This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/28/2020 at 07:25:29 (UTC).

Hydro Net LLC v. Zebra Technologies Corporation

Case Summary

On 09/29/2020 Hydro Net LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Zebra Technologies Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Martha M. Pacold. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-05794

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Martha M. Pacold

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hydro Net LLC

Defendant

Zebra Technologies Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Isaac Philip Rabicoff

Attorney at Rabicoff Law LLC

73 W Monroe St

Chicago, IL 60603

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

6 #1

Initial Status Report outline

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold:Plaintiff's unopposed motion for extension of time to answer the complaint or otherwise plead #5 is granted. Defendant to answer or otherwise plead to Plaintiff's complaint by 12/21/2020. The parties are directed to file a joint status report by 1/11/2021. (Attachments: #1 Initial Status Report outline) (rao, ) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION by Plaintiff Hydro Net LLC for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (UNOPPOSED) (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Zebra Technologies Corporation (cm, ) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MAILED Patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (ph, ) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Martha M. Pacold. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Heather K. McShain. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cp, ) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hydro Net LLC (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Hydro Net LLC by Isaac Philip Rabicoff (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Hydro Net LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17487806. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Zebra Technologies Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Hydro Net LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Isaac Philip Rabicoff