This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/29/2021 at 18:56:18 (UTC).

Hyundai Motor Company v. TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd et al

Case Summary

On May 28, 2021, Hyundai Motor Company (“Hyundai” or “Plaintiff”), represented by Man Li of Mei and Mark LLP, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against TYC Brother Industrial Co., Ltd. (“TYC”) and Genera Corp. (“Genera”) (collectively, “Defendants”), seeking injunctive relief, actual and treble damages among other reliefs for alleged infringement of Plaintiff;s patent and copyright protected headlamps and taillamps. This case was filed in U.S. District Court in the Central District of California with Judges Autumn D. Spaeth and Josephine L. Staton presiding. 

 

In its complaint, the Plaintiff alleged that “Defendants have designed the ornamental features and sculptural appearance of their replacement headlamps and taillamps to look exactly like HYUNDAI’s patent and copyright protected headlamps and taillamps through widespread patent and copyright infringement.”

 

The Plaintiff further alleged that “Defendants’ false advertising has the tendency to deceive a substantial segment of the public and consumers in California and across the United States into believing that they are purchasing a product with different characteristics. The deception is material because it is likely to influence a consumer’s purchasing decision.” and furthermore that “Defendants have imported, sold, and/or offered to sell in the United States infringing headlamps and taillamps for at least the following HYUNDAI vehicles: Sonata, Veloster, Santa Fe, Elantra, Accent, Kona, and Tucson.”

 

The Plaintiff also alleged that “Defendants have made, had made, used, offered for sale, imported, and/or sold, and continue to make, use, offer for sale, import, and/or sell products which infringe HYUNDAI’s sculptural work copyrights. The copying, importing, offering for sale, and selling of the infringing products by Defendants was and is without the permission, license, or consent of HYUNDAI.”

 

The Plaintiff even further alleged that “Defendants have made and published, in interstate commerce and in this District, advertising that contains false or misleading statements of fact regarding its products to induce the public to purchase their products. This advertising contains actual misstatements and/or misleading statements, including falsely representing compliance with FMVSS 108 and a lack of difference in function between Defendants’ lamps and HYUNDAI’s lamps—attributes important to a consumer’s purchasing decision. For example, Defendants have introduced their false and misleading statements into California at least via advertising on their website (https://www.tycusa.com/Headlight.html)”

 

The Plaintiff has laid down twenty two claims for relief, wherein the first twenty claims are for alleged infringement of Design Patents numbers namely: D’478 patent, D’8835 patent, D’5835 patent, D’690 patent, D’476 patent, D’217 patent, D’436 patent, D’057 patent, D’574 patent, D’980 patent, D’864 patent, D’865 patent, D’413 patent, D’292 patent, D’957 patent, D’351 patent, “D’163 patent, D’947 patent, D’225 Patent and D’486 patent. The twenty first claim is for alleged copyright infringement, and the last claim is for alleged False Advertising / Unfair Competition – Lanham Act.

 

In its prayer for relief, The Plaintiff has requested the Court to declare that Defendants have infringed the asserted patents and copyright, grant permanent injunction against Defendants from future infringement, award damages which in no event less than a reasonable royalty along with prejudgment and postjudgment interest. Plaintiff further requested the Court to award treble damages, Disgorgement of wrongfully obtained profits and damages and injunctive relief for false advertisement along with costs of litigation. 

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents. 

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:21-CV-00959

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Autumn D. Spaeth

Presiding Judge

Josephine L. Staton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hyundai Motor Company

Defendants

TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd

Genera Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Man Li

Attorney at Mei and Mark LLP

433 North Camden Drive Suite 400

Beverly Hills, CA 90210

Edward J. Naidich

Attorney at Mei and Mark LLP

818 - 18Th Street Nw Suite 410

Washington, DC 20006

Guang-Yu Zhu

Attorney at Mei and Mark LLP

818 18Th Street Nw No 410

Washington, DC 20006

Kyongtaek K Mun

Attorney at Mei and Mark LLP

818 Eighteenth Street Nw Suite 410

Washington, DC 20006

 

