This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/21/2023 at 07:25:29 (UTC).

Iglesias v. Arizona Beverages USA, LLC

Case Summary

On 12/23/2022 Iglesias filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Arizona Beverages USA, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey S. White. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-09108

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeffrey S. White

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Thomas Iglesias

Defendant

Arizona Beverages USA, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ryan J. Clarkson

Attorney at Clarkson Law Firm, P.C.

22525 Pacific Coast Highway

Malibu, CA 90265

Tiara Avaness

Attorney at Clarkson Law Firm, PC

22525 Pacific Coast Highway

Malibu, CA 90265

Yana A. Hart

Attorney at Clarkson Law Firm PC

22525 Pacific Coast Highway

Malibu, CA 90265

Defendant Attorneys

Robert Paul Donovan

Attorney at Stevens & Lee

669 River Drive, Suite 201

Elmwood Park, NJ 07407

Kirby Hsu

Attorney at Willenken LLP

707 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 3850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Nicholas Howard Pennington

Attorney at Stevens & Lee

620 Freedom Business Center, Suite 200

King Of Prussia, PA 19406

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #15 Stipulation to Extend Page Limit for Briefing on Motion to Dismiss filed by Arizona Beverages USA, LLC. (Donovan, Robert) (Filed on 2/16/2023) (Entered: 02/16/2023)

22 #4

Proposed Order Denying Defendant's Motion for Administrative Relief to Cont

22 #3

Exhibit Exhibit B

22 #2

Exhibit Exhibit A

#22

(#22) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #21 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION To Reschedule the Case Management Conference Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-11 ) filed byThomas Iglesias. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Yana Hart in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Administrative Relief to Continue Case Management Conference Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-11, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Order Denying Defendant's Motion for Administrative Relief to Continue Case Management Conference)(Hart, Yana) (Filed on 2/16/2023) (Entered: 02/16/2023)

21 #4

Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion for Administrative Relief to Con

21 #2

Exhibit A to Declaration in Support of Defendant's Motion for Administrativ

21 #1

Declaration of Robert P. Donovan in Support of Defendant's Administrative M

#15

(#15) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint Extension of Time File Responsive Pleading filed by Arizona Beverages USA, LLC. (Hsu, Kirby) (Filed on 1/17/2023) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

7 #3

Exhibit Exhibit B

7 #1

Declaration of Yana Hart in Support of Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to

#7

(#7) ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Case Should be Related filed by Thomas Iglesias. Responses due by 1/3/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Yana Hart in Support of Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Case Should be Related, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related)(Hart, Yana) (Filed on 12/30/2022) Modified on 1/3/2023 (kmg, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/17/2023 (hdj, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/30/2022)

#6

(#6) Declaration of Thomas Iglesias in Support of #1 Complaint Declaration of Thomas Iglesias Regarding Venue Pursuant to California Civil Code Section 1780(d) filed by Thomas Iglesias. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Hart, Yana) (Filed on 12/30/2022) Modified on 1/3/2023 (kmg, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/30/2022)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Arizona Beverages USA, LLC. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2022) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

#4

(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/24/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/31/2023 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2022) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Hart, Yana) (Filed on 12/23/2022) (Entered: 12/23/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #15 Stipulation to Extend Page Limit for Briefing on Motion to Dismiss filed by Arizona Beverages USA, LLC. (Donovan, Robert) (Filed on 2/16/2023) (Entered: 02/16/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #21 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION To Reschedule the Case Management Conference Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-11 ) filed byThomas Iglesias. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Yana Hart in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Administrative Relief to Continue Case Management Conference Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-11, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Order Denying Defendant's Motion for Administrative Relief to Continue Case Management Conference)(Hart, Yana) (Filed on 2/16/2023) (Entered: 02/16/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION To Reschedule the Case Management Conference Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-11 filed by Arizona Beverages USA, LLC. Responses due by 2/21/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert P. Donovan in Support of Defendant's Administrative Motion to Continue Case Management Conference, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration in Support of Defendant's Motion for Administrative Relief, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration in Support of Defendant's Motion for Administrative Relief, #4 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion for Administrative Relief to Continue Case Management Conference)(Donovan, Robert) (Filed on 2/14/2023) (Entered: 02/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #19 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Nicholas Pennington. (kkp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2023) (Entered: 02/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice representing Defendant, Arizona Beverages USA, LLC. ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17965415.) filed by Arizona Beverages USA, LLC. (Pennington, Nicholas) (Filed on 2/7/2023) (Entered: 02/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #17 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Robert P. Donovan. (kkp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2023) (Entered: 02/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Robert P. Donovan, Esq. ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17963169.) filed by Arizona Beverages USA, LLC. (Donovan, Robert) (Filed on 2/6/2023) (Entered: 02/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Thomas Iglesias re #11 Order,,,,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,, Util - Teleconference Zoom,,,,, (Hart, Yana) (Filed on 1/17/2023) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint Extension of Time File Responsive Pleading filed by Arizona Beverages USA, LLC. (Hsu, Kirby) (Filed on 1/17/2023) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Certificate of Interested Entities by Arizona Beverages USA, LLC (Hsu, Kirby) (Filed on 1/17/2023) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 1/10/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2023) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • Docket(#9) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (shy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2023) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Thomas Iglesias.. (Hart, Yana) (Filed on 1/10/2023) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Case Should be Related filed by Thomas Iglesias. Responses due by 1/3/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Yana Hart in Support of Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Case Should be Related, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related)(Hart, Yana) (Filed on 12/30/2022) Modified on 1/3/2023 (kmg, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/17/2023 (hdj, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Declaration of Thomas Iglesias in Support of #1 Complaint Declaration of Thomas Iglesias Regarding Venue Pursuant to California Civil Code Section 1780(d) filed by Thomas Iglesias. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Hart, Yana) (Filed on 12/30/2022) Modified on 1/3/2023 (kmg, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Arizona Beverages USA, LLC. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2022) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/24/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/31/2023 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2022) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/10/2023. (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2022) (Entered: 12/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Hart, Yana) (Filed on 12/23/2022) (Entered: 12/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Arizona Beverages USA, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17851934.). Filed byThomas Iglesias. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hart, Yana) (Filed on 12/23/2022) (Entered: 12/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less