This case was last updated from PACER on 07/11/2019 at 10:39:39 (UTC).

IBEW Local No. 490 Pension Fund, Trustees et al v. Tansey Electric, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/12/2019 IBEW Local No 490 Pension Fund, Trustees filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Tansey Electric, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Hampshire District. The Judges overseeing this case are Joseph N. Laplante and Landya B. McCafferty. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00383

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Hampshire District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Joseph N. Laplante

Landya B. McCafferty

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

IBEW Local No. 490 Annuity Fund, Trustees

National Electrical Benefit Fund

IBEW Local Union No. 490

IBEW Local No. 490 Apprenticeship & Training Fund, Trustees

IBEW Local No. 490 Pension Fund, Trustees

IBEW Local No. 490 Labor Management Cooperation Fund, Trustees

Defendants

Tansey Electric, Inc.

Albert H Tansey

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jamie N. Hage

Attorney at Hage Hodes PA

1855 Elm St

Manchester, NH 03104

Katherine Elisabeth Hedges

Attorney at Hage Hodes PA

1855 Elm St

Manchester, NH 03104

Thomas R. Landry

Attorney at Krakow Souris & Landry

225 Friend St

Boston, MA 02114

Adrienne Langlois

Attorney at Krakow Souris & Landry

225 Friend St

Boston, MA 02114

Defendant Attorney

Peter N. Tamposi

Attorney at The Tamposi Law Group PC

159 Main St

Nashua, NH 03060

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NEW CASE/ERISA COMPLAINT Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1799645 filed by IBEW Local Union No. 490, Trustees of IBEW Local No. 490 Pension Fund, Trustees of IBEW Local No. 490 Labor Management Cooperation Fund, Trustees of IBEW Local No. 490 Apprenticeship & Training Fund, Trustees of IBEW Local No. 490 Annuity Fund, National Electrical Benefit Fund. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons in a Civil Action - Tansey Electric, Inc., #3 Summons in a Civil Action - Albert H. Tansey)(Hedges, Katherine) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

1 #2

Summons in a Civil Action - Tansey Electric, Inc.

1 #3

Summons in a Civil Action - Albert H. Tansey

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Disclosure Statement by IBEW Local Union No. 490 disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Hedges, Katherine) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

#3

(#3) Disclosure Statement by National Electrical Benefit Fund disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Hedges, Katherine) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement by Trustees of IBEW Local No. 490 Annuity Fund disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Hedges, Katherine) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

#5

(#5) Disclosure Statement by Trustees of IBEW Local No. 490 Apprenticeship & Training Fund disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Hedges, Katherine) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

#6

(#6) Disclosure Statement by Trustees of IBEW Local No. 490 Labor Management Cooperation Fund disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Hedges, Katherine) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

#7

(#7) Disclosure Statement by Trustees of IBEW Local No. 490 Pension Fund disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Hedges, Katherine) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

#19

(#19) STIPULATION re #8 ERISA Notice re: Waiver of Local Rule 9.4 by IBEW Local No. 490 Annuity Fund, Trustees, IBEW Local No. 490 Apprenticeship & Training Fund, Trustees, IBEW Local No. 490 Labor Management Cooperation Fund, Trustees, IBEW Local No. 490 Pension Fund, Trustees, IBEW Local Union No. 490, National Electrical Benefit Fund(Hage, Jamie) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

#8

(#19) STIPULATION re #8 ERISA Notice re: Waiver of Local Rule 9.4 by IBEW Local No. 490 Annuity Fund, Trustees, IBEW Local No. 490 Apprenticeship & Training Fund, Trustees, IBEW Local No. 490 Labor Management Cooperation Fund, Trustees, IBEW Local No. 490 Pension Fund, Trustees, IBEW Local Union No. 490, National Electrical Benefit Fund(Hage, Jamie) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

16 #1

Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of A.Langlois in Support of Pro Hac Vice Admission

#16

(#16) Assented to MOTION for Adrienne Langlois to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1811004.) filed by IBEW Local No. 490 Annuity Fund, Trustees, IBEW Local No. 490 Apprenticeship & Training Fund, Trustees, IBEW Local No. 490 Labor Management Cooperation Fund, Trustees, IBEW Local No. 490 Pension Fund, Trustees, IBEW Local Union No. 490, National Electrical Benefit Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of A.Langlois in Support of Pro Hac Vice Admission)(Hage, Jamie) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

15 #1

Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of T. Landry in Support of Pro Hac Vice Admission

#15

(#15) Assented to MOTION for Thomas R. Landry to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1810974.) filed by IBEW Local No. 490 Annuity Fund, Trustees, IBEW Local No. 490 Apprenticeship & Training Fund, Trustees, IBEW Local No. 490 Labor Management Cooperation Fund, Trustees, IBEW Local No. 490 Pension Fund, Trustees, IBEW Local Union No. 490, National Electrical Benefit Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of T. Landry in Support of Pro Hac Vice Admission)(Hage, Jamie) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

