This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/16/2022 at 09:04:26 (UTC).

Ice Rover, Inc. v. Lifetime Products, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/18/2022 Ice Rover, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Lifetime Products, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-00797

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ice Rover, Inc.

Defendant

Lifetime Products, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William P. Ramey, III

Attorney at Ramey LLP

5020 Montrose Blvd., Suite 800

Houston, TX 77006

Defendant Attorney

Andy W. Tindel

Attorney at Mann, Tindel & Thompson, Attorneys at Law

112 East Line Street, Suite 304

Tyler, TX 75702

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-16271301), filed by Ice Rover, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, B, C, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ramey, William) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

1 #1

Exhibit A, B, C

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Ice Rover, Inc.. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

#4

(#4) Certificate of Interested Parties by Ice Rover, Inc.. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Lifetime Products, Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ice Rover, Inc.. Lifetime Products, Inc. served on 8/10/2022, answer due 8/31/2022. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Unopposed Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to by Lifetime Products, Inc. re #1 Complaint (Tindel, Andy) (Entered: 08/31/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Lifetime Products, Inc. answer due 9/30/2022. (sm3) (Entered: 08/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Unopposed Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to by Lifetime Products, Inc. re #1 Complaint (Tindel, Andy) (Entered: 08/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ice Rover, Inc.. Lifetime Products, Inc. served on 8/10/2022, answer due 8/31/2022. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Lifetime Products, Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certificate of Interested Parties by Ice Rover, Inc.. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Ice Rover, Inc.. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-16271301), filed by Ice Rover, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, B, C, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ramey, William) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lifetime Products is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andy Tindel