This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/20/2022 at 07:41:25 (UTC).

Iannarelli v. United States Department of Health And Human Services et al

Case Summary

On 12/22/2021 Iannarelli filed a Civil Right - Housing/Accommodation Discrimination lawsuit against United States Department of Health And Human Services. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Alison J. Nathan and Katharine H. Parker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-10989

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Housing/Accommodation Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alison J. Nathan

Referral Judge

Katharine H. Parker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Anthony N Iannarelli

New York, NY 10014

Defendants

United States Department of Health And Human Services

Secretary Xavier Becerra

Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services

Novitas Solutions, Inc.

United Health Care

American Association for Retired Persons

AARP Services Inc.

John and Jane Does One through Twenty

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Anthony N Iannarelli, Jr

Attorney at Anthony N. Iannarelli Jr., Esq

135 Ft. Lee Road, Suite 202

Leonia, NJ 07605

Defendant Attorneys

Carly Iris Weinreb

Attorney at DOJ-USAO

86 Chambers Street, Ste Third Floor

New York, NY 10007

Michael H Bernstein

Attorney at Robinson & Cole LLP (NYC)

666 Third Avenue, 20Th Fl.

New York, NY 10017

Gregory James Bennici

Attorney at Robinson & Cole, LLP (Stamford)

1055 Washington Boulevard

Stamford, CT 06901

 

Court Documents

#15

No Description Available

#10

No Description Available

#29

(#29) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #27 Letter filed by Anthony N Iannarelli. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 2/4/2022) (jca) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

#28

(#28) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gregory James Bennici on behalf of AARP Services Inc., American Association for Retired Persons, United Health Care..(Bennici, Gregory) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

#27

(#27) LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Anthony Iannarelli dated 02/03/2022 re: Withdraw hearing frequest for TRO as to government defendants. Document filed by Anthony N Iannarelli..(Iannarelli, Anthony) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

#26

(#26) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent AARP, Inc. for AARP Services Inc.. Document filed by AARP Services Inc...(Bernstein, Michael) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

#25

(#25) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by American Association for Retired Persons..(Bernstein, Michael) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

#24

(#24) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent UnitedHealth Group Incorporated for United Health Care. Document filed by United Health Care..(Bernstein, Michael) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#23

(#23) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #18 Letter filed by Anthony N Iannarelli. ENDORSEMENT: The show cause hearing previously scheduled for January 31, 2022, is adjourned to March 2, 2022 at 10:00 AM. Any response/opposition papers must be filed by the defendants by February 23, 2022. SO ORDERED. ( Show Cause Response due by 2/23/2022., Show Cause Hearing set for 3/2/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Alison J. Nathan.) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 1/10/2022) (vfr) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#22

(#22) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #5 Order to Show Cause,,,,,,,, . Document filed by AARP Services Inc., American Association for Retired Persons, United Health Care..(Bernstein, Michael) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

#21

(#21) DECLARATION of Katie Stinson in Opposition re: #5 Order to Show Cause,,,,,,,,. Document filed by AARP Services Inc., American Association for Retired Persons, United Health Care..(Bernstein, Michael) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

#20

(#20) DECLARATION of Timothy Koenig in Opposition re: #5 Order to Show Cause,,,,,,,,. Document filed by AARP Services Inc., American Association for Retired Persons, United Health Care..(Bernstein, Michael) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

19 #7

Exhibit F-Printout of Opt-Out Search Results

19 #6

Exhibit E-Biographic Information

19 #5

Exhibit D-December 17, 2021 Letter

19 #4

Exhibit C-November 30, 2021 Notice of Denial

19 #3

Exhibit B- July 8, 2021 Letter

19 #2

Exhibit A-Plan G Certificate of Insurance

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #27 Letter filed by Anthony N Iannarelli. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 2/4/2022) (jca) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gregory James Bennici on behalf of AARP Services Inc., American Association for Retired Persons, United Health Care..(Bennici, Gregory) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Anthony Iannarelli dated 02/03/2022 re: Withdraw hearing frequest for TRO as to government defendants. Document filed by Anthony N Iannarelli..(Iannarelli, Anthony) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent AARP, Inc. for AARP Services Inc.. Document filed by AARP Services Inc...(Bernstein, Michael) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by American Association for Retired Persons..(Bernstein, Michael) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent UnitedHealth Group Incorporated for United Health Care. Document filed by United Health Care..(Bernstein, Michael) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #18 Letter filed by Anthony N Iannarelli. ENDORSEMENT: The show cause hearing previously scheduled for January 31, 2022, is adjourned to March 2, 2022 at 10:00 AM. Any response/opposition papers must be filed by the defendants by February 23, 2022. SO ORDERED. ( Show Cause Response due by 2/23/2022., Show Cause Hearing set for 3/2/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Alison J. Nathan.) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 1/10/2022) (vfr) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #5 Order to Show Cause,,,,,,,, . Document filed by AARP Services Inc., American Association for Retired Persons, United Health Care..(Bernstein, Michael) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) DECLARATION of Katie Stinson in Opposition re: #5 Order to Show Cause,,,,,,,,. Document filed by AARP Services Inc., American Association for Retired Persons, United Health Care..(Bernstein, Michael) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) DECLARATION of Timothy Koenig in Opposition re: #5 Order to Show Cause,,,,,,,,. Document filed by AARP Services Inc., American Association for Retired Persons, United Health Care..(Bernstein, Michael) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (gp) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (gp) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(gp) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Anthony N Iannarelli, Jr. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (gp) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Anthony N Iannarelli, Jr. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: United States Department of Health And Human Services and John and Jane Does One Through Twenty. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error. (gp) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) BRIEF re: Civil Case Opening Fee Payment, #3 Proposed Temporary Restraining Order, #2 Complaint, . Document filed by Anthony N Iannarelli. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Affidavit).(Iannarelli, Anthony) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PROPOSED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Document filed by Anthony N Iannarelli..(Iannarelli, Anthony) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Opening Fee Payment: for #2 Complaint,. Filing fee $ 402.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25504715..(Iannarelli, Anthony) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against AARP Services Inc., American Association for Retired Persons, Xavier Becerra, Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services, John and Jane Does 1-20, Novitas Solutions, Inc., U.S. Dept. of Human Services, United Health Care. Document filed by Anthony N Iannarelli. (Attachments: #1 Complaint Part 2).(Iannarelli, Anthony) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - COMPLAINT against AARP Services Inc., American Association for Retired Persons, Xavier Becerra, Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services, John and Jane Does 1-20, Novitas Solutions, Inc., U.S. Dept. of Human Services, United Health Care. Document filed by Anthony N Iannarelli..(Iannarelli, Anthony) Modified on 12/22/2021 (gp). (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AARP Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF RETIRED PERSONS, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Novitas Solutions, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Center for Medicare and Medicaid Services is a litigant