#18

(#18) Addendum/ to #16 Assented to MOTION for Adrienne Langlois to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1811004.) Affidavit with Corrected Caption by IBEW Local No. 490 Annuity Fund, Trustees, IBEW Local No. 490 Apprenticeship & Training Fund, Trustees, IBEW Local No. 490 Labor Management Cooperation Fund, Trustees, IBEW Local No. 490 Pension Fund, Trustees, IBEW Local Union No. 490, National Electrical Benefit Fund. (Hedges, Katherine) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

#17

(#17) Addendum/ to #15 Assented to MOTION for Thomas R. Landry to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1810974.) Affidavit with Corrected Caption by IBEW Local No. 490 Annuity Fund, Trustees, IBEW Local No. 490 Apprenticeship & Training Fund, Trustees, IBEW Local No. 490 Labor Management Cooperation Fund, Trustees, IBEW Local No. 490 Pension Fund, Trustees, IBEW Local Union No. 490, National Electrical Benefit Fund. (Hedges, Katherine) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2019
  • NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 7/25/2019 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Follow up on Discovery Plan 7/18/2019. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(kad) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENDORSED ORDER RE #19 Stipulation. Text of Order: Approved. So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(js) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) STIPULATION re #8 ERISA Notice re: Waiver of Local Rule 9.4 by IBEW Local No. 490 Annuity Fund, Trustees, IBEW Local No. 490 Apprenticeship & Training Fund, Trustees, IBEW Local No. 490 Labor Management Cooperation Fund, Trustees, IBEW Local No. 490 Pension Fund, Trustees, IBEW Local Union No. 490, National Electrical Benefit Fund(Hage, Jamie) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENDORSED ORDER granting #16 Motion for Adrienne Langlois to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(js) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENDORSED ORDER granting #15 Motion for Thomas R. Landry to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(js) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Addendum/ to #16 Assented to MOTION for Adrienne Langlois to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1811004.) Affidavit with Corrected Caption by IBEW Local No. 490 Annuity Fund, Trustees, IBEW Local No. 490 Apprenticeship & Training Fund, Trustees, IBEW Local No. 490 Labor Management Cooperation Fund, Trustees, IBEW Local No. 490 Pension Fund, Trustees, IBEW Local Union No. 490, National Electrical Benefit Fund. (Hedges, Katherine) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Addendum/ to #15 Assented to MOTION for Thomas R. Landry to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1810974.) Affidavit with Corrected Caption by IBEW Local No. 490 Annuity Fund, Trustees, IBEW Local No. 490 Apprenticeship & Training Fund, Trustees, IBEW Local No. 490 Labor Management Cooperation Fund, Trustees, IBEW Local No. 490 Pension Fund, Trustees, IBEW Local Union No. 490, National Electrical Benefit Fund. (Hedges, Katherine) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Assented to MOTION for Adrienne Langlois to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1811004.) filed by IBEW Local No. 490 Annuity Fund, Trustees, IBEW Local No. 490 Apprenticeship & Training Fund, Trustees, IBEW Local No. 490 Labor Management Cooperation Fund, Trustees, IBEW Local No. 490 Pension Fund, Trustees, IBEW Local Union No. 490, National Electrical Benefit Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of A.Langlois in Support of Pro Hac Vice Admission)(Hage, Jamie) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Assented to MOTION for Thomas R. Landry to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1810974.) filed by IBEW Local No. 490 Annuity Fund, Trustees, IBEW Local No. 490 Apprenticeship & Training Fund, Trustees, IBEW Local No. 490 Labor Management Cooperation Fund, Trustees, IBEW Local No. 490 Pension Fund, Trustees, IBEW Local Union No. 490, National Electrical Benefit Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of T. Landry in Support of Pro Hac Vice Admission)(Hage, Jamie) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • Case reassigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. Reason for Reassignment: Judge Laplante recused. The new case designation is: 19-cv-383-LM. Please show this number with the correct judge designation on all further pleadings.(jb) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ERISA Notice sent to plaintiffs for service on all parties. (bt) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (bt) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • Case assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-383-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (bt) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Disclosure Statement by Trustees of IBEW Local No. 490 Pension Fund disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Hedges, Katherine) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Disclosure Statement by Trustees of IBEW Local No. 490 Labor Management Cooperation Fund disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Hedges, Katherine) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Disclosure Statement by Trustees of IBEW Local No. 490 Apprenticeship & Training Fund disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Hedges, Katherine) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Disclosure Statement by Trustees of IBEW Local No. 490 Annuity Fund disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Hedges, Katherine) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Disclosure Statement by National Electrical Benefit Fund disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Hedges, Katherine) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Disclosure Statement by IBEW Local Union No. 490 disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Hedges, Katherine) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NEW CASE/ERISA COMPLAINT Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1799645 filed by IBEW Local Union No. 490, Trustees of IBEW Local No. 490 Pension Fund, Trustees of IBEW Local No. 490 Labor Management Cooperation Fund, Trustees of IBEW Local No. 490 Apprenticeship & Training Fund, Trustees of IBEW Local No. 490 Annuity Fund, National Electrical Benefit Fund. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons in a Civil Action - Tansey Electric, Inc., #3 Summons in a Civil Action - Albert H. Tansey)(Hedges, Katherine) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.