to file a second amended petition in accordance with Rule 15.1 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure.(3) If Petitioner does not elect to file a motion for leave to file a second amended petition within 14 days of the date of this Order, this matter will be deemed fully briefed and taken under advisement. (4) If Petitioner elects to file a motion for leave to file a second amended petition, following a ruling on the motion, the Court will set further briefing deadlines, if necessary. (See document for complete details). Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 5/1/19. (SLQ) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) ORDER: Petitioner shall serve a copy of the Summons, Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 (Doc. #1 ), Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Doc. #2 ), and this Order upon the United States Attorney for the District of Arizona by certified mail addressed to the civil process clerk at the office of the United States Attorney pursuant to Rule 4(i)(1)(A) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Petitioner also shall send by certified mail a copy of the Summons, Petition, Motion and this Order to the United States Attorney General Pursuant to Rule 4(l)(B) and to Respondents pursuant to Rule 4(i)(2)(A). The Clerk of Court must email a copy of this Order to the United States Attorney for the District of Arizona, to the attention of Paul Bullis and to Petitioner's counsel, Laura Belous. Respondents must file a Response to Petitioner's Motion (Doc. #2 ) no later than 10:00 a.m. on Friday, March 29, 2019. Petitioner shall have until 10:00 a.m. on Tuesday, April 2, 2019 to file a Reply. Respondents shall answer the Petition (Doc. #1 ) within 20 days of the date of service. Respondents shall not file a dispositive motion in place of an answer without first showing cause as to why an answer is inadequate. Petitioner shall have 7 days from the filing of an Answer to file any Reply. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 3/26/2019. (SST) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) ORDER: Stipulation to Extend Time (Doc. 29) is granted. Petitioner shall have until August 15, 2019 to file an application for fees and costs pursuantto the EAJA. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 6/21/2019. (TCA) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) *Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Application for EAJA Fees by Alex M Azar, II, Jason Ciliberti, Department of Health and Human Services, Department of Homeland Security, Fred Figueroa, Kirstjen Nielsen, Enrique Lucero, Office of Refugee Resettlement, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Anne) *Modified to add additional filer and remove terminated party as a filer; attorney noticed on 6/11/2019 (SST). (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) ORDER: Pursuant to the parties' Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice (Doc. #26 ) and for good cause appearing, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED dismissing the claims against Defendants with prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 5/30/2019. (SST) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #26 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by I.J.. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. Please do not refile. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SST) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) *STIPULATION of Dismissal by I.J. (Ruhl, Katharine) *Modified to reflect Local Rule violation on 5/30/2019 (SST). (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) ORDER - (1) Petitioners Unopposed Motion to Extend Time (Doc. #24 ) is granted. (2) Petitioner shall have until May 29, 2019 to file a second amended petition in accordance with Rule 15.1 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure. (3) If Petitioner does not file a second amended petition on or before May 29, 2019, Petitioner must show cause as to why this action should not be dismissed as moot or for lack of jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 5/15/19. (LAD) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend by I.J.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Belous, Laura) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) AMENDED ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Petitioner's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time (Doc. #17 ) and Unopposed Motion to Clarify (Doc. #18 ) are granted as follows: (1) Respondents' April 15, 2019 Response (Doc. #13 ) is deemed as a Response to the Amended Petition (Doc. #20 ), and Petitioner's April 22, 2019 Reply (Doc. #19 ) is deemed as a Reply in support of the Amended Petition (Doc. #20 ). The Clerk of Court shall amend the docket accordingly. (2) Petitioner shall have 14 days from the date of this Order to file a motion for leave to file a second amended petition in accordance with Rule 15.1 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure.(3) If Petitioner does not elect to file a motion for leave to file a second amended petition within 14 days of the date of this Order, this matter will be deemed fully briefed and taken under advisement. (4) If Petitioner elects to file a motion for leave to file a second amended petition, following a ruling on the motion, the Court will set further briefing deadlines, if necessary. (See document for complete details). Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 5/1/19. (SLQ) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) *AMENDED by #23 * ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Petitioner's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time (Doc. #17 ) and Unopposed Motion to Clarify (Doc. #18 ) are granted as follows: (1) Petitioner shall have 14 days from the date of this Order to either file the April 9, 2019 Amended Petition (lodged at Doc. #12 -1), along with any cited exhibits, or file a motion for leave to file a second amended petition in accordance with Rule 15.1 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure. (2) If Petitioner elects to file the Amended Petition, along with any cited exhibits, Respondents' April 15, 2019 Response (Doc. #13 ) shall be treated as a Response to the Amended Petition, and Petitioner shall have until May 10, 2019 to file a Reply in support of the Amended Petition. (3) If Petitioner elects to file a motion for leave to file a second amended petition, the parties will be advised regarding the briefing deadlines following the Court's review. (See document for complete details). Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 4/30/19. (SLQ) Modified on 5/1/2019 (SLQ). (Entered: 04/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #20 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Fed/2241) filed by I.J.. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MSA) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #8 Reply to Response to Motion filed by I.J. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. Please do not refile. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SST) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) *Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #8 Reply to Response to Motion by Petitioner I.J. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Belous, Laura) *Modified to reflect Local Rule violation; attorney noticed on 4/3/2019 (SST). (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) *REPLY to Response to Motion re: #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by I.J. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Belous, Laura) *Modified to reflect Local Rule violation; attorney noticed on 4/3/2019 (SST). (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) RESPONSE to Motion re: #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Alex M Azar, II, Jason Ciliberti, Department of Health and Human Services, Department of Homeland Security, Chuck Keeton, Enrique Lucero, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Hillin Declaration, #3 Exhibit A to Hillin Decl, #4 Exhibit B to Hillin Decl, #5 Exhibit C to Hillin Decl, #6 Topete Declaration, #7 Exhibits A thru E to Topete Decl, #8 Exhibit F to Topete Decl, #9 Exhibit G thru H to Topete Decl)(Nelson, Anne) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to Alex M Azar, II, Jason Ciliberti, Chuck Keeton, Enrique Lucero, Kirstjen Nielsen. (BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Submitted by I.J.. (Ruhl, Katharine) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER: Petitioner shall serve a copy of the Summons, Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 (Doc. #1 ), Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Doc. #2 ), and this Order upon the United States Attorney for the District of Arizona by certified mail addressed to the civil process clerk at the office of the United States Attorney pursuant to Rule 4(i)(1)(A) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Petitioner also shall send by certified mail a copy of the Summons, Petition, Motion and this Order to the United States Attorney General Pursuant to Rule 4(l)(B) and to Respondents pursuant to Rule 4(i)(2)(A). The Clerk of Court must email a copy of this Order to the United States Attorney for the District of Arizona, to the attention of Paul Bullis and to Petitioner's counsel, Laura Belous. Respondents must file a Response to Petitioner's Motion (Doc. #2 ) no later than 10:00 a.m. on Friday, March 29, 2019. Petitioner shall have until 10:00 a.m. on Tuesday, April 2, 2019 to file a Reply. Respondents shall answer the Petition (Doc. #1 ) within 20 days of the date of service. Respondents shall not file a dispositive motion in place of an answer without first showing cause as to why an answer is inadequate. Petitioner shall have 7 days from the filing of an Answer to file any Reply. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 3/26/2019. (SST) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (DLC) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by I.J.. (Ruhl, Katharine) (DLC) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Fed/2241). Filing fee received: $ 5.00, receipt number 0970-16688929(Ruhl, Katharine) filed by I.J. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(DLC) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Department of Health and Human Services, Division Children Family Services, also known as D.H.H.S. is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement is a litigant

Latest cases where Department of Homeland Security is a litigant