This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/08/2022 at 11:02:55 (UTC).

Iberoamericana De Hidrocarburos S.A v. Exterran Energy Solutions, LP et al

Case Summary

On 06/07/2021 Iberoamericana De Hidrocarburos S A filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Exterran Energy Solutions, LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Sim Lake. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-01840

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sim Lake

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

IBEROAMERICANA DE HIDROCARBUROS S.A

Houston, TX 77002

Iberoamericana De Hidrocarburos S.A.

Defendants

Exterran Energy Solutions, LP

1100 Louisiana, Suite 4100

Houston, TX 77002

Exterran Corporation

1100 Louisiana St. Suite 4100

Houston, TX 77002

Andrew Way

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Susman Godfrey

1000 Louisiana Street, Ste. 5100

Houston, TX 77002

Terrell Wallace Oxford

Attorney at Susman Godfrey LLP

1000 Louisiana Street, Ste 5100

Houston, TX 77002

Defendant Attorneys

Jeremiah J Anderson

Attorney at McGuireWoods

845 Texas Ave., Ste 24Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

Craig S Miles

Attorney at King Spalding LLP

1100 Louisiana, Ste 4000

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#32

(#32) ORDER - Granting #31 MOTION for Jeremiah J. Anderson to Withdraw as Attorney for Exterran Corporation, Exterran Energy Solutions, LP, Andrew Way...*** Attorney Jeremiah J Anderson terminated. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

31 #1

Proposed Order

31 #31

Main Document

#30

(#30) STATUS REPORT by Iberoamericana De Hidrocarburos S.A., filed.(Oxford, Terrell) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

#29

(#29) ORDER - Denying #20 Opposed MOTION for Clarification as to #19 Order. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

#28

(#28) STATUS REPORT by Iberoamericana De Hidrocarburos S.A., filed.(Oxford, Terrell) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

#27

(#27) STATUS REPORT by Iberoamericana De Hidrocarburos S.A., filed.(Oxford, Terrell) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

#20

#19

1 #14

Appendix Counsel of Record

1 #13

Appendix State Court Notice

1 #12

Appendix Declaration

1 #11

Appendix State Court Docket

1 #10

Appendix Acceptance of Service

1 #9

Appendix Index

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #3

Exhibit C

#1

63 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) ORDER - Granting #31 MOTION for Jeremiah J. Anderson to Withdraw as Attorney for Exterran Corporation, Exterran Energy Solutions, LP, Andrew Way...*** Attorney Jeremiah J Anderson terminated. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) MOTION for Jeremiah J. Anderson to Withdraw as Attorney by Exterran Corporation, Exterran Energy Solutions, LP, Andrew Way, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/10/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Miles, Craig) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) STATUS REPORT by Iberoamericana De Hidrocarburos S.A., filed.(Oxford, Terrell) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) ORDER - Denying #20 Opposed MOTION for Clarification as to #19 Order. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) STATUS REPORT by Iberoamericana De Hidrocarburos S.A., filed.(Oxford, Terrell) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) STATUS REPORT by Iberoamericana De Hidrocarburos S.A., filed.(Oxford, Terrell) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ORDER - Defendants Exterran Energy Solutions LP and Exterran Corp.'s #5 Motion to Dismiss; Defendant Andrew Way's #6 Motion to Dismiss or, Alternatively, Stay Pending Arbitration; and Plaintiff's #12 Motion to Remand are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. At the conclusion of the arbitration the movants may move to lift the court's stay and to reinstate or amend their motions. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) STATUS REPORT by Iberoamericana De Hidrocarburos S.A., filed.(Oxford, Terrell) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) STATUS REPORT by Iberoamericana De Hidrocarburos S.A., filed.(Oxford, Terrell) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER - Granting #22 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Deadline to File Status Report ; Status Report due by 10/20/2021. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Exterran Corporation, Exterran Energy Solutions, LP, Andrew Way, filed.(Miles, Craig) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER - Granting #8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Deadlines ; IHSA's Response due by 7/6/2021 re: #4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration. IHSA's response to Exterran's Motion to Dismiss and Defendant Way's Motion toDismiss or, Alternatively, Stay Pending Arbitration is held in abeyance pending this Court's ruling on Defendant Exterran's Motion to Compel Arbitration. The Defendants' response to any motion to remand is held in abeyance pending this Court's ruling on Defendant Exterran's Motion to Compel Arbitration. Deadlines regarding items (b) and (c) above will be set after the Court rules on Exterran's Motion to Compel Arbitration. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Deadlines by Iberoamericana De Hidrocarburos S.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Oxford, Terrell) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/1/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Dismiss by Andrew Way, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Miles, Craig) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Dismiss by Exterran Corporation, Exterran Energy Solutions, LP, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Miles, Craig) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Exterran Corporation, Exterran Energy Solutions, LP, Andrew Way, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(Miles, Craig) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by Exterran Corporation, Exterran Energy Solutions, LP, Andrew Way, filed.(Miles, Craig) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ADVISORY by Exterran Corporation, Exterran Energy Solutions, LP, Andrew Way, filed.(Anderson, Jeremiah) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Harris County District Court, case number 2021-28031 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26560440) filed by Exterran Energy Solutions, LP, Exterran Corporation, Andrew Way. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Appendix Index, #10 Appendix Acceptance of Service, #11 Appendix State Court Docket, #12 Appendix Declaration, #13 Appendix State Court Notice, #14 Appendix Counsel of Record)(Anderson, Jeremiah) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Exterran Energy Solutions LP is a litigant

Latest cases where Exterran Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Terrell W. Oxford