Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 10/20/2019 at 07:02:47 (UTC).

I.A. et al v. BARR et al

Case Summary

On 08/21/2019 I A filed an Other lawsuit against BARR. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy J. Kelly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02530

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy J. Kelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

A.G.

L.C.

TAHIRIH JUSTICE CENTER

E.B.

I.A.

L.A.

M.X.

A.L.G.

N.B.

Defendants

MATTHEW ALBENCE

KEVIN K. MCALEENAN

U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT

KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI

U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES

WILLIAM BARR

JAMES MCHENRY

U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION

EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF IMMIGRATION REVIEW

MARK MORGAN

7 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Arthur B. Spitzer

Attorney at AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

915 15Th Street, Nw, 2Nd Floor

Washington, DC 20005

Keren Hart Zwick

Attorney at NATIONAL IMMIGRANT JUSTICE CENTER

224 S Michigan Avenue, Suite 600

Chicago, IL 60604

Celso Perez

Attorney at ACLU IMMIGRANTS' RIGHTS PROJECT

125 Broad Street, 18Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

Katrina Eiland

Attorney at AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION

39 Drumm St

San Francisco, CA 94111

Omar C. Jadwat

Attorney at AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION

125 Broad Street, 18Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

Cody H. Wofsy

Attorney at AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION

39 Drumm Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Charles G. Roth

Attorney at NATIONAL IMMIGRANT JUSTICE CENTER

224 S Michigan Avenue, Suite 600

Chicago, IL 60604

Scott Michelman

Attorney at AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

915 15Th Street, Nw, 2Nd Floor

Washington, DC 20005

Lee Gelernt

Attorney at AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION

125 Broad Street, 18Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

Julie Veroff

Attorney at ACLU IMMIGRANTS' RIGHTS PROJECT

39 Drumm Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Gianna Borroto

Attorney at NATIONAL IMMIGRANT JUSTICE CENTER

224 S Michigan Avenue, Suite 600

Chicago, IL 60604

Daniel Antonio Galindo

Attorney at ACLU FOUNDATION IMMIGRANTS' RIGHTS PROJECT

125 Broad Street, 18Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

Defendant Attorneys

Lauren Crowell Bingham

Attorney at U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

P.O. Box 868, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

Scott Grant Stewart

Attorney at U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Erez Reuveni

Attorney at U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

P.O. Box 868, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

Other Attorneys

Lawrence J. Joseph

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF LAWRENCE J. JOSEPH

1250 Connecticut Avenue, Nw, Suite 700-1A

Washington, DC 20036

 

Court Documents

#48

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#47

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#46

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#45

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#44

RESTRICTED

#43

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#41

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

40 #2

Exhibit N.B. Redacted Interview Notice

40 #1

Exhibit Declaration of Elizabeth Burgus

6 #1

Declaration Tahirih Declaration

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Keren Hart Zwick on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Zwick, Keren) (Main Document 5 replaced on 8/22/2019) (ztth). (Entered: 08/21/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by A.G., A.L.G., E.B., I.A., L.A., L.C., M.X., N.B., TAHIRIH JUSTICE CENTER. Case related to Case No. 19-cv-2117. (ztth) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

3 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) COMPLAINT against MATTHEW ALBENCE, WILLIAM BARR, KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF IMMIGRATION REVIEW, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, JAMES MCHENRY, MARK MORGAN, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616100295) filed by A.G., E.B., I.A., A.L.G., L.C., TAHIRIH JUSTICE CENTER, N.B., M.X., L.A.. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ztth) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

#2

(#2) MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 8/21/2019. (ztth) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

1 #2

*Restricted*

1 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#1

(#1) MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonym by A.G., A.L.G., E.B., I.A., L.A., L.C., M.X., N.B., TAHIRIH JUSTICE CENTER (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (tth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/21/2019: #2 Exhibit) (ztth). (Entered: 08/21/2019)

