This case was last updated from PACER on 02/02/2020 at 07:35:03 (UTC).

Hybrid International, LLC v. Scotia International of Nevada

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 Hybrid International, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Scotia International of Nevada. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Elayna J. Youchah and James C. Mahan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02077

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Elayna J. Youchah

Presiding Judge

James C. Mahan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Hybrid International, LLC

3Rd Party Plaintiff, Defendant and Counter Claimant

Scotia International of Nevada, Inc.

3Rd Party Defendant

Johnathan Schultz

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Anna Helen Karabachev

Attorney at Kemp, Jones & Coulthard

3800 Howard Hughes Pkwy Ste 1700

Las Vegas, NV 89169

Spencer H. Gunnerson

Attorney at Kemp, Jones & Coulthard, LLP

3800 Howard Hughes Parkway

Las Vegas, NV 89169

3Rd Party Plaintiff, Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

Randall K. Edwards

Attorney at Randall K. Edwards, PLLC

136 South Main Street

Salt Lake City, UT 84101

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Scotia International of Nevada, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. (Edwards, Randall) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#7

(#7) ANSWER with Jury Demand re #1 Petition for Removal,, and Complaint filed therein (, Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 2/24/2020.), THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Johnathan Schultz by Scotia International of Nevada, Inc.., COUNTERCLAIM against Hybrid International, LLC by Scotia International of Nevada, Inc.. filed by Scotia International of Nevada, Inc..(Edwards, Randall) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Hybrid International, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Johnathan Schultz, Other Affiliate Makhosi John Makhosi for Hybrid International, LLC added. (Gunnerson, Spencer) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#5

(#5) Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Hybrid International, LLC. (Gunnerson, Spencer) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#4

(#4) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Scotia International of Nevada, Inc.. (Edwards, Randall) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Scotia International of Nevada, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Edwards, Randall) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#2

(#2) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 12/4/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 12/19/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 1/3/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit Summons and Comlaint

#1

(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from District Court, Clark County, Nevada, Case Number A-19-805886-B, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5799198) by Scotia International of Nevada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Comlaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Edwards, Randall) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 12/04/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Scotia International of Nevada, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. (Edwards, Randall) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER with Jury Demand re #1 Petition for Removal,, and Complaint filed therein (, Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 2/24/2020.), THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Johnathan Schultz by Scotia International of Nevada, Inc.., COUNTERCLAIM against Hybrid International, LLC by Scotia International of Nevada, Inc.. filed by Scotia International of Nevada, Inc..(Edwards, Randall) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Hybrid International, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Johnathan Schultz, Other Affiliate Makhosi John Makhosi for Hybrid International, LLC added. (Gunnerson, Spencer) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Hybrid International, LLC. (Gunnerson, Spencer) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Scotia International of Nevada, Inc.. (Edwards, Randall) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Scotia International of Nevada, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Edwards, Randall) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 12/4/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 12/19/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 1/3/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (JM) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from District Court, Clark County, Nevada, Case Number A-19-805886-B, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5799198) by Scotia International of Nevada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Comlaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Edwards, Randall) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less