This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/30/2022 at 14:00:26 (UTC).

Identity Software Pty., Ltd. v. Repustate Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/01/2022 Identity Software Pty , Ltd filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Repustate Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Xavier Rodriguez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-00826

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Xavier Rodriguez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Identity Software Pty., Ltd.

Defendant

Repustate Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cabrach J. Connor

Defendant Attorney

Jon B. Hyland

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

#3

(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Identity Software Pty., Ltd.. (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Identity Software Pty., Ltd.. (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 08/07/2022)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Repustate Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Identity Software Pty., Ltd.. Repustate Inc. served on 8/22/2022, answer due 9/12/2022. (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 09/13/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jon B. Hyland on behalf of Repustate Inc.. Attorney Jon B. Hyland added to party Repustate Inc.(pty:dft) (Hyland, Jon) (Entered: 09/13/2022)

8 #8

Main Document

8 #1

Proposed Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Repustate Inc. answer due 10/12/2022. (lad) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. The deadline for Repustate Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is hereby extended to October 12, 2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Repustate Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hyland, Jon) (Entered: 09/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jon B. Hyland on behalf of Repustate Inc.. Attorney Jon B. Hyland added to party Repustate Inc.(pty:dft) (Hyland, Jon) (Entered: 09/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Identity Software Pty., Ltd.. Repustate Inc. served on 8/22/2022, answer due 9/12/2022. (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 09/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Repustate Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Identity Software Pty., Ltd.. (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 08/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) (Entered: 08/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez pursuant to the Order Assigning Business of the Court as it Relates to Patent Cases, filed 7/25/2022. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 08/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Identity Software Pty., Ltd.. (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT For Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-16332378). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Identity Software Pty., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less