77 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#48) SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to support motion for summary judgment filed by MATTHEW ALBENCE, WILLIAM BARR, KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II, EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF IMMIGRATION REVIEW, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, JAMES MCHENRY, MARK MORGAN, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Reuveni, Erez) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#47) NOTICE of Correction re #41 Supplemental Memorandum by A.C., A.G., A.L.G., C.S., D.C., E.B., I.A., L.A., L.C., M.X., N.B., P.P., TAHIRIH JUSTICE CENTER, Y.D. (Borroto, Gianna) Modified to add link on 10/16/2019 (znmw). (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#46) RESPONSE re #43 Civil Statement filed by A.C., A.G., A.L.G., C.S., D.C., E.B., I.A., L.A., L.C., M.X., N.B., P.P., TAHIRIH JUSTICE CENTER, Y.D.. (Borroto, Gianna) Modified to add link on 10/16/2019 (znmw). (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) RESPONSE re #41 Civil Statement filed by MATTHEW ALBENCE, WILLIAM BARR, KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II, EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF IMMIGRATION REVIEW, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, JAMES MCHENRY, MARK MORGAN, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Reuveni, Erez) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) TRANSCRIPT OF MOTION HEARING before Judge Timothy J. Kelly held on 9-25-19; Page Numbers: 1-79; Date of Issuance: 10-4-19; Court Reporter: Timothy R. Miller, Telephone Number (202) 354-3111. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <

    <

    <

    <

    <

    < Redaction Request due 10/25/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/4/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/2/2020.(Miller, Timothy) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re #40 Civil Statement, (corrected) filed by MATTHEW ALBENCE, WILLIAM BARR, KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II, EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF IMMIGRATION REVIEW, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, JAMES MCHENRY, MARK MORGAN, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Reuveni, Erez) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) NOTICE of correction and mootness by MATTHEW ALBENCE, WILLIAM BARR, KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II, EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF IMMIGRATION REVIEW, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, JAMES MCHENRY, MARK MORGAN, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Reuveni, Erez) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM re #6 Statement of Material Facts Not in Genuine Dispute from Plaintiffs. (Borroto, Gianna) Modified event title and link on 10/3/2019 (znmw). (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM re #6 Statement of Undisputed Material Facts from Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Elizabeth Burgus, #2 Exhibit N.B. Redacted Interview Notice)(Bingham, Lauren) Modified event title and link on 10/3/2019 (znmw). (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Timothy J. Kelly: Motion Hearing held on 9/25/2019 re #27 Emergency MOTION to Stay Removal. Oral argument heard and taken under advisement. (Court Reporter: Timothy Miller) (zkh) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Crowell Bingham on behalf of MATTHEW ALBENCE, WILLIAM BARR, KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF IMMIGRATION REVIEW, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, JAMES MCHENRY, MARK MORGAN, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Bingham, Lauren) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTE ORDER: In light of the Joint Statement filed by the parties in Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition et al. v. Trump et al. ("CAIR"), Civil Action No. 19-2117, ECF No. 40, it is hereby ORDERED that the following schedule shall govern further proceedings: (1) Defendants shall file their opposition to Plaintiffs' #6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by August 28, 2019; (2) Plaintiffs shall file their reply by September 3, 2019; and (3) the parties shall appear for a hearing on Plaintiffs' motion on September 11, 2019, at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 11. As the Court noted in its order in CAIR, Defendants are permitted to file a consolidated memorandum in opposition addressing both Plaintiffs' motion in this case and the plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction in CAIR, provided that Defendants file the memorandum on both dockets. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 8/22/2019. (lctjk2) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur B. Spitzer on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Spitzer, Arthur) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by A.G., A.L.G., E.B., I.A., L.A., L.C., M.X., N.B., TAHIRIH JUSTICE CENTER (Attachments: #1 Declaration Tahirih Declaration, #2 Declaration KIND Declaration, #3 Declaration Anker & Hathaway Declaration)(Zwick, Keren) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Keren Hart Zwick on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Zwick, Keren) (Main Document 5 replaced on 8/22/2019) (ztth). (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by A.G., A.L.G., E.B., I.A., L.A., L.C., M.X., N.B., TAHIRIH JUSTICE CENTER. Case related to Case No. 19-cv-2117. (ztth) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • SUMMONS (13) Issued as to MATTHEW ALBENCE, WILLIAM BARR, KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF IMMIGRATION REVIEW, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, JAMES MCHENRY, MARK MORGAN, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (ztth) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) COMPLAINT against MATTHEW ALBENCE, WILLIAM BARR, KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF IMMIGRATION REVIEW, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, JAMES MCHENRY, MARK MORGAN, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616100295) filed by A.G., E.B., I.A., A.L.G., L.C., TAHIRIH JUSTICE CENTER, N.B., M.X., L.A.. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ztth) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 8/21/2019. (ztth) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonym by A.G., A.L.G., E.B., I.A., L.A., L.C., M.X., N.B., TAHIRIH JUSTICE CENTER (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (tth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/21/2019: #2 Exhibit) (ztth). (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where A.G. is a litigant

Latest cases where EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE is a litigant

Latest cases where L.A. is a litigant