This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/11/2020 at 10:46:31 (UTC).

I. v. Aetna Life and Health Insurance et al

Case Summary

On 06/12/2020 I filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Aetna Life and Health Insurance. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District. The Judge overseeing this case is Dustin B. Pead. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00365

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Courthouse:

    Utah District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dustin B. Pead

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jillian I.

Defendants

Wells Fargo & Company Health Plan

Aetna Life and Health Insurance

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brent J. Newton

Attorney at BRIAN S KING PC

420 E South Temple Ste 420

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Brian S. King

Attorney at BRIAN S KING PC

420 E South Temple Ste 420

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Nediha Hadzikadunic

Attorney at BRIAN S KING PC

420 E South Temple Ste 420

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jillian I. as to Wells Fargo & Company Health Plan Waiver sent on 6/16/2020, answer due 8/17/2020. (King, Brian) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

#5

(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Aetna Life and Health Insurance, Wells Fargo & Company Health Plan. filed by Jillian I.. (King, Brian) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jillian I. as to Aetna Life and Health Insurance Waiver sent on 6/16/2020, answer due 8/17/2020. (King, Brian) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within twenty-one (21) days after any defendant has been served or any defendant has appeared, unless any party is appearing pro se. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 6/13/20. (alf) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3608537) filed by Jillian I.. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead (King, Brian) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

#1

(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Plaintiff Jillian I. is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (kn) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jillian I. as to Wells Fargo & Company Health Plan Waiver sent on 6/16/2020, answer due 8/17/2020. (King, Brian) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Aetna Life and Health Insurance, Wells Fargo & Company Health Plan. filed by Jillian I.. (King, Brian) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jillian I. as to Aetna Life and Health Insurance Waiver sent on 6/16/2020, answer due 8/17/2020. (King, Brian) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within twenty-one (21) days after any defendant has been served or any defendant has appeared, unless any party is appearing pro se. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 6/13/20. (alf) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3608537) filed by Jillian I.. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead (King, Brian) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Plaintiff Jillian I. is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (kn) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Aetna Life and Health Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nediha Hadzikadunic

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brent J. Newton