This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/20/2020 at 09:07:42 (UTC).

Hytonen v. Cavalry SPV I, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/21/2020 Hytonen filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Cavalry SPV I, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Audrey G. Fleissig. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-01119

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Audrey G. Fleissig

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jarmo Hytonen

Defendants

Services Rendered, Inc.

Berman & Rabin, P.A.

Cavalry SPV I, LLC

Cavalry Portfolio Services, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James P. Krupp

Attorney at KRUPP LAW FIRM LLC

12813 Flushing Meadows Drive, Suite 150

St. Louis, MO 63131

Defendant Attorneys

Peter N. Leritz

Attorney at LERITZ AND PLUNKERT PC

555 Washington Avenue, Suite 600

St. Louis, MO 63101

Rachel Beth Ommerman

Attorney at BERMAN AND RABIN PA - Overland Park

15280 Metcalf Avenue

Overland Park, KS 66223

Joshua C. Dickinson

Attorney at SPENCER FANE LLP - Omaha

13520 California St., Suite 290

Omaha, NE 68154

Shilee T. Mullin

Attorney at SPENCER FANE LLP - Omaha

13520 California St., Suite 290

Omaha, NE 68154

 

Court Documents

25 #1

Ex A - Newcomb Order

#25

(#25) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court City Of St. Louis, Missouri filed by Defendants Cavalry Portfolio Services, LLC, Cavalry SPV I, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Ex A - Newcomb Order)(Dickinson, Joshua) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

#22

(#22) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #20 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Berman & Rabin, P.A. and by Plaintiff Jarmo Hytonen. (Krupp, James) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#21

(#21) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #20 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Berman & Rabin, P.A. and filed by Defendants Cavalry Portfolio Services, LLC, Cavalry SPV I, LLC. (Dickinson, Joshua) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#20

(#20) Joint MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Berman & Rabin, P.A. and by Defendants Cavalry Portfolio Services, LLC, Cavalry SPV I, LLC. (Dickinson, Joshua) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#19

(#19) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 First MOTION to Dismiss Party Defendant Services Rendered, Inc. by Plaintiff Jarmo Hytonen. (Krupp, James) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#18

(#18) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #17 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court City Of St. Louis, Missouri filed by Plaintiff Jarmo Hytonen. (Krupp, James) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#17

(#17) MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court City Of St. Louis, Missouri by Plaintiff Jarmo Hytonen. (Krupp, James) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#16

(#16) First MOTION to Dismiss Party by Defendant Services Rendered, Inc.. (Leritz, Peter) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

#3

(#3) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Cavalry SPV I, LLC.. (Dickinson, Joshua) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

2 #2

Original Filing Form

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) NOTICE Additional exhibits to Notice of Removal: by Defendants Cavalry Portfolio Services, LLC, Cavalry SPV I, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal Petition, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form)(Dickinson, Joshua) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

1 #4

Ex D - Cases

1 #3

Ex C - Rabin Declaration

1 #2

Ex B - Thomas Declaration

1 #1

Ex A - State Court Action

#1

(#2) NOTICE Additional exhibits to Notice of Removal: by Defendants Cavalry Portfolio Services, LLC, Cavalry SPV I, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal Petition, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form)(Dickinson, Joshua) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court City Of St. Louis, Missouri filed by Defendants Cavalry Portfolio Services, LLC, Cavalry SPV I, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Ex A - Newcomb Order)(Dickinson, Joshua) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Docket Text ORDER: Re: #22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #20 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Berman & Rabin, P.A. and by Plaintiff Jarmo Hytonen. (Krupp, James) filed by Jarmo Hytonen ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 9/21/2020. (JMP) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Docket Text ORDER: Re: #19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 First MOTION to Dismiss Party Defendant Services Rendered, Inc. by Plaintiff Jarmo Hytonen. (Krupp, James) filed by Jarmo Hytonen ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 9/21/2020. (JMP) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #20 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Berman & Rabin, P.A. and by Plaintiff Jarmo Hytonen. (Krupp, James) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #20 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Berman & Rabin, P.A. and filed by Defendants Cavalry Portfolio Services, LLC, Cavalry SPV I, LLC. (Dickinson, Joshua) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Joint MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Berman & Rabin, P.A. and by Defendants Cavalry Portfolio Services, LLC, Cavalry SPV I, LLC. (Dickinson, Joshua) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 First MOTION to Dismiss Party Defendant Services Rendered, Inc. by Plaintiff Jarmo Hytonen. (Krupp, James) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #17 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court City Of St. Louis, Missouri filed by Plaintiff Jarmo Hytonen. (Krupp, James) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court City Of St. Louis, Missouri by Plaintiff Jarmo Hytonen. (Krupp, James) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) First MOTION to Dismiss Party by Defendant Services Rendered, Inc.. (Leritz, Peter) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Rachel B. Ommerman. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8103337) by Defendant Berman & Rabin, P.A.. (Attachments: #1 Kansas Certificate of Good Standing, #2 DCKS Certificate of Good Standing)(Ommerman, Rachel) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Cavalry Portfolio Services, LLC, Cavalry SPV I, LLC Sent To: State Court - Executed (Attachments: #1 Ex 1 - Notice to State Court of Filing Notice of Removal)(Dickinson, Joshua) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ENTRY of Appearance by Shilee T. Mullin for Defendants Cavalry Portfolio Services, LLC, Cavalry SPV I, LLC. (Mullin, Shilee) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketCase Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig. (BAK) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, St. Louis County, Missouri, filed by Jarmo Hytonen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13)(BAK) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Cavalry Portfolio Services, LLC, Cavalry SPV I, LLC Sent To: Plaintiff (Dickinson, Joshua) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Cavalry Portfolio Services, LLC.. (Dickinson, Joshua) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Cavalry SPV I, LLC.. (Dickinson, Joshua) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE Additional exhibits to Notice of Removal: by Defendants Cavalry Portfolio Services, LLC, Cavalry SPV I, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal Petition, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form)(Dickinson, Joshua) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from City of St. Louis Circuit Court, case number 2022-CC00887, with receipt number AMOEDC-8092550, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Cavalry Portfolio Services, LLC, Cavalry SPV I, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Ex A - State Court Action, #2 Ex B - Thomas Declaration, #3 Ex C - Rabin Declaration, #4 Ex D - Cases)(Dickinson, Joshua) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Berman & Rabin, P.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF GMAC is a litigant

Latest cases where CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James P. Krupp