This case was last updated from PACER on 10/18/2020 at 09:39:18 (UTC).

Ickes et al v. Great American Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 08/19/2020 Ickes filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Great American Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John Preston Bailey. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00177

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Virginia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John Preston Bailey

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Judi Ickes

Harry D. Ickes

Defendant

Great American Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daniel P. Taylor

Attorney at Dittmar, Taylor & Makricostas, PLLC

Po Box 2827

Weirton, WV 26062

Defendant Attorney

Mikaela D. Torbert

Attorney at Franklin & Prokopik

100 South Queen Street, Suite 200

Martinsburg, WV 25401

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 10/15/2020. (nmm) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

#6

(#6) Agreed Order of Dismissal by Great American Insurance Company. (Torbert, Mikaela) Modified docket text on 10/15/2020 as document is a proposed Order; Motion terminated; NEF Regenerated (nmm). (Entered: 10/14/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Settlement by Great American Insurance Company (Torbert, Mikaela) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Great American Insurance Company -a wholly owned subsidiary of American Financial Group Inc. (Torbert, Mikaela) Modified docket text re: subsidiary on 8/26/2020 (nmm). (Entered: 08/26/2020)

#3

(#3) Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint Torbert, Mikaela by Great American Insurance Company.(Torbert, Mikaela) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

#2

(#2) FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULIN G CONFERENCE: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 9/17/2020; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/1/2020; Initial Disclosures due by 10/15/2020. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 8/21/2020. (nmm) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit D - Occupational Accident Schedule of Benefits

1 #3

Exhibit C - Articles of Incorporation

1 #2

Exhibit B - Copy of WV Secretary of State's service of process materials

1 #1

Exhibit A - Copy of Summons, Civil Case Information Statement and Complaint file

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Brooke County, West Virginia, (case number 20-C-38), filed by Great American Insurance Company. Filing Fee $400. Receipt #0424-3099448. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copy of Summons, Civil Case Information Statement and Complaint filed in State Court, #2 Exhibit B - Copy of WV Secretary of State's service of process materials, #3 Exhibit C - Articles of Incorporation, #4 Exhibit D - Occupational Accident Schedule of Benefits, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (nmm) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 10/15/2020. (nmm) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Agreed Order of Dismissal by Great American Insurance Company. (Torbert, Mikaela) Modified docket text on 10/15/2020 as document is a proposed Order; Motion terminated; NEF Regenerated (nmm). (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Settlement by Great American Insurance Company (Torbert, Mikaela) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Great American Insurance Company -a wholly owned subsidiary of American Financial Group Inc. (Torbert, Mikaela) Modified docket text re: subsidiary on 8/26/2020 (nmm). (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint Torbert, Mikaela by Great American Insurance Company.(Torbert, Mikaela) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULIN G CONFERENCE: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 9/17/2020; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/1/2020; Initial Disclosures due by 10/15/2020. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 8/21/2020. (nmm) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Brooke County, West Virginia, (case number 20-C-38), filed by Great American Insurance Company. Filing Fee $400. Receipt #0424-3099448. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copy of Summons, Civil Case Information Statement and Complaint filed in State Court, #2 Exhibit B - Copy of WV Secretary of State's service of process materials, #3 Exhibit C - Articles of Incorporation, #4 Exhibit D - Occupational Accident Schedule of Benefits, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (nmm) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less