This case was last updated from PACER on 11/24/2020 at 09:19:58 (UTC).

IHC Health Services v. iHeartMedia et al

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 IHC Health Services filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against iHeartMedia. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District. The Judge overseeing this case is Daphne A. Oberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00676

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Utah District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Daphne A. Oberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

IHC Health Services doing business as LDS Hospital

Defendants

iHeartMedia, INC. Group Benefits HDHP Plan

iHeartMedia

iHeartMedia Inc Group Benefits HDHP Plan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph David Amadon

Attorney at MARCIE E SCHAAP ATTORNEY AT LAW

4760 S Highland Dr #333

Salt Lake City, UT 84117

Marcie E. Schaap

4760 S Highland Dr #333

Salt Lake City, UT 84117

 

Court Documents

5 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#5

(#5) Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint filed by Plaintiff IHC Health Services. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Amadon, Joseph) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by IHC Health Services as to All Defendants. (Schaap, Marcie) (Entered: 10/11/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 9/28/20. (alf) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet .

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3732742) filed by IHC Health Services. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet.) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg (Schaap, Marcie) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

#1

(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg. Plaintiff IHC Health Services is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (jl) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DOCKET TEXT ORDER GRANTING #5 Parties' Stipulated Motion to Continue the Deadline for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendants shall have until January 8, 2021 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 11/16/2020. No attached document. (eh) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint filed by Plaintiff IHC Health Services. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Amadon, Joseph) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by IHC Health Services as to All Defendants. (Schaap, Marcie) (Entered: 10/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 9/28/20. (alf) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3732742) filed by IHC Health Services. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet.) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg (Schaap, Marcie) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg. Plaintiff IHC Health Services is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (jl) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less