This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/09/2022 at 08:03:56 (UTC).

IBEW Local 353 Pension Plan v. Eargo, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/10/2021 IBEW Local 353 Pension Plan filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Eargo, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Charles R. Breyer and Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-08747

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Charles R. Breyer

Haywood S Gilliam, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

IBEW Local 353 Pension Plan

Petitioner

Xiaobin Cai

Defendants

Eargo, Inc.

Christian Gormsen

Adam Laponis

Josh Makower

Juliet Bakker

Peter Tuxen Bisgaard

Doug Hughes

Geoff Pardo

Nina Richardson

A. Brooke Seawell

David Wu

J.P. Morgan Securities LLC

BofA Securities, Inc.

Wells Fargo Securities, LLC

William Blair & Company, L.L.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jonathan Daniel Uslaner

Attorney at Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossman LLP

2121 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 2575

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Petitioner Attorney

Jacob Allen Walker

Attorney at Block & Leviton LLP

260 Franklin Street, Suite 1860

Boston, MA 02110

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) STIPULATION AND ORDER APPOINTING IBEW LOCAL 353 PENSION PLAN AND XIAOBIN CAI AS LEAD PLAINTIFF, APPROVING THEIR SELECTION OF LEAD COUNSEL, AND CONSOLIDATING ACTIONS by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting (35) Stipulation in case 3:21-cv-08597-CRB. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2022) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

#22

(#22) Case Reassigned to Judge Charles R. Breyer. Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2021) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

#21

(#21) ORDER RELATING CASE. The following cases are related: C21-8597 CRB and C21-8747 HSG. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/16/2021. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2021) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

#20

(#20) Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 3:21-cv-8597-CRB. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 12/14/2021. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2021) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

#19

(#19) CERTIFICATE of Counsel of Scott R. Foglietta by Jonathan Daniel Uslaner on behalf of IBEW Local 353 Pension Plan (Uslaner, Jonathan) (Filed on 12/6/2021) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

#18

(#18) CERTIFICATE of Counsel of Avi Josefson by Jonathan Daniel Uslaner on behalf of IBEW Local 353 Pension Plan (Uslaner, Jonathan) (Filed on 12/6/2021) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

#17

(#17) CERTIFICATE of Counsel of Hannah Ross by Jonathan Daniel Uslaner on behalf of IBEW Local 353 Pension Plan (Uslaner, Jonathan) (Filed on 12/6/2021) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

#16

(#16) CERTIFICATE of Counsel of John Rizio-Hamilton by Jonathan Daniel Uslaner on behalf of IBEW Local 353 Pension Plan (Uslaner, Jonathan) (Filed on 12/6/2021) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

#15

(#15) CERTIFICATE of Counsel of Jonathan D. Uslaner by Jonathan Daniel Uslaner on behalf of IBEW Local 353 Pension Plan (Uslaner, Jonathan) (Filed on 12/6/2021) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

8 #2

Exhibit B - Fazio PSLRA Notice

8 #1

Exhibit A - IBEW Local 353 PSLRA Notice

#7

(#7) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/1/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/8/2022 at 2:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor. Correcting date of Case Management Conference. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2021) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Juliet Bakker, BofA Securities, Inc., Eargo, Inc., Christian Gormsen, Doug Hughes, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Adam Laponis, Josh Makower, Geoff Pardo, Nina Richardson, A. Brooke Seawell, Peter Tuxen Bisgaard. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2021) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

#5

(#5) FILED IN ERROR. SEE DOCKET #7 .Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/1/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/1/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2021) Modified on 11/15/2021 (wsn, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/12/2021)

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by IBEW Local 353 Pension Plan (Uslaner, Jonathan) (Filed on 11/10/2021) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Uslaner, Jonathan) (Filed on 11/10/2021) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) STIPULATION AND ORDER APPOINTING IBEW LOCAL 353 PENSION PLAN AND XIAOBIN CAI AS LEAD PLAINTIFF, APPROVING THEIR SELECTION OF LEAD COUNSEL, AND CONSOLIDATING ACTIONS by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting (35) Stipulation in case 3:21-cv-08597-CRB. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2022) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Case Reassigned to Judge Charles R. Breyer. Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2021) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER RELATING CASE. The following cases are related: C21-8597 CRB and C21-8747 HSG. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/16/2021. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2021) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 3:21-cv-8597-CRB. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 12/14/2021. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2021) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) CERTIFICATE of Counsel of Scott R. Foglietta by Jonathan Daniel Uslaner on behalf of IBEW Local 353 Pension Plan (Uslaner, Jonathan) (Filed on 12/6/2021) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) CERTIFICATE of Counsel of Avi Josefson by Jonathan Daniel Uslaner on behalf of IBEW Local 353 Pension Plan (Uslaner, Jonathan) (Filed on 12/6/2021) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) CERTIFICATE of Counsel of Hannah Ross by Jonathan Daniel Uslaner on behalf of IBEW Local 353 Pension Plan (Uslaner, Jonathan) (Filed on 12/6/2021) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CERTIFICATE of Counsel of John Rizio-Hamilton by Jonathan Daniel Uslaner on behalf of IBEW Local 353 Pension Plan (Uslaner, Jonathan) (Filed on 12/6/2021) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CERTIFICATE of Counsel of Jonathan D. Uslaner by Jonathan Daniel Uslaner on behalf of IBEW Local 353 Pension Plan (Uslaner, Jonathan) (Filed on 12/6/2021) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Certificate of Interested Entities by IBEW Local 353 Pension Plan (Uslaner, Jonathan) (Filed on 12/6/2021) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Declaration of Jacob A. Walker in Support of #9 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed byXiaobin Cai. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #9 ) (Walker, Jacob) (Filed on 12/6/2021) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Xiaobin Cai. Motion Hearing set for 1/10/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 12/20/2021. Replies due by 12/27/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Walker, Jacob) (Filed on 12/6/2021) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Publication by IBEW Local 353 Pension Plan (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - IBEW Local 353 PSLRA Notice, #2 Exhibit B - Fazio PSLRA Notice) (Uslaner, Jonathan) (Filed on 11/22/2021) Modified on 11/23/2021 (gba, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/1/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/8/2022 at 2:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor. Correcting date of Case Management Conference. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2021) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Juliet Bakker, BofA Securities, Inc., Eargo, Inc., Christian Gormsen, Doug Hughes, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Adam Laponis, Josh Makower, Geoff Pardo, Nina Richardson, A. Brooke Seawell, Peter Tuxen Bisgaard. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2021) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) FILED IN ERROR. SEE DOCKET #7 .Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/1/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/1/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2021) Modified on 11/15/2021 (wsn, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2021) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by IBEW Local 353 Pension Plan (Uslaner, Jonathan) (Filed on 11/10/2021) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Uslaner, Jonathan) (Filed on 11/10/2021) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Juliet Bakker, BofA Securities, Inc., Eargo, Inc., Christian Gormsen, Doug Hughes, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Adam Laponis, Josh Makower, Geoff Pardo, Nina Richardson, A. Brooke Seawell, Peter Tuxen Bisgaard, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, William Blair & Company, L.L.C., David Wu ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-16616184.) Filed byIBEW Local 353 Pension Plan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Uslaner, Jonathan) (Filed on 11/10/2021) Modified on 11/12/2021 (kmg, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where William Blair & Company L.L.C. is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Securities LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where J.P. Morgan Securities LLC is a litigant