This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/08/2021 at 09:48:04 (UTC).

Igo v. BMT, LLC d/b/a Gas Lamp Grille

Case Summary

On 01/07/2021 Igo filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BMT, LLC d/b/a Gas Lamp Grille. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Rhode Island District. The Judges overseeing this case are Patricia A. Sullivan and John J. McConnell, Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00014

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Patricia A. Sullivan

Presiding Judge

John J. McConnell, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Donald Igo

Defendant

BMT, LLC doing business as Gas Lamp Grille

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John B. Harwood

Attorney at McKinnon & Harwood

1168 Newport Ave., 723-9655, Fax: 722-9106

Pawtucket, RI 02861

Michael W. Garland

Attorney at Harwood & Garland, LLC

9 Thurber Boulevard, Suite D

Smithfield, RI 02917

Defendant Attorneys

Mark P. Dolan, Jr.

Attorney at Rice, Dolan & Kershaw

72 Pine Street, Suite 300

Providence, RI 02903

Mark P. Dolan

Attorney at Rice Dolan & Kershaw

The Aldrich Building, 72 Pine Street, Suite 300, 272-8800, Fax: 421-7218

Providence, RI 02903

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

#13

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Factual Discovery to close by 11/23/2021; Plaintiff's Expert Disclosures shall be made by 12/23/2021; Defendants' Expert Disclosures shall be made by 1/24/2022; Expert Discovery to close by 2/23/2022 and Dispositive Motions shgall be filed by 3/24/2022 - So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 2/23/2021. (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference held on 2/23/2021; Michael Garland, John Harwood and Mark Dolan, Jr. participated (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Mark P. Dolan, Jr. on behalf of BMT, LLC (Dolan, Mark) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RULE 16 STATEMENT by Donald Igo. (Garland, Michael) (Entered: 02/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RULE 16 STATEMENT by BMT, LLC. (Dolan, Mark) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for Tuesday, 2/23/2021 at 09:00 AM before Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.; Call in instructions will be provided to counsel of record prior to the conference (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by BMT, LLC. (Dolan, Mark) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Mark P. Dolan on behalf of BMT, LLC (Dolan, Mark) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint by BMT, LLC.(Dolan, Mark) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donald Igo. BMT, LLC served on 1/15/2021, answer due 2/5/2021. (Garland, Michael) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to BMT, LLC. (Simoncelli, Michael) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Simoncelli, Michael) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Simoncelli, Michael) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Request filed by Donald Igo. (Garland, Michael) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number 0103-1582376 ), filed by Donald Igo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Garland, Michael) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to BMT, LLC. (Simoncelli, Michael) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Simoncelli, Michael) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Simoncelli, Michael) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Request filed by Donald Igo. (Garland, Michael) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number 0103-1582376 ), filed by Donald Igo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Garland, Michael) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BMT, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael W. Garland