This case was last updated from PACER on 05/29/2020 at 09:41:50 (UTC).

IADELUCA v. HARBORCREEK YOUTH SERVICES

Case Summary

On 03/30/2020 IADELUCA filed an Other - False Claims Act lawsuit against HARBORCREEK YOUTH SERVICES. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Cathy Bissoon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00070

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - False Claims Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cathy Bissoon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ELIZABETH IADELUCA

Defendant

HARBORCREEK YOUTH SERVICES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richard T. Ruth

1026 West Twenty-Sixth Street

Erie, PA 16508

Defendant Attorneys

Neal R. Devlin

Attorney at Knox, McLaughlin, Gornall & Sennett

120 West Tenth Street

Erie, PA 16501

Aurora L. Hardin

Attorney at Knox McLaughlin Gornall & Sennett P.C.

120 West 10Th Street

Erie, PA 16501

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by HARBORCREEK YOUTH SERVICES. HARBORCREEK YOUTH SERVICES waiver sent on 3/31/2020, answer due 6/1/2020. (Devlin, Neal) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Neal R. Devlin on behalf of HARBORCREEK YOUTH SERVICES. (Devlin, Neal) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Aurora L. Hardin on behalf of HARBORCREEK YOUTH SERVICES. (Hardin, Aurora) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

#2

(#2) ORDER governing procedures for motions filed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12. See contents of this filing for instructions. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 3/30/20. (dcd) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against HARBORCREEK YOUTH SERVICES (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5535887), filed by ELIZABETH IADELUCA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (cel) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2020
  • DocketFINAL NOTICE: In preparation of the Court's conversion to NextGen, our Court's CM/ECF system will be unavailable from 12:00 p.m. (Noon) on Friday, May 22, 2020, until 11:59 pm. Monday, May 25, 2020. Please plan accordingly. Complete information, including a checklist of actions regarding the WDPA NexGen CM/ECF implementation, can be found #here. Preparing for NextGen is a two-step process. The first step is to upgrade any legacy PACER accounts. The second step is to link that upgraded PACER account with your WDPA CM/ECF account after the Court goes live with NextGen. To link your account, you will need your current e-filing credentials from our Court. If your CM/ECF login contains any special characters (anything other than a letter or number), you will need to change it as logins with those characters will be unable to link to PACER accounts. No later than Thursday, May 21, 2020, you should log into both PACER and the current version of CM/ECF to review and record your current e-filing credentials for both, as you will need to know them in order to e-file after May 23, 2020. Please consult the Court's #administrative order for additional information on deadlines and alternative filing options during this period. (Administrator, ) (ADI) (Entered: 05/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2020
  • DocketIMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania will be upgrading its current CM/ECF system to the Next Generation of CM/ECF on May 26, 2020. Complete information, including a checklist of actions regarding the WDPA NexGen CM/ECF implementation, can be found #here. Preparing for NextGen is a two-step process. The first step is to upgrade any legacy PACER accounts. Each attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account in order to electronically file after our conversion to NextGen. The second step will be to link that upgraded PACER account with your WDPA CM/ECF account after the Court goes live with NextGen. To link your account, you will need your current e-filing credentials from our Court. If your CM/ECF login contains a special character (such as &, @, $, *), you will need to change it as logins with those characters will be unable to link to PACER accounts. No later than Thursday, May 21, 2020, you should log into both PACER and the current version of CM/ECF to (1) review and record your current e-filing credentials for both, as you will need to know them in order to e-file after May 23, 2020 and (2) ensure that your primary email address to receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEF) is accurate. Failure to provide an accurate email address may result in a delay in receiving NEFs after the Court converts to NextGen. (Administrator, ) (ADI) (Entered: 04/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by HARBORCREEK YOUTH SERVICES. HARBORCREEK YOUTH SERVICES waiver sent on 3/31/2020, answer due 6/1/2020. (Devlin, Neal) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Neal R. Devlin on behalf of HARBORCREEK YOUTH SERVICES. (Devlin, Neal) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Aurora L. Hardin on behalf of HARBORCREEK YOUTH SERVICES. (Hardin, Aurora) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER governing procedures for motions filed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12. See contents of this filing for instructions. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 3/30/20. (dcd) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against HARBORCREEK YOUTH SERVICES (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5535887), filed by ELIZABETH IADELUCA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (cel) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less