Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 09/27/2019 at 07:54:33 (UTC).

Hydraulics International v. Amalga Composites

Case Summary

On 07/29/2019 Hydraulics International filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Amalga Composites. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District. The Judge overseeing this case is Paul M. Warner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00535

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Utah District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul M. Warner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hydraulics International

Defendant

Amalga Composites

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Peter L. Lattin

Attorney at HOWARD LEWIS & PETERSEN

120 E 300 N

Provo, UT 84606

Kenneth Parkinson

Attorney at HOWARD LEWIS & PETERSEN

120 E 300 N

Provo, UT 84606

Defendant Attorneys

Angela B. Harden

Attorney at HUSCH BLACKWELL LLP

555 E Wells St Ste 1900

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Laurie A. Haynie

Attorney at HUSCH BLACKWELL

120 S Riverside Plaza Ste 2200

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) by Defendant Amalga Composites, Plaintiff Hydraulics International. (nl) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

11 #1

Exhibit A - Terms and Conditions

#11

(#11) AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION of John DeLuca in Support re #10 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss, or, in the Alternative, to Change Venue filed by Defendant Amalga Composites. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Terms and Conditions)(Harden, Angela) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

#10

(#10) MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss, or, in the Alternative, to Change Venue filed by Defendant Amalga Composites. (Harden, Angela) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Amalga Composites, Plaintiff Hydraulics International. Form due by 9/24/2019. (nl) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Angela B. Harden for Amalga Composites. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 9/5/2019. (las) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

#7

(#7) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Angela B. Harden , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3365005, filed by Defendant Amalga Composites. (Haynie, Laurie) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Laurie A. Haynie on behalf of Amalga Composites (Haynie, Laurie) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 7/30/2019. (nl) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

#3

RESTRICTED

2 #2

Exhibit Exhibits

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against Amalga Composites (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3334442) filed by Hydraulics International. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibits) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner (Parkinson, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

#1

(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner. Plaintiff Hydraulics International is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nl) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) by Defendant Amalga Composites, Plaintiff Hydraulics International. (nl) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • (#13) RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Amalga Composites. (nl) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • (#12) RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Hydraulics International. (nl) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION of John DeLuca in Support re #10 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss, or, in the Alternative, to Change Venue filed by Defendant Amalga Composites. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Terms and Conditions)(Harden, Angela) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss, or, in the Alternative, to Change Venue filed by Defendant Amalga Composites. (Harden, Angela) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Amalga Composites, Plaintiff Hydraulics International. Form due by 9/24/2019. (nl) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Angela B. Harden for Amalga Composites. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 9/5/2019. (las) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Angela B. Harden , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3365005, filed by Defendant Amalga Composites. (Haynie, Laurie) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Laurie A. Haynie on behalf of Amalga Composites (Haynie, Laurie) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hydraulics International as to Amalga Composites served on 8/5/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Parkinson, Kenneth) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 7/30/2019. (nl) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Amalga Composites. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against Amalga Composites (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3334442) filed by Hydraulics International. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibits) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner (Parkinson, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner. Plaintiff Hydraulics International is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nl) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HYDRAULICS INTERNATIONAL INC. is a litigant