Court Documents

#24

23 #1

Proposed Order

23 #23

Main Document

#22

#21

19 #2

Proposed Order

17 #1

Certificates of Good Standing

14 #2

Proposed Order

14 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

25 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT AND TO ACCEPT SERVICE #23 by Judge Josephine L. Staton that The time for Defendants, TYC Brother Industrial Co., Ltd. and Genera Corporation, to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's initial Complaint is extended for a period of forty-five (45) days, from 6/29/2021, up to and including 8/13/2021. See document for further information. (jp) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to August 13, 2021 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,, #1 filed by Plaintiff Hyundai Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Li, Man) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Hyundai Motor Company, upon Defendant Genera Corp. served on 6/8/2021, answer due 6/29/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Teresa Guerrero - office administrator for William Newman, Registered Agent for Service of Process, at 2800 Saturn St., Brea, CA 92821-6201 in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entitya.Original Summons NOT returned. (Li, Man) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Hyundai Motor Company, upon Defendant TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd served on 6/8/2021, answer due 6/29/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Teresa Guerrero - office administrator for William Newman, Registered Agent for Service of Process, at 2800 Saturn St., Brea, CA 92821-6201 in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entitya.Original Summons NOT returned. (Li, Man) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Text Only ORDER GRANTING Applications of Non-Resident Attorney Edward J. Naidich to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Hyundai Motor Company #14 #17 , Application of Non-Resident Attorney Guang-Yu Zhu to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Hyundai Motor Company #18 , and Application of Non-Resident Attorney Kyongtaek K. Mun to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Hyundai Motor Company #19 pursuant to the Courts directive. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mku) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kyongtaek K. Mun to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Hyundai Motor Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31437511) filed by Plaintiff Hyundai Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Li, Man) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Guang-Yu Zhu to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Hyundai Motor Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31436807) filed by Plaintiff Hyundai Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Li, Man) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Edward J. Naidich to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Hyundai Motor Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 6/7/2021, Receipt No. ACACDC-31422124) filed by Plaintiff Hyundai Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Li, Man) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form,, #15 Clerk failed to list correct case name and case number to Deficiency Notice 15. (lt) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Edward J. Naidich to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Hyundai Motor Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31422124) #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(a) Application not complete: state and/or federal courts to which the applicant has been admitted are not listed. Case information is incomplete. DJ and MJ initials missing on application and proposed order. (lt) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants Genera Corp., TYC Brother Industrial Co Ltd. (esa) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (esa) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Hyundai Motor Company. Related Case(s): 8:21-CV-00966 (Li, Man) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Hyundai Motor Company. (Li, Man) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Hyundai Motor Company. (Li, Man) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Hyundai Motor Company, (Li, Man) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,, #1 filed by Plaintiff Hyundai Motor Company. (Li, Man) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Hyundai Motor Company. (Li, Man) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31375469 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Hyundai Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit US design patent D478, #2 Exhibit US design patent D8835, #3 Exhibit US design patent D5835, #4 Exhibit US design patent D690, #5 Exhibit US design patent D476, #6 Exhibit US design patent D217, #7 Exhibit US design patent D436, #8 Exhibit US design patent D057, #9 Exhibit US design patent D574, #10 Exhibit US design patent D980, #11 Exhibit US design patent D864, #12 Exhibit US design patent D865, #13 Exhibit US design patent D413, #14 Exhibit US design patent D292, #15 Exhibit US design patent D957, #16 Exhibit US design patent D351, #17 Exhibit US design patent D163, #18 Exhibit US design patent D947, #19 Exhibit US design patent D225, #20 Exhibit US design patent D486, #21 Exhibit Korean copyright registration, #22 Exhibit Korean copyright registration, #23 Exhibit Korean copyright registration, #24 Exhibit Korean copyright registration, #25 Exhibit Korean copyright registration, #26 Exhibit Korean copyright registration, #27 Exhibit Korean copyright registration, #28 Exhibit Korean copyright registration, #29 Exhibit Korean copyright registration, #30 Exhibit Korean copyright registration, #31 Exhibit Korean copyright registration, #32 Exhibit Korean copyright registration, #33 Exhibit Korean copyright registration, #34 Exhibit Korean copyright registration, #35 Exhibit Korean copyright registration) (Attorney Man Li added to party Hyundai Motor Company(pty:pla))(Li, Man) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Genera Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases where HYUNDAI MOTOR AMERICA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Guang-Yu Zhu