This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/07/2020 at 09:26:40 (UTC).

iGo, Inc. v. Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC

Case Summary

On 09/08/2020 iGo, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Rodney Gilstrap and Roy S. Payne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00296

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

Referral Judge

Roy S. Payne

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

iGo, Inc.

Defendant

Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hao Ni

Attorney at Ni, Wang & Massand, PLLC

8140 Walnut Hill Lane, Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75231

Defendant Attorney

Roger Joseph Fulghum

Attorney at Baker Botts LLP - Houston

One Shell Plaza, 910 Louisiana Street, 37Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC.( Fulghum, Roger) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

#8

(#8) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ni, Hao) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

#7

(#7) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC.( Fulghum, Roger) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roger Joseph Fulghum on behalf of Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC (Fulghum, Roger) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by iGo, Inc.. Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC served on 9/11/2020, answer due 10/2/2020. (Ni, Hao) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC. (nkl, ) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Issued as to Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC. (nkl, ) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by iGo, Inc. (Ni, Hao) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B - U.S. Patent No. 7,977,823

1 #1

Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 7,904,738

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7989070.), filed by iGo, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 7,904,738, #2 Exhibit B - U.S. Patent No. 7,977,823, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ni, Hao) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketDefendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC to 11/16/2020. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, ) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC.( Fulghum, Roger) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ni, Hao) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (nkl, ) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketDefendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC to 11/1/2020. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, ) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC.( Fulghum, Roger) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roger Joseph Fulghum on behalf of Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC (Fulghum, Roger) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by iGo, Inc.. Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC served on 9/11/2020, answer due 10/2/2020. (Ni, Hao) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC. (nkl, ) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Issued as to Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC. (nkl, ) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, ) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (nkl, ) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by iGo, Inc. (Ni, Hao) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7989070.), filed by iGo, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 7,904,738, #2 Exhibit B - U.S. Patent No. 7,977,823, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ni, Hao) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where iGo Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Roger Fulghum