This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/26/2022 at 07:32:52 (UTC).

Hvamstad v. National Interstate Insurance Co et al

Case Summary

On 05/27/2022 Hvamstad filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against National Interstate Insurance Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Terry A Doughty and Kayla D McClusky. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-01431

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Terry A Doughty

Referral Judge

Kayla D McClusky

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Betty Nichole Gore Hvamstad

Defendants

Elizabeth Hill

National Interstate Insurance Co

Pafford Emergency Medical Services Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Barry A Roach

Attorney at Roach Law Firm

2917 Ryan St

Lake Charles, LA 70601

Michael H Schwartzberg

Attorney at Roach Law Firm

2917 Ryan St

Lake Charles, LA 70601

Defendant Attorneys

Eric R Price

Attorney at Perrier & Lacoste

365 Canal St Ste 2550

New Orleans, LA 70130

Guy D Perrier

Attorney at Perrier & Lacoste

365 Canal St Ste 2550

New Orleans, LA 70130

Douglas Kent Williams

Attorney at Breazeale Sachse & Wilson (BR)

P O Box 3197

Baton Rouge, LA 70821

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE of Removal from 3rd JDC of Lincoln Parish, Case Number 62368 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5121344) filed by Elizabeth Hill, Pafford Emergency Medical Services, Inc., National Interstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 List of Parties, #2 List of Pleadings, #3 Clerk Certificate of Filing, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Eric R Price added to party Elizabeth Hill(pty:dft), Attorney Eric R Price added to party National Interstate Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Eric R Price added to party Pafford Emergency Medical Services, Inc.(pty:dft))(aty,Price, Eric) (Attachment 5 replaced on 5/27/2022) (Crick, S). (Entered: 05/27/2022)

1 #1

List of Parties

1 #2

List of Pleadings

1 #3

Clerk Certificate of Filing

1 #4

Exhibit A

1 #5

Civil cover sheet

#2

(#2) PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/27/2022. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal sent to Eric R Price on behalf of National Interstate Insurance Company, Pafford Emergency Medical Services, Inc.. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 6/10/2022. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by National Interstate Insurance Co, Pafford Emergency Medical Services Inc identifying Corporate Parent Great American Insurance Co, American Financial Group Inc for National Interstate Insurance Co. (aty,Price, Eric) Modified on 5/31/2022 to modify docket text. (Crick, S). (Entered: 05/27/2022)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by National Interstate Insurance Co.(aty,Price, Eric) Modified on 5/31/2022 to modify docket text. (Crick, S). (Entered: 05/27/2022)

#6

(#6) REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 5/31/2022. (crt,Leday, A) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Pafford Emergency Medical Services Inc.(aty,Price, Eric) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #9 MOTION to Remand . Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Responses due by 7/14/2022 (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

#11

(#11) RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION to Remand filed by Elizabeth Hill, National Interstate Insurance Co, Pafford Emergency Medical Services Inc. (aty,Price, Eric) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

#12

(#12) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Remand filed by Elizabeth Hill, National Interstate Insurance Co, Pafford Emergency Medical Services Inc. (aty,Price, Eric) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Remand filed by Elizabeth Hill, National Interstate Insurance Co, Pafford Emergency Medical Services Inc. (aty,Price, Eric) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION to Remand filed by Elizabeth Hill, National Interstate Insurance Co, Pafford Emergency Medical Services Inc. (aty,Price, Eric) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #9 MOTION to Remand . Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Responses due by 7/14/2022 (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Remand by Betty Nichole Gore Hvamstad. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/23/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief in Support, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Roach, Barry) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Pafford Emergency Medical Services Inc.(aty,Price, Eric) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RESPONSE to Removal Order filed by Elizabeth Hill, National Interstate Insurance Co, Pafford Emergency Medical Services Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(aty,Price, Eric) Modified on 6/1/2022 to modify docket text to more accurately describe pleading. (Crick, S). (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 5/31/2022. (crt,Leday, A) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by National Interstate Insurance Co.(aty,Price, Eric) Modified on 5/31/2022 to modify docket text. (Crick, S). (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by National Interstate Insurance Co, Pafford Emergency Medical Services Inc identifying Corporate Parent Great American Insurance Co, American Financial Group Inc for National Interstate Insurance Co. (aty,Price, Eric) Modified on 5/31/2022 to modify docket text. (Crick, S). (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal sent to Eric R Price on behalf of National Interstate Insurance Company, Pafford Emergency Medical Services, Inc.. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 6/10/2022. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/27/2022. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketCASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of Removal from 3rd JDC of Lincoln Parish, Case Number 62368 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5121344) filed by Elizabeth Hill, Pafford Emergency Medical Services, Inc., National Interstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 List of Parties, #2 List of Pleadings, #3 Clerk Certificate of Filing, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Eric R Price added to party Elizabeth Hill(pty:dft), Attorney Eric R Price added to party National Interstate Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Eric R Price added to party Pafford Emergency Medical Services, Inc.(pty:dft))(aty,Price, Eric) (Attachment 5 replaced on 5/27/2022) (Crick, S). (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where National Interstate Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Eric R. Price

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Douglas K. Williams

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Guy D. Perrier