This case was last updated from PACER on 07/05/2021 at 07:04:59 (UTC).

IBEW Local 353 Pension Plan v. FibroGen, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/06/2021 IBEW Local 353 Pension Plan filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against FibroGen, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Edward J. Davila. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-03396

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Edward J. Davila

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

IBEW Local 353 Pension Plan

Defendants

K. Peony Yu

FibroGen, Inc.

Enrique Conterno

James A. Schoeneck

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jonathan Daniel Uslaner

Attorney at Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossman LLP

2121 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 2575

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

7 #2

Exhibit B - Xu PSLRA Notice

7 #1

Exhibit A - IBEW Local 353 PSLRA Notice

#7

(#7) NOTICE by IBEW Local 353 Pension Plan of Publication (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - IBEW Local 353 PSLRA Notice, #2 Exhibit B - Xu PSLRA Notice)(Uslaner, Jonathan) (Filed on 5/11/2021) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Enrique Conterno, FibroGen, Inc., James A. Schoeneck, K. Peony Yu. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2021) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

5 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#5

(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 8/5/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/12/2021 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2021) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by IBEW Local 353 Pension Plan (Uslaner, Jonathan) (Filed on 5/6/2021) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Uslaner, Jonathan) (Filed on 5/6/2021) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Violations of the Federal Securities Laws; Demand for Jury Trial against Enrique Conterno, FibroGen, Inc., James A. Schoeneck, K. Peony Yu ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15936685.). Filed byIBEW Local 353 Pension Plan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Uslaner, Jonathan) (Filed on 5/6/2021) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE by IBEW Local 353 Pension Plan of Publication (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - IBEW Local 353 PSLRA Notice, #2 Exhibit B - Xu PSLRA Notice)(Uslaner, Jonathan) (Filed on 5/11/2021) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Enrique Conterno, FibroGen, Inc., James A. Schoeneck, K. Peony Yu. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2021) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 8/5/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/12/2021 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2021) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Judge Edward J. Davila. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2021) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by IBEW Local 353 Pension Plan (Uslaner, Jonathan) (Filed on 5/6/2021) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Uslaner, Jonathan) (Filed on 5/6/2021) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Violations of the Federal Securities Laws; Demand for Jury Trial against Enrique Conterno, FibroGen, Inc., James A. Schoeneck, K. Peony Yu ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15936685.). Filed byIBEW Local 353 Pension Plan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Uslaner, Jonathan) (Filed on 5/6/2021) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FibroGen, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan Daniel Uslaner