This case was last updated from PACER on 07/15/2020 at 09:28:21 (UTC).

Iceberg v. Office of Administrative Hearings et al

Case Summary

On 05/16/2020 Iceberg filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Office of Administrative Hearings. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ricardo S. Martinez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00742

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ricardo S. Martinez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Scott Francis Iceberg

Edmonds, WA 98026

Defendants

Office of Administrative Hearings

Johnette Sullivan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Amy Paden

Attorney General'S Office (Sea- Fifth Ave), 800 5Th Ave, Ste 2000

Seattle, WA 98104-3188

Michael John Nelson, II

Attorney at ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE (40123-OLY)

7141 Cleanwater Dr Sw, Po Box 40123

Olympia, WA 98504-0123

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Length of Trial: *5 days*. Jury Trial is set for 10/18/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Joinder of Parties due by 8/11/2020, Amended Pleadings due by 8/11/2020, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 4/21/2021, Motions due by 5/21/2021, Discovery completed by 6/21/2021, Dispositive motions due by 7/20/2021, 39.1 mediation to be completed by 9/3/2021, Motions in Limine due by 9/20/2021, Pretrial Order due by 10/6/2021, Trial briefs to be submitted by 10/13/2021, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 10/13/2021. (LC) Modified on 7/14/2020: Copy of order sent to pro se plaintiff via regular mail (LC). (Entered: 07/14/2020)

#7

(#7) JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: Five. Filed by Defendants Office of Administrative Hearings, Johnette Sullivan.(Paden, Amy) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez: Joint Status Report due by 7/15/2020, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 7/1/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/8/2020. [Copy to pro se plaintiff via first class mail on 6/11/2020.] (LC) Modified on 6/3/2020 (MW). (Entered: 06/03/2020)

#6

(#6) Mail addressed to Scott Francis Iceberg returned as Undeliverable re #2 IFP Deficiency Letter. (PM) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Amy Paden on behalf of Defendants Office of Administrative Hearings, Johnette Sullivan. (Paden, Amy) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

#2

(#2) LETTER sent re IFP deficiency; - The APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS is blank or incomplete. Please answer all the questions on the enclosed application and return it to the Court as soon as possible.- The Complaint form was not signed. Please find enclosed the Complaint form to be signed and returned to the Court.- The IFP form is missing part of the 2nd page. The complaint was not signed. Please fill out a complete IFP form and also sign the complaint. Both forms are enclosed with this letter. Filer has until 6/17/2020 to correct (CDA)cc plaintiff via US Mail (Entered: 05/18/2020)

1 #4

Email transmittal

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

PROPOSED Complaint

#1

(#1) APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Plaintiff Scott Francis Iceberg. (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Email transmittal)(CDA) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Length of Trial: *5 days*. Jury Trial is set for 10/18/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Joinder of Parties due by 8/11/2020, Amended Pleadings due by 8/11/2020, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 4/21/2021, Motions due by 5/21/2021, Discovery completed by 6/21/2021, Dispositive motions due by 7/20/2021, 39.1 mediation to be completed by 9/3/2021, Motions in Limine due by 9/20/2021, Pretrial Order due by 10/6/2021, Trial briefs to be submitted by 10/13/2021, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 10/13/2021. (LC) Modified on 7/14/2020: Copy of order sent to pro se plaintiff via regular mail (LC). (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: Five. Filed by Defendants Office of Administrative Hearings, Johnette Sullivan.(Paden, Amy) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Pursuant to the joint request of counsel, the Court finds good cause to continue the following deadline: Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/25/2020. (LC) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Note: per direction from chambers, Dkt. #6 was resent on 7/1/2020 to Plaintiff via USPS at the following address: 12730 126th Way NE Apt F11, Kirkland, WA 98034. (PM) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez: Joint Status Report due by 7/15/2020, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 7/1/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/8/2020. [Copy to pro se plaintiff via first class mail on 6/11/2020.] (LC) Modified on 6/3/2020 (MW). (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Mail addressed to Scott Francis Iceberg returned as Undeliverable re #2 IFP Deficiency Letter. (PM) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAttorney Michael John Nelson II added as counsel for Office of Administrative Hearings and Johnette Sullivan per #4 Notice of Appearance. (PM) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Amy Paden on behalf of Defendants Office of Administrative Hearings, Johnette Sullivan. (Paden, Amy) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) LETTER sent re IFP deficiency; - The APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS is blank or incomplete. Please answer all the questions on the enclosed application and return it to the Court as soon as possible.- The Complaint form was not signed. Please find enclosed the Complaint form to be signed and returned to the Court.- The IFP form is missing part of the 2nd page. The complaint was not signed. Please fill out a complete IFP form and also sign the complaint. Both forms are enclosed with this letter. Filer has until 6/17/2020 to correct (CDA)cc plaintiff via US Mail (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Plaintiff Scott Francis Iceberg. (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Email transmittal)(CDA) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less