This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/07/2023 at 10:19:07 (UTC).

HyperQuery, LLC v. Samsung Electronics America, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/06/2023 HyperQuery, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Samsung Electronics America, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert Pitman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:23-CV-00007

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert Pitman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HyperQuery, LLC

Defendant

Samsung Electronics America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William P. Ramey, III

Attorney at Ramey LLP

5020 Montrose Blvd., Suite 800

Houston, TX 77006

Defendant Attorneys

Michael E. Jones

Attorney at Potter Minton

102 North College, Ste 900

Tyler, TN 75702

Shaun William Hassett

Attorney at Potter Minton

102 North College, Suite 900

Tyler, TX 75702

Melissa Richards Smith

Attorney at Gillam and Smith, LLP

303 South Washington Avenue

Marshall, TX 75670

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shaun William Hassett on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. Attorney Shaun William Hassett added to party Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(pty:dft) (Hassett, Shaun) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael E. Jones on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. Attorney Michael E. Jones added to party Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(pty:dft) (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

9 #1

Proposed Order

9 #9

Main Document

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. Attorney Melissa Richards Smith added to party Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(pty:dft) (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 01/18/2023)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by HyperQuery, LLC. Samsung Electronics America, Inc. served on 1/10/2023, answer due 1/31/2023. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (sm3) (Entered: 01/09/2023)

5 #1

Exhibit A

5 #5

Main Document

#4

(#4) Certificate of Interested Parties by HyperQuery, LLC. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by HyperQuery, LLC. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shaun William Hassett on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. Attorney Shaun William Hassett added to party Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(pty:dft) (Hassett, Shaun) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael E. Jones on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. Attorney Michael E. Jones added to party Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(pty:dft) (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Samsung Electronics America, Inc. answer due 3/17/2023. (sm3) (Entered: 01/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before March 17, 2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jllc) (Entered: 01/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , MOVE OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 01/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. Attorney Melissa Richards Smith added to party Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(pty:dft) (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 01/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by HyperQuery, LLC. Samsung Electronics America, Inc. served on 1/10/2023, answer due 1/31/2023. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (sm3) (Entered: 01/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. Case assigned to Judge Pitman due to a related open case. (sm3) (Entered: 01/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE Notice of Related Cases by HyperQuery, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ramey, William) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certificate of Interested Parties by HyperQuery, LLC. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by HyperQuery, LLC. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-16932614), filed by HyperQuery, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ramey, William